Jamelah Elder v. SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamelah Elder
Defendant: SLT Lending SPV Inc doing business as Sur La Table
Case Number: 2:2023cv00334
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #27 Motion For Leave To Withdraw Counsel. The appearance of Attorney Matthew D. Pearson on behalf of Defendant SLT Lending, SPV, Inc. d/b/a SUR La Table ("SLT") is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/3/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
November 2, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Leave to Withdraw Counsel by Defendant SLT Lending SPV Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
November 1, 2023 Filing 26 Mail Returned from Brandon Pierce Jack, Gregory Haroutunian and M.Anderson Berry as Undeliverable - #22 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. **RESENT TO ATTORNEYS AT ADDRESS LISTED ON DOCKET (shk)
October 30, 2023 Filing 25 Mail Returned from M. Anderson Berry as Undeliverable re #22 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (shk) **Resent to address listed on docket. Modified on 11/1/2023 (shk).
October 23, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Berry on behalf of Jamelah Elder (Berry, Michael)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/18/2023. cc: attys of record (tc)
October 2, 2023 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:23-cv-01059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE #18 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes transferring case to Northern District of Indiana. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rolm) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation, and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants responsive pleading deadline is continued to and including October 6, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
September 15, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Continue RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE from September 15, 2023 to October 6, 2023 Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew)[Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.] Modified on 10/2/2023 to term motion previously termed by receiving court. (shk).
September 15, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA filed by Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.] Modified on 10/2/2023 to term motion previously termed from receiving court. (shk).
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric L. Barnum counsel for Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Eric L. Barnum is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table. (Barnum, Eric) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE #15 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court HEREBY ORDERS that: 1. The Stipulation is GRANTED; 2. Defendants' responsive pleading deadline is continued to September 15, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline from August 7, 2023 to September 15, 2023 Re: Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, #13 filed by Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew D. Pearson In Support of Stipulation to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline, #2 Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew D. Pearson counsel for Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. Adding Matthew D. Pearson as counsel of record for SLT LENDING SPV, INC. DBA SUR LA TABLE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SLT LENDING SPV, INC. DBA SUR LA TABLE. (Attorney Matthew D. Pearson added to party SLT Lending SPV, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pearson, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #12 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The document [Dkt. 11] is hereby STRICKEN. Counsel is DIRECTED to L.R. 6-1 and 7-3 when filing a motion. In view of the motion being unopposed, the parties may want to consider filing a stipulation instead of an unopposed motion. (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/15/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-3 compliance statement missing. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
August 11, 2023 Filing 11 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER [DKT. 13]** NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/15/2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric L. Barnum added to party SLT Lending SPV, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Barnum, Eric) Modified on 8/15/2023 (iva). [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 12, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Jamelah Elder. upon SLT Lending SPV, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. Waiver of Service signed by SLT Lending SPV, Inc. DBA Sur La Table. (Berry, M.) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant SLT Lending SPV, Inc. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jamelah Elder. (Berry, M.) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jamelah Elder, identifying Plaintiff. (Berry, M.) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jamelah Elder. (Berry, M.) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]
June 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35445904 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jamelah Elder. (Attorney M. Anderson Berry added to party Jamelah Elder(pty:pla))(Berry, M.) [Transferred from California Central on 10/2/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamelah Elder v. SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamelah Elder
Represented By: M. Anderson Berry
Represented By: Brandon Pierce Jack
Represented By: Gregory Haroutunian
Represented By: Michael A Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLT Lending SPV Inc doing business as Sur La Table
Represented By: Matthew D. Pearson
Represented By: Eric L. Barnum
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?