Yates et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Yates and Sevante Yates
Defendant: United States of America and Known Defendant A
Case Number: 2:2023cv00435
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (sej)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Known Defendant A. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sej)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 Proposed Summons filed by Rachel Yates. (Langer, Sara)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Langer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langer, Steven)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara A Langer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langer, Sara)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Known Defendant A, United States of America by Plaintiff Rachel Yates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Langer, Sara) Modified on 12/12/2023 to edit docket text, term motion, and indicate this as the replacement document for DE #1 (sej).
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to SEAL the Complaint #1 , Notices of Appearance #2 , and #3 . The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to refile each of the documents they previously filed in this case, substituting minors initials for the minors full name by 12/15/2023. The Court further ORDERS counsel to file only documents that comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and ADVISES counsel that future documents that contain the minors full name will be stricken. Upon refiling of the documents, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to indicate on the docket which original document is being replaced by each replacement document filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/8/2023. (shk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Langer on behalf of Rachel Yates, Sevante Yates. (shk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara A Langer on behalf of Rachel Yates, Sevante Yates. (Appearance docketed per Order (DE 15) in case 2:23cv167) (shk)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Known Defendant A, United States of America (Filing fee $ 405.) Receipt #AINNDC-5430095., filed by Sevante Yates, Rachel Yates. (New case opened per Order (DE 15) in case 2:23cv167.)(shk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Yates
Represented By: Sara A Langer
Represented By: Steven L Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sevante Yates
Represented By: Sara A Langer
Represented By: Steven L Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Known Defendant A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?