In re MDL-1700 FedEx Ground Package System Inc Employment Practices Litigation No II Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ed Rosa, Steve Hatton, Barry Whittemore, Ernest White, Joey Rodriguez, Mark Corso, Larry Jackson, Jr, Christopher Bowman, Elaine Muldrow, Brian Belisle, Matthew T Murphy, Wallace Koehmstedt, Joseph Lombardo, Dennis Burns, Dewitt Watson, Manuel Leite, John Coleman, James Barr, Carlos Quintin Gonzalez, David Harris, Paulo DaSilva, Roger Davis, James Grasso, Bernard Mondoza, Hadi Tresna, Jeff Layfield, Thomas Ladago, Jeffrey Hart, Alan Ginet, Bradley D Gregory, All Plaintiffs, Larry Richard, Donald French, Barry Hindman, Rita King, Bruce Wittmeier, Douglas Culver, John Ferrigno, Patrick Giglio, Thomas Suchan, Douglas Demars, Jason R Harry, Leo Rittenhouse, Jeff Rohrer, Samuel Parker, David McMahon, Ronald Perry, Joseph P Amato, Robert Ajanku, David Glidden, Rosita Claudio, Mark Gagnon, Christine Constantino, Terri Bibeau, Glen Coulombe, Christian J Wilson, Edward Slayman, Raymond Killen, Michael Vosbein, Carl Tucker, Clayton Schwan, Kevin Hiscox, Sheila St Cyr, Ian Kowza, Bob Arbutti, Shawn Penrod, Darrell Engbrecht, Stephen Gabourel, Bruce McCloskey, Nicholas Conte, Kamal Aly, William F Gardner, Jr, Robert Wall, Clarence Kelly, Bruce Telhiard, Harold Mitchell, Neal Bergkamp, Vernon Yates, Gregory Cooke, Wylie Smith, David Bolen, Thomas Reardon, Ismael de La Rosa, Mohammed Belaabd, Patrick H Smith, Gregory Jambora, Brian Flynn, Robert J Ross, James Pitt, Curtis Johnson, Jeffrey Carter, William V Catelotti, Kwame Poku, Melvin Smith, Tedd Blaisdell, William Cress, Bob Candella, Vincent Laurino, Randy Anfinson, Michael Decesare, James Tichenor, Buddy D Johnson, James Larry Price, Keith Barry, Rob Carlson, David Testori, Brycen M Smith, Graylon Anderson, Robert Gennell, Jr, Kimberly Fletcher, Robert Waid, James Rick Allen, Spencer Williams, Brian Carlin, Michael Roybal, Scott Baker, Kimball Rice, Ryan Tomaski, Victor A Zink, III, Mark McDonough, Steven Sholey, Jeffrey LaFleur, Rodney Flaga, Joseph Crawley, David Taylor, Howard Eddy, Mike Moore, Jamie Tenison, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Michael Assaff, Robert Velo, James Lester, Allen Gonsorowski, Robert Christ, Stephen Randazzo, Jammie Hill, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson, Arthur Smith, Smail Bencheikh, Richard Langley, John Humphreys, Greg Kane, Kevin E Peterson, Michael Orin, Sean Cappalla, David Chauvin, Michael Boiteux, Mark Lane, Karen Pryor, Jim Kost, Stephen C Wood, Percival Currithers, Ernest Neal, III, John Mooney, Ricardo Bacani, Stephen H McGuinness, Kevin Draper, Yerodin Thompson, Winston Stephenson, Daniel Wells, Peter Allen, Charles Campbell, Michael B Kilmartin, Kim Nelson, David Velasquez, Kevin Hauge, Mike Callahan, Francis Dennis Lynch, James Dobensky, Terrance E Ellison, David Meredith, Lucas Xavier, Stanislav Pavlovski, Gilbert Johnson, Andy Parker, Marek Drelichowski, Ed Kalinowski, Lawrence Chenkus, Kenneth Miner, Bryce Rooney, Tom Skundrich, Jr, Tyrone Hawkins, Thomas Frasca, Anthony King, Ernani T S Santana, Tim Ketterhagen, James Switzer, Kevin Woodruff, Eberto Rodriguez, Kent Belcher, Earnest Baldwin, Michael Brennan, Mauria Clark, Ricky Schissler, Charlie Bertram, Junior Schock, Albert Anaya, Kenneth M Ries, James Daly, Mario Ruiz, Russell Jackson, Scott Erickson, Nathan Gross, Niles Pinkham, Eric P Herbert, Glenn Poland, Joe Shipp, Colin Baker, Raymond G Repola, Tony Rand, Natasha Quimby, Shawn Parker, Attilio Cantanese, Fritz Pady, Sergei Selenskikh, Paul Alfano, Solomon Rachmin, Paul Fenner, Steve Cohen, Donald Swazey, Heidi Law, Thomas Magno, Frank Cucinotti, Robert Abdullah, Ralph P Babcock, III, Christopher Van Lenten, Kenneth Steed, Scott E O'Connell, Donald E Carlson, Richard Letson, Reginald Gray, Daniel Lavake, Manny Bejaran, Roland E Klinger, Rodney Owens, William Thompson, Roscoe Haggerty, Robert Eusebio, Norm Neiberger, Chris M Kaspar, Darrin Gerst, Ryan Boudreaux, Rodolpho M Perez, John Lattimer, Janie L Foster, Donna Jones, Kimberly A Bunger, Wesley Martin, Kristopher Klockenteger, Ronald Parker, Bret Wallman, Bridgette Whitehead, Marvin Washington, Shane Tucker, Geoffrey Bowan, Lance Tucker, Paul Infantino, Robert J Francione, Girmay Dawit, John Shinnick, Stephen Renberg, Damian Ivanov, Patrick Carrigan, Benjamin Valentin, Donald Powell, Jason E Sharp, Errol James, Huntley Jameson, Anthony Tyson, Charley Johnson, Gary Lee Larson, Frederick Howell, Jr, John W Stein, Johnny Batista, Bernard Mendoza, Michael Light, Michael F Murphy, Sharon B Whiteside, L C Bell, Jr, George Sanders, Daniel Emrick, Michael Griffin, Linda Brankley Bowman, Reno Baietti, Herbert Humphrey, Jessie Capers, Heidi Densmore, Danilo Orquiola, Joe Roybal, Debbie Lindsey, Charles House, Carl Candy, Rafus LaGree, Timothy Bellow, Guy Willis, Elhadj Ndoye, Troy Upman, Dave King, Devon Nugent, Richard H Somers, II, Ernest Johnson, John Whymss, Ralph Beaulieu, John Neely, Richard Knowlton, Jeffrey Shelton, Darren Zabrocki, Darryl M Brown, Jean Capobianco, Mohamoud Warfa, Catherine Mack, Brian F Parse, Cheryl L Meyers, Aguinaldo Ferreira, Don Olsen, George Hammer, Chester Mann, Allan May, David Nielsen, Ruben Austria, Genaro Vargas, J Barry O'Hagan, Richard Cali, Michael Wise, Wayne Curran, Kevin Blackler, Ronald Ricciardi, Chad Viereck, Diane Gordon, Christian E MacFarland, Steve Hobbs, Suzanne Andrade, Thomas Castellani, George T Gammons, Donald Bumford, Elizabeth Bergstrom, Sylvia O'Brien, John Lindsey, Thomas Wenzlick, James Kassuba, Richard Lacina, Jr, Kenneth Parnell, Jeremy MacDonald, Leonardo Salazar, Gary Terrio, John Teman, David E Carlson, Sr, David Foss, Patrick Oehmke, Anthony Constantino, Keith Repack, Richard Townes, Gitonga Waiguchu, Jorge Isla, Wayne Chase, Richard Oblinger, Orestes Cal, James D Coates, Michael J Murphy, Harvey Samuel, James Geiger, Donnalee L Straube, Stephen Tarasiak, Robert Grunditz, Alan Pacheco, Jarrett Henderson, Roger Riewe, Steve Persing, Bruce Edwin Gentle, Matthew Oppel, Richard N Gioiosa, Kenneth Wagner, William J Lombo, Charles Malkin, John Waweru, Terry L Scott, Bobby Brown, Rod A Lopez, Dominic R Lupo, Thomas Ghiazza, Edward Nelson, Michael Detrimont, Julius Lester, Steven Swartwout, Paul Thill, Robert Moore, Marcus Holmes, John Morrissey, Darrell Jenkins, William Rodriguez, Donna Eickhorst, Gary Lucier, Kevin Moynagh, Peter Luedke, Richard Syrek, Katrina Lee, Remzi Ozturk, Lawrence Liable, Kevin Barnes, Adelbert Lawrence, Fema Onayiga, Del Sharp, Peter V Kiritsy, Eric Gengenbach, Dean Johnson, W Gary Butterfield, Richard Vicars, Chung Byungchul, Agostino Scalercio, Johnny Dane Leonard, Chris Johnson, Guy Nyswaner, Erin L Murphy, Kenneth R Miller, Robert C Conlon, Margaret Johnson, Michael Rhoades, Magnus B Conroy, Dennis Monahan, Margaret Lurvey, Abraham Cerrato, Shelly A Samuel, William Hurley, Robert Erbentraut, Donald J McClafferty, Kay Goldsmith, James Schultz, Stephanie Sullins Gentle, Peter Woods, TEE One Enterprises LLC, Aaron Ver Steeg, Michael H Cosgrove, Paul Costello, Edward Sheehan, Joseph Iacampo, Rich Mitchell, Carl Hester, Rachella Westbrook, Manuel Da Silva, Mark Desormeaux, Michael Jost, Theodore Fleming, Jr, Kevin Pour, Wes Bird, Paul Orsini, Peter McDonald, Paul A Jackmauh, Dennis McHenry, Carl Veal, Michael Blauvelt, Jeff Smith, Temple Jackson, Jeffrey Wild, Gordon Lane, Paul Kelly, Dan Stender, George Stephenson, Seid Huskic, Paul Gendron, Steven L James, Eduardo Vazquez, Monty Smith, Michael Timmons, Michael Millinder, Fred Walton, Mark Autry, Robert Thurston, Dan Fishler, Gary Bozlinski, Charles Mack, Ricardo Huerta, Girum Alemayehu Glmariam, Mark Levine, Margaret Gibson, Daniel Santa, Dan Hoyberg-Nielsen, Randy Azzato, Keith Levesque, Gupertino Magana, Ken Stibor, Joseph McDonald, Charles Miedema, FedEx Plaintiffs, Michael Silva, Gerald Pelkey, Jesse Padilla, Dean Alexander, Jeff Bramlage, John Chiasson, Eric Jepson, Ralph Carl Veal, David R Mosher, Latif Atanda, Edward M Rizzuto, Sr, Marie LaRoche, Sherre Harting, Raymond Tierney, James Kelleher, Patrick Fletcher, Thomas Mikulski, Thomas Carraher, Larry Roland, Mark Niles, Ya Vang, Joseph Condi, Roy Patton, Jr, Mike Sheffer, Jim Pantojs, Clyde E Woomer, Laron Jones, Jon Leighter, Kimberly Dore, Jay Heintz, Craig Batley, Ary Fuchs, Mario Russo, Thomas Chalker, Eric J Moss, Horacio Flores, John P Mikulski, Lawrence Asbury, Richard L Cadrin, Kathy Carkhuff, Starr Denise Blanchard, Sherry Dover, Mouloud Zouaoui, Don Blackmon, Douglas Bailey, Joseph Pasquale, John F Esculano, Dale Fluegel, Christopher Collman, Carlene M Craig, Kent Whistler, Frank Gruhn, Michael Amusu, George M Therrien, Derek D Willis, Theodore Holloway, Jr, Terry Rodgers, Eric Burba, Neville Edwards, Mohamed Tamart, Godfrey Lee, Jr, Troy Givens, Robert Lee Taylor, Gerald Petersen, John Brown, Jesse Ricord, Keith Rudolph, Peter Wiley, Erik Olson, Thomas Robinson, Nicholas N Wolfe, Karen L Salensky, Tim Johnson, Jeremiah Pedrazzi, Daniel Graham, Scott Anderson, Henry Szupel, Gary Austin, Michael Meno, Jim Rainone, Burton Jones, Arthur King, Jr, Allan Ross, Edward Ellenberg, Harold Bennett, Larry Armstrong, Michael Prokopovich, George Kalmancy, Jorge E Ascencio, Louis Wallace, Michael Leto, Patrick Ngei, Jeffrey Quebe, Dean Wiley, James Burnett, Michael Tofaute, Ryan Hudson, Tim Mershon, Jason Pike, Talliesin Dodd Hayden, Clarence Dalcour, Tariq Baskerville, Matthew Cook, Mark A Lane, Sr, Ernest F Tarr, Charles Perdwe, Kristi Gruhn, Todd Edelen, Dale Rose, Larry Louzau, Robert Willis, Darrin Ray, Clay Seaver, Robert Correia, Penny Massa, Patrick J Gall, William Meltz, Roland Guillet, Dale Urbank, David Spicer, Dallas Crnich, Raffique Sabare, Jeremy Brinker, Steven Hardie, Rick Pannullo, Ely Ines, Arthur R Rottini, Jerry Steward, James Hough, Ken Beck, Kenneth Flynn, Michelle Jones, Floyd Hagen, David Stacy, Sammy Farland, Dana A Dodd, Thomas Westcott, John Ulysse, Joseph Forgitano, Mark Phillips, Paul Luongo, Milton M Sanchez, William E Shallies, Tina Floyd, Sean Dunmire, Rodney Tremblay, James Hall, Jr, Melissa Rohman, Gary Miyazaki, David Walsh, Robson Araujo, Mike Sanders, Aaron Dahl, Jay Trachim, Walter Wallace, Aaron McCray, Anthony Ybarra, Plaintiffs' Steering Committee and Co-Lead Counsel
Defendant: Albert Rettinger, Federal Express, All FedEx Ground Defendants, FedEx Ground Package System Inc, FedEx Home Delivery Inc, Fedex Ground Package Systems Inc, Federal Express Inc, John Schnebeck, Jane 1-10 Doe, FedEx Express Home Delivery, FedEx HomeDelivery, FedEx Corporation, FedEx Ground, Tyrone Gaskins, Does 1-20, John Does 1-10, John Does 1 through 5, FedEx Ground System Inc, Cheryl Pilakowski, Joe Collins, Tom Dimaio, Jim Gelhausen, John Doe, FedEx Home Delivery, Federal Express Corporation and Christopher Parker
Petitioner: Jonathan Lee Riches
Special Master: Hon James Rosenbaum
Not Yet Classified: Law Offices of George A. Barton and Palmer Freeman, Jr
Case Number: 3:2005md00527
Filed: August 26, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 3299 CO-LEAD COUNSEL'S RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LICHTEN & LISS-RIORDAN, PC'S ON ALLOCATION OF ERISA ATTORNEY'S FEES by Co-Lead Counsel to #3295 Order . (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3298 AFFIDAVIT of SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL re #3297 Response/Reply by Co-Lead Counsel. (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3297 CO-LEAD COUNSEL'S REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OF THE LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE A. BARTON ON ALLOCATION OF ERISA ATTORNEY'S FEES by Co-Lead Counsel to #3296 Supplement, . (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3296 SUPPLEMENT to #3292 Response to Motion, BARTON FIRM'S MAY 2, 2019 OBJECTIONS TO CO-LEAD COUNSEL'S PROPOSED FEE ALLOCATION filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Barton PHV, George)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3295 ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Honorable James M. Rosenbaum, Special Master on 6/21/19. (dk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3294 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees and in Response to Barton's Objections (Doc. 3292) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3293 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees and in Response to Barton Objections (Doc. 3292) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3292 RESPONSE to Motion re #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE A. BARTON, P.C.S OBJECTIONS TO THE CO-LEAD COUNSELS PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF THE CRAIG ERISA ATTORNEYS FEE AWARD filed by Law Offices of George A. Barton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Barton PHV, George)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3291 ORDER The court DENIES Ms. Liss-Riordan's #3287 motion for extension of time; GRANTS Mr. Barton's #3286 motion for an extension; and ORDERS that any memorandum in support of his objection be filed by 9:00 a.m. (E.D.T.) on May 3, 2019. Any reply should be filed by May 10. No further place-holder papers will be allowed. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/19. (jld)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3290 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3289 OBJECTION by Law Offices of George A. Barton to #3284 Memorandum in Support, Proposed Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees. (Barton PHV, George)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3288 OBJECTION by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry to (3283 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees . Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3287 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Proposed Fee Allocation) by Plaintiffs Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3286 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Co-Lead Counsel's Proposed Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees by Miscellaneous Party Law Offices of George A. Barton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barton PHV, George)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3285 AFFIDAVIT re #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees , #3284 Memorandum in Support, (Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel) by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Ellingstad, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3284 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3283 MOTION for Allocation of ERISA Attorney's Fees by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3282 USCA Case Number 19-1561 for #3280 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronald Perry, Alan Pacheco. (jld)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3281 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re #3280 Notice of Appeal. Appeal filing fees paid in the amount of $505 - Receipt # 0755-3848129. (jss)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3280 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3279 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,, filed by Plaintiffs Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0755-3847183. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3279 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING #3262 Motion for Settlement in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG and #3243 Motion for Attorney Fees. Pursuant to Section I(B) of the Settlement, the ERISA Class certified on October 15, 2007 [MDL Doc. No. 906] is AMENDED. The parties request for the appointment of Kansas Legal Services as the cy pres beneficiary, is APPROVED. The Court APPROVES the Service Awards of $5,000 to Named Plaintiffs Leo Rittenhouse, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Keith Berry, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Sylvia OBrien, Neal Bergkamp, Dominic Lupo, Alan Pacheco and Ronald Perry, and payment of $7,500 to Kent Whistler. The Court directs payment of that amount from the Class Settlement Fund to each of them, in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. The Court hereby DISMISSES this action with prejudice, specifically including the Released Claims, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as set out in this order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/22/19. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(mlc) Modified on 3/25/2019 (dk).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3278 ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 53, Hon. James Rosenbaum, retired U.S.District Judge for the District of Minnesota, is re-appointed Special Master for the purpose of considering and proposing resolution of the proposed allocation of attorney fees in the ERISA Class Action Settlement and the objections to that proposed allocation. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/22/19. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3277 ORDER: Pursuant to Section VII(A) of the ERISA Class Action Settlement Agreement, Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel shall have to and including April 12, 2019 to file a proposed allocation of the attorneys' fees awarded by the court and a motion to approve the allocation. Any objections to the proposed allocation must be filed by April 26, 2019, together with a memorandum in support, with any reply to be filed by May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/20/19. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3276 ERISA PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF ERISA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler to #3275 Order,, . (Ellingstad, Susan)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3275 ORDER: The court has modified the proposed order submitted by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel granting final approval of the proposed ERISA Class Action Settlement (copy attached), and affords the parties three days, to and including March 22, 2019, to object to the modifications. The class member lists submitted by the parties will be appended as Exhibits A and B, when the final order is entered. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/19/19. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 13, 2019 Filing 3274 TRANSCRIPT of FAIRNESS HEARING held on MARCH 11, 2019, before Judge ROBERT L. MILLER, JR. Court Reporter DEBRA J. BONK, Telephone number 574 246 8039 / debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 3/22/2019. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (db)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3273 MOTION HEARING held on 3/11/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Ross, Harwood, Ellingstad. Dft appeared by attys Voelz, Ferron re #3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA) Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval, and #3243 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval for Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs; Arguments heard. For reasons stated, court FINDS proposed settlement fair, reasonable, and adequate, but DEFERS entry of final order for one week to allow parties to submit comprehensive list of opt outs. At plaintiffs' request, a special master will be appointed to resolve disputes re: allocation of attorneys fees. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3272 ORDER granting #3271 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically: Pursuant to the proposed settlement agreement and the court's September 5, 2018 order, class members who filed a timely objection and notice of intent to appear at the fairness hearing may appear either in person or telephonically. Ronald Perry and Alan Pacheco have met those requirements, and have indicated that they wish to appear by phone, through their attorney, Shannon Liss-Riordan [Doc. No. 3261 and 3271]. The request to appear by phone at March 11 fairness hearing [Doc. No. 3271] is therefore GRANTED. Counsel must call 574-246-8471 fifteen minutes before the start of the hearing (by 9:15 a.m. Eastern Daylight Time) to participate, and is advised that use of a cell phone is prohibited and that speaker functions must be disabled to avoid technical issues in recording the proceedings. Failure to comply will constitute a waiver of appearance. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/8/19. (dk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3271 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Fairenss Hearing by Plaintiffs Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3270 AFFIDAVIT of Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel re #3269 Response/Reply, by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3269 ERISA PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ERISA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler to #3257 Objection, #3246 Letter, #3254 Objection, #3255 Objection, #3261 Objection, #3251 Objection . (Ellingstad, Susan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3268 RESPONSE by FedEx Ground Package System Inc(District of New Hampshire 1:05cv145), FedEx Ground Package System Inc to (3252 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Memorandum of Law (Other), (3261 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Objection . Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Voelz, Scott)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3267 BRIEF re (3266 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3266 BRIEF in Opposition to #3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) filed by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3265 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) Declaration of Abigail Schwartz filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3264 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3263 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3262 MOTION for Settlement (ERISA Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3261 OBJECTION TO SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAR AT FAIRNESS HEARING by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Cover Letter)(jld)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3260 ORDER: The court GRANTS the request for extension of time to consult with an attorney regarding the proposed settlement, and gives Mrs. Halverson to/including 1/31/2019 to file any objections she may have to the proposed settlement. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3257 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Daniel Roberts. (originally filed in 3:05cv538)(jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3256 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Clayton Schwan. (originally filed in 3:05cv538) (jld)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3252 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3251 Objection to Final Settlement Approval by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3251 OBJECTION by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry to Settlement and Notice of Intention to Appear at Fairness Hearing. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3259 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Marilyn Halverson. (originally filed in 3:05cv539) (jld)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3255 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Douglas M Bembenic. (originally filed in 3:05cv538)(jld)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3250 ORDER GRANTING ISSUANCE OF SUPPLEMENTAL SETTLEMENT NOTICE . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/11/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3249 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3247 MOTION for Issuance of Supplemental Settlement Notice (Unopposed) (Declaration of Robert I. Harwood) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed supplement settlement notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3248 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3247 MOTION for Issuance of Supplemental Settlement Notice (Unopposed) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3247 MOTION for Issuance of Supplemental Settlement Notice (Unopposed) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3254 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Gary Knott. (originally filed in 3:05cv538) (jld)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3253 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Floyd Hagen. (originally filed in 3:05cv538) (jld)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3246 Letter from Patrick Wercinski objection to the nationwide ERISA Class Settlement. (jld)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3258 Letter requesting to opt-out from the Nationwide ERISA Class filed by Edward C Nelson. (originally filed in 3:05cv539) (jld)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3245 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3243 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval for Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3244 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3243 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval for Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3243 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval for Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Dominic R Lupo, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3242 ORDER Order correcting paragraph 8 in Section III of the September 5 order granting preliminary approval of the ERISA settlement (DE #3241 ) as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/20/18. (jld)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3241 OPINION AND ORDER The plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of the proposed ERISA class action settlement ( #3152 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, #269 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG) is GRANTED as set forth in the Opinion and Order. A Fairness Hearing is set for 3/11/2019 at 9:30 AM (EDT) in South Bend. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/5/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3240 ORDER GRANTING MODIFIED ALLOCATION OF ATTORNEYS' FEES Based on the Special Master's report that the settlement terms are fair and reasonable (DE #3239 ), the Court APPROVES the proposed allocation of attorney's fees, as modified. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3239 ORDER The Special Master recommends that the Court enter an order approving the proposed fee allocations in these cases, as modified by the mutually agreed-upon settlement terms. Signed by James M. Rosenbaum (ret), Special Master on 8/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3238 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - No Such Name re: #3222 ORDER. (nae)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3237 Mail Returned from David Duddleston as Undeliverable - Return to Sender, Undeliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward - #3222 ORDER. (rmc)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3236 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Miscellaneous Party Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Freeman PHV, Palmer) Modified on 7/13/2018 to edit text(mlc).
July 11, 2018 Filing 3235 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3222 ORDER Gorby, Peters & Associates, LLC by Ernest White. (Gorby PHV, Michael)
July 11, 2018 Filing 3234 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3215 ORDER,, Add and Terminate Parties, by All Plaintiffs. (Marchetti, Anthony)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3233 (ATTY LOGIN AND SIGNATURE DO NOT MATCH, SEE DE 3235 FOR CORRECTION)MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3222 ORDER Gorby, Peters & Associates, LLC by Ernest White. (Peters PHV, Mary) Modified on 7/11/2018 to edit text (mlc).
July 10, 2018 Filing 3232 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3222 ORDER by John Humphreys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Taylor PHV, Donald)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3231 MEMORANDUM by Law Offices of George A. Barton to (286 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG) ORDER FROM SPECIAL MASTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Barton PHV, George)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3230 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #3222 ORDER (Special Master Order No. 1) by Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3229 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to forward Re: #3222 ORDER. (nae)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3228 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - Not deliverable as addressed, unable to Forward re: #3222 ORDER. (nae)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3227 Proposed MOTION for Attorney Fees Response to Doc 3222-1 order by Miscellaneous Party Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Freeman PHV, Palmer)
July 10, 2018 Filing 3226 (ATTY LOGIN AND SIGNATURE DO NOT MATCH, SEE DE 3236 FOR CORRECTION)Preliminary MOTION for Attorney Fees Response to Doc 3222-1 order by Miscellaneous Party Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Freeman PHV, Palmer) Modified on 7/13/2018 to edit text (mlc).
July 9, 2018 Filing 3225 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - Not deliverable as addressed re #3222 ORDER. (jld)
July 6, 2018 Filing 3224 MOTION Mediation by Miscellaneous Party Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Freeman PHV, Palmer)
July 5, 2018 Filing 3223 Mail Returned from Karen Kruse as Undeliverable - #3222 ORDER. (jld)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3222 SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 1 . Signed by James M. Rosenbaum, Special Master on 6/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(dk)
May 24, 2018 Filing 3221 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 23, 2018 Filing 3220 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 23, 2018 Filing 3219 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3218 ORDER Order MODIFYING Paragraph 5 of the 5/18/2018 order appointing the special master to add provision as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
May 21, 2018 Filing 3216 Mail Returned from Salvatore G Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 18, 2018 Filing 3217 Mail Returned from Maureen H Kanter as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3215 ORDER , Hon. James Rosenbaum is appointed Special Master as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/18/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)(cc: Hon. James Rosenbaum, jrosenbaum@jamsadr.com)
May 17, 2018 Filing 3214 Mail Returned from Todd O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld) Modified on 5/23/2018 to correct filed on date (jld).
May 17, 2018 Filing 3212 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re (3208 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3208 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) ORDER,,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,,, of Acceptance of Referral of Fee Allocation Disputes to the Honorable James Rosenbaum by Co-Lead Counsel and All Objecting Counsel Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(Ross, Beth)
May 16, 2018 Filing 3213 Mail Returned from Karen Kruse as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER. (jld)
May 14, 2018 Filing 3211 Mail Returned from David Duddleston as Undeliverable - #3208 ORDER (Not deliverable as addressed). (jld)
May 9, 2018 Filing 3210 Mail Returned from Robert McDaniel as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed, unable to Forward re: #3199 Order. (nae)
May 7, 2018 Filing 3209 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed, unable to forward re: #3199 Order. (nae)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3208 ORDER The Court GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #3092 motion for approval of the proposed allocation of attorneys fees in the uncontested cases and DIRECTING that allocation to the participating law firms in those cases be made as set forth in the Allocation Report (Doc. No. #3090 ); DEFERRING ruling on the motion for approval of the proposed allocation of fees in the contested cases: Craig v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:05cv530 (KS); Humphreys v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:05cv540 (TX); Cooke v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:05cv668 (SC); Whiteside et al v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:07cv326 (NC); White v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:07cv411 (GA); DENYING the motion for leave to file objections regarding the proposed allocation of fees in Carlson v. FedEx Ground Pkg. Systems, Inc., 3:06cv393, (Doc. No. #3173 ); DENYING the motions to arbitrate (Doc. Nos. #3108 , #3109 , and #222 in 3:05-cv-540]; and GRANTING the motion to appoint a special master (Doc. No. #3120 ), and affording co-lead parties and the objecting law firms until May 21, 2018 to agree on a special master or to suggest alternatives to the court's nominee. Absent such an agreement or persuasive suggestion Hon. James Rosenbaum, retired U.S. District Judge for the District of Minnesota, to serve as the special master. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld
April 30, 2018 Filing 3207 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 24, 2018 Filing 3205 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward, not deliverable as addressed re: #3199 Order. (nae)
April 20, 2018 Filing 3206 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - Not Deliverable as Addressed re: #3199 Order. (nae)
April 17, 2018 Filing 3204 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 16, 2018 Filing 3203 Mail Returned from B James Fitzpatrick as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 16, 2018 Filing 3202 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 12, 2018 Filing 3201 Mail Returned from Todd J. O'Malley (attempted not known) as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 10, 2018 Filing 3200 Mail Returned from Karen P Kruse as Undeliverable - #3198 Order,. (jld)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3199 ORDER: Individuals to be included as members of specific settlement classes as detailed in the attached order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/5/2018. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3198 ORDER: Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel, Robert Harwood filed identical motions forapproval of the proposed allocation of attorneys fees in the master case [Doc. No. 3092] and each of the cases listed in attached Exhibit A. To avoid unnecessary duplication, the court consolidates the motions with Doc. No. 3092, and directs the Clerk to term the motions listed on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/30/18. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(dk)
March 26, 2018 Filing 3197 Receipt of Letter from Halunen Law (jld)
March 19, 2018 Filing 3196 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3188 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 16, 2018 Filing 3194 NOTICE by All FedEx Ground Defendants (Defendant FedEx Ground's Notice Of Filing Of Supplemental Class Member Lists) (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E, #6 Attachment F, #7 Attachment G, #8 Attachment H, #9 Attachment I, #10 Attachment J, #11 Attachment K, #12 Attachment L, #13 Attachment M, #14 Attachment N, #15 Proposed Order)(Voelz, Scott)
March 15, 2018 Filing 3195 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3188 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 15, 2018 Filing 3193 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3188 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 15, 2018 Filing 3192 STATEMENT in Support of Gorby Peters & Associates, LLC Objections to Co-lead Counsel's Proposed Fee And Expense Allocation regarding (3189 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Supplement, filed by Law Offices of George A. Barton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(Peters PHV, Mary)
March 12, 2018 Filing 3191 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3188 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 2, 2018 Filing 3190 CO-LEAD COUNSELS RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THE LAW OFFICES OF GEORGE A. BARTON, P.C.S OBJECTIONS TO CO-LEAD COUNSELS PROPOSED FEE AND EXPENSE ALLOCATION by All Plaintiffs to #3189 Supplement, . (Ross, Beth)
March 2, 2018 Filing 3189 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Statement In Support of The Law Offices of George A Barton, P.C.'s Objections to Co-Lead Counsel's Proposed Fee and Expense Allocation filed by Law Offices of George A. Barton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Barton PHV, George)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3188 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SECOND ROUND DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS AND TO SUBMIT LIST OF CLASS MEMBERS AND AUTHORIZATION TO USE RESERVE FUNDS TO COMPENSATE AN INVESTIGATOR in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/28/2018. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-MGG(dk)
February 21, 2018 Filing 3187 MOTION Extension of Time for Second Round Distribution of Settlement Payments, to Submit List of Class Members and Authorization to Use Reserve Funds to Compensate an Investigator by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-MGG(Ross, Beth)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3180 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SECOND ROUND DISTRIGUTION OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS AND TO SUBMIT FINAL LIST OF CLASS MEMBERS AND AUTHORIZATION TO USE RESERVE FUNDS TO COMPENSATE AN INVESTIGATOR re: #3179 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. The time for the Settlement Administrator to distribute funds remaining in the Net Settlement Fund and Reserve Fund to eligible class members who cashed their first-round settlement payments is extended to 4/30/2018. FedEx Ground to submit additional class members eligible for Reserve Fund claims is 3/16/2018. Additionally co-lead counsel are authorized to pay reasonable compensation for an investigator of their choice to assist in locating missing class members from the Reserve Funds established in the applicable constituent case. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
December 14, 2017 Filing 3179 Joint MOTION For An Extension Of Time For Second Round Distribution Of Settlement Payments And To Submit List Of Class Members And Authorization To Use Reserve Funds To Compensate An Investigator by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
November 20, 2017 Filing 3178 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (marked not deliverable as addressed) (jld)
October 18, 2017 Filing 3177 MANDATE of USCA The appeal of FedEx Ground Package System Inc is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (Attachments: #1 Certified Final Order)(jld)
October 18, 2017 Filing 3176 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3173 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Mike Callahan, Rob Carlson, Penny Massa, Michael Wise. (Morin PHV, Tina)
October 16, 2017 Filing 3175 MANDATE of USCA as to (269 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael B Kilmartin, David McMahon, Michael Tofaute, Patrick Carrigan, Thomas Mikulski, Francis Dennis Lynch, 201 USCA Order, in case 3:05-cv-595): Upon consideration of the UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF APPELLATE PROCEDURE 42(b), filed on October 13, 2017, by counsel for the appellants, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). (Attachments: #1 Certified Order)(nae)
October 10, 2017 Filing 3174 RESPONSE to Motion re #3173 MOTION for Leave to File filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
October 6, 2017 Filing 3173 MOTION for Leave to File by Plaintiffs Mike Callahan, Rob Carlson, Penny Massa, Michael Wise. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Objection to Costs, #2 Exhibit Harwood Letters, #3 Exhibit T&E Reports, #4 Exhibit Lynn Faris Email)(Morin PHV, Tina)
October 5, 2017 Filing 3172 Plaintiff-Objectors Ronald Perry and Alan Pacheco's Reply in Support of Objection to Proposed Settlement of ERISA Claims. (ksp)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3171 ORDER in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG; granting (275) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/5/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(ksp)
October 3, 2017 Filing 3170 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Objection by Plaintiffs Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 30, 2017 Filing 3169 Sealed Document. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 29, 2017 Filing 3168 Sealed Document re (273 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3167 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Sealed Document, (272 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3166 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Objection,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Houston Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Houston Declaration)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
September 29, 2017 Filing 3167 Sealed Document re (272 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3166 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Objection,. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
September 22, 2017 Filing 3166 OBJECTION by Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry to (3153 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Memorandum in Support, (3152 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Settlement : Preliminary Approval of the Proposed ERISA Class Action Settlement . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ronald Perry, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Alan Pacheco)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3165 ORDER RE: CO-LEAD COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS: GRANTING #3163 Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Declaration. The un-redacted declaration and exhibits filed on 9/11/2017 (DE #3160 ) are WITHDRAWN and the Clerk is instructed to mark the docket accordingly; The request to maintain the Corrected Declaration of Susan E Ellingstad and Exhibits 1-16 (DE #3164 ) under seal pursuant to the protective order entered in January 2006 (DE #101 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/17. (jld)
September 12, 2017 Filing 3164 Sealed Document re #3163 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Declaration of Susan E. Ellingstad and Exhibits 1-16. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2017 Filing 3163 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Declaration of Susan E. Ellingstad and Exhibits 1-16 by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3162 Sealed Document re #3158 Reply to Response to Motion, #3156 Reply to Response to Motion, #3155 Reply to Response to Motion, #3159 Reply to Response to Motion, #3157 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3161 Sealed Document re #3158 Reply to Response to Motion, #3156 Reply to Response to Motion, #3155 Reply to Response to Motion, #3159 Reply to Response to Motion, #3157 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3160 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #3165 ON 9/18/2017*** Sealed Document re #3158 Reply to Response to Motion, #3156 Reply to Response to Motion, #3155 Reply to Response to Motion, #3159 Reply to Response to Motion, #3157 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-16)(Ellingstad, Susan) Modified on 9/18/2017 (jld).
September 11, 2017 Filing 3159 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof and in Response to Taylor Dunham's Objections (TX Doc. No. 233) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3158 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof and in Response to Whetstone's Objections filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof in Response to Whetstone and Lore's Objections filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3156 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof and in Response to Barton's Objections filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 11, 2017 Filing 3155 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof and in Response to Gorby Peters' Objections filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 8, 2017 Filing 3154 AFFIDAVIT in Support re (269 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3152 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Settlement : Preliminary Approval of the Proposed ERISA Class Action Settlement (JOINT DECLARATION) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Decl. In Support of Motion - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #7 Exhibit 6 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit 7 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #9 Exhibit 8 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #10 Exhibit 9 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #11 Exhibit 10 to Exh A - Settlement Agreement, #12 Exhibit B to Joint Decl. In Support of Motion - Claim Rejection Letters, #13 Exhibit C to Joint Decl. In Support of Motion - Plan Amendments)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
September 8, 2017 Filing 3153 MEMORANDUM in Support of (269 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3152 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Settlement : Preliminary Approval of the Proposed ERISA Class Action Settlement filed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
September 8, 2017 Filing 3152 MOTION for Settlement : Preliminary Approval of the Proposed ERISA Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Harwood, Robert)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3151 ORDER granting #3148 Motion to Withdraw in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. The Clerk is directed to show the response [Doc. No. 3146] withdrawn. The redacted response filed on August 31 [Doc. No. 3149] is deemed to be timely filed. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/5/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG (dk)
September 1, 2017 Filing 3150 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3120 MOTION to appoint Special Master and #3137 MDL Class Counsels' Response filed by Ernest White. (Gorby PHV, Michael)
August 31, 2017 Filing 3149 RESPONSE to Motion re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof Co-Lead Counsel's Proposed Fee and Expense Allocation filed by Ernest White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mary Donne Peters, #2 Exhibit Declaration of John Freeman)(Gorby PHV, Michael)
August 31, 2017 Filing 3148 First MOTION to Withdraw 3146 Response to Motion, Gorby Peters & Associates LLC's Objections to Co-Lead Counsel's Proposed Fee and Expense Allocation by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Gorby PHV, Michael)
August 30, 2017 Filing 3147 Mail Returned from Karen P Kruse (Not at this address, moved out) as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 30, 2017 Filing 3145 OBJECTION by Law Offices of George A. Barton to #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Barton PHV, George)
August 30, 2017 Filing 3144 OBJECTIONS of Counsel Lore and Freeman, State Counsel for North and South Carolina, to the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's Fees by Co-lead MDL Counsel by Palmer Freeman, Jr to #3090 Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John P. Freeman, #2 Exhibit Declaration of R. James Lore)(Freeman PHV, Palmer) Modified on 8/31/2017 to correct docket text (nae).
August 30, 2017 Filing 3143 Whetstone Perkins & Fulda, LLC's OBJECTIONS to co-lead Counsel's Proposed Fee and Expense Allocation by Palmer Freeman, Jr to #3090 Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Declaration of John P. Freeman Regarding Aspects of MDL Counsel's Treatment of Certain State Law Firms)(Freeman PHV, Palmer) Modified on 8/31/2017 to correct docket text (nae).
August 29, 2017 Set Deadlines: Reply to the objections to the proposed allocation of attorney's fees to be filed by 9/11/2017. (per entry #3136 in 3:05md527) Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG(jld)
August 28, 2017 Filing 3142 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 28, 2017 Filing 3141 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 28, 2017 Filing 3140 Mail Returned from B James Fitzpatrick as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3139 ORDER granting (3136) Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017 to the objections to the proposed allocation of attorney's fees (in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG ). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG(jld)
August 25, 2017 Filing 3137 RESPONSE to Motion re (152 in 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG) MOTION to appoint Special Master Revised filed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG(Houston, Matthew)
August 25, 2017 Filing 3136 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 3132 Motion Hearing,,,,, Report of Proposed Allocation of the Attorney's Fees by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 23, 2017 Filing 3138 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 23, 2017 Filing 3135 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3108 MOTION Arbitration , #3109 MOTION Arbitration filed by Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 21, 2017 Filing 3134 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 21, 2017 Filing 3133 Mail Returned from Salvatore G Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3115 ORDER,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
August 18, 2017 Filing 3131 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on AUGUST 16, 2017, before Judge ROBERT L. MILLER, JR. Court Reporter DEBRA J. BONK, Telephone number debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov/574.246.8039. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/29/2017. Redaction Request due 9/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2017. (db)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3132 MOTION HEARING held on 8/16/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Ross, Ellingstad, Harwood, Rudd. State class appeared by attys Barton, Burrows, Whetstone, Peters, Tatum-Lee. FedEx appeared telephonically by atty B. Ferron re #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys, #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; the Proposed Allocation thereof MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's. Arguments heard. For the reasons stated in open court, the state class attorneys' motion to compel production #3081 is DENIED, and their motion to stay proceedings #3094 is GRANTED, in part. Proceedings on the motion to approve proposed allocation of fees Doc. No. #3092 are STAYED until 9/6/2017; the moving parties in Craig 3:05cv530 (KS), Humphreys, 3:05cv540 (TX), and White, 3:07cv411 (GA) shall have to and including 8/30/2017 to file any objections to that motion; and Co-Lead Counsel and the PSC shall have until 9/6/2017 to file their reply. A hearing will be set, if necessary, after briefing is complete. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3130 RESPONSE to Motion re #3108 MOTION Arbitration , #3109 MOTION Arbitration in North Carolina and South Carolina filed by All Plaintiffs. (Marchetti, Anthony)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3129 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3108 MOTION Arbitration , #3109 MOTION Arbitration (Anthony L. Marchetti, Jr.) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Ellingstad, Susan)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3128 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3108 MOTION Arbitration , #3109 MOTION Arbitration (Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Ellingstad, Susan)
August 16, 2017 Filing 3127 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3108 MOTION Arbitration , #3109 MOTION Arbitration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3126 ORDER granting #3118 Motion for Extension of Time in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG (DE #263 in case 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG ). Plaintiff given to/including 9/8/2017 to file the ERISA stipulation of settlement and motion for preliminary approval; Plaintiffs Perry and Pacheco shall have until 9/22/2017 to file their outline of objections, and the remaining named ERISA plaintiffs shall have until 9/29/2017 to file any reply to those objections. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/15/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3125 ORDER: DENYING #3124 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. Any additional responsive arguments can be made at the hearing on 8/16/16. (Also Denying DE #264 in case 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG; DE #226 in case 3:05-cv-00540-RLM-MGG; DE #225 in case 3:05-cv-00668-RLM-MGG; DE #157 in case 3:07-cv-00326-RLM-MGG; and DE #153 in case 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG ). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/15/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
August 14, 2017 Filing 3124 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to State Attorneys' Motion to Compel Production by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(Ross, Beth)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3123 ORDER granting #3113 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J Gorby PHV for Georgia Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/14/17. (mtr)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3122 ORDER granting #3112 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mary Donne Peters PHV for Georgia Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/14/17. (mtr)
August 11, 2017 Filing 3121 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3120 MOTION to appoint Special Master filed by Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 11, 2017 Filing 3120 MOTION to appoint Special Master by Miscellaneous Party Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 11, 2017 Filing 3119 NOTICE by Lawrence Asbury Withdrawing Objection to Motion to Compel (Ellis PHV, Damon)
August 11, 2017 Filing 3118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File the ERISA Stipulation of Settlement and Motion for Preliminary Approval by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Houston, Matthew)
August 10, 2017 Filing 3117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys MDL State Class Attorneys' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of their Motion to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Barton PHV, George)
August 10, 2017 Filing 3116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3094 MOTION to Stay re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's F Reply Memorandum in Further Support of MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorneys' Fees filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
August 9, 2017 Filing 3114 MEMORANDUM in Support of #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof filed by Palmer Freeman, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Allocation chart, #2 Exhibit Affidavit from California Fed Ex)(Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3115 ORDER A hearing on the state class attorneys' motion to compel production and motion to stay is set for Wednesday 8/16/2017 at 10:00 AM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/17. (jld)
August 7, 2017 Filing 3113 Application for Attorney Michael J. Gorby to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Georgia Plaintiffs. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 3112 Application for Attorney Mary Donne Peters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Georgia Plaintiffs. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3111 ORDER granting #3103 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Reply Memorandum to be filed by 8/10/2017. Approved by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/2017. (dk)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3110 ORDER granting #3098 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Palmer Freeman PHV for Palmer Freeman. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
August 2, 2017 Filing 3109 MOTION Arbitration by Petitioner Whetstone Perkins & Fulda. (Attachments: #1 Memoranda in Support, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 2, 2017 Filing 3108 MOTION Arbitration by Petitioner Whetstone Perkins & Fulda. (Attachments: #1 Memoranda in Support, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Freeman PHV, Palmer)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3107 ORDER granting #3095 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter N Wasylyk PHV for Raymond Tierney, and Thomas Westcott. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3106 ORDER granting #3102 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee PHV for John Humphreys. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3105 ORDER granting #3101 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald R Taylor PHV for John Humphreys. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3104 ORDER granting #3100 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tina L Morin PHV for David E Carlson, Donald E Carlson and Rob Carlson. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
August 1, 2017 Filing 3103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MDL State Class Attorneys' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of their Motion to Compel and in Further Support of their Motion to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
August 1, 2017 Filing 3102 Application for Attorney Jennifer Tatum Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Humphreys, et al.. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
August 1, 2017 Filing 3101 Application for Attorney Donald R. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Humphreys, et al.. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 3100 Application for Attorney Tina L. Morin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carlson et al. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
July 28, 2017 Filing 3099 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report on the MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Compel Production and Motion to Stay by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
July 28, 2017 Filing 3098 Application for Attorney Palmer Freeman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Whetstone Perkins & Fulda. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert of Good Standing)(MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
July 27, 2017 Filing 3097 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys, #3094 MOTION to Stay re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's F filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellingstad, Susan)
July 27, 2017 Filing 3096 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys, #3094 MOTION to Stay re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's F filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 26, 2017 Filing 3095 Application for Attorney Peter N Wasylyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Raymond Tierney; Thomas Westcott. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
July 25, 2017 Filing 3094 MOTION to Stay re #3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof MDL State Class Attorneys' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Co-Lead Counsel's Motion for Approval of the Proposed Allocation of Attorney's Fees by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
July 20, 2017 Set Deadlines per 3089 status conference: Stipulation of Settlement due by 8/11/2017; Outline of objections to be filed by 8/25/2017; Response to outline to be filed by 8/29/2017. (dk)
July 14, 2017 Filing 3093 NOTICE by Derek D Willis regarding Motion to Compel (Lichten PHV, Harold)
July 12, 2017 Filing 3092 MOTION for Attorney Fees ;the Proposed Allocation thereof by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(Harwood, Robert)
July 11, 2017 Filing 3091 AFFIDAVIT of Susan E. Ellingstad re #3090 Report (Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Ellingstad, Susan)
July 11, 2017 Filing 3090 REPORT by All Plaintiffs of Proposed Allocation of the Attorney's Fees. (Ellingstad, Susan)
July 10, 2017 Filing 3089 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/10/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys B. Ross, M. Houston, S. Ellingstad, S. Burrows. FedEx appeared by attys J. Milcoff, J. English, J. Norris, S. Voelz. Following discussion, the court instructed the parties to file stipulation of settlement and motion for preliminary approval in Craig et al v. FedEx Grd, 3:05cv530, by 8/11/2017; outline of objections to be submitted by 8/25/2017, not to exceed 5 pages; and response to outline to be filed by 8/29/2017, not to exceed 5 pages. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk) Modified on 7/11/2017 (dk).
July 7, 2017 Filing 3087 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on JANUARY 12, 2017, before Judge ROBERT L. MILLER, JR.. Court Reporter DEBRA J. BONK, Telephone number 574 220 6474 / debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/18/2017. Redaction Request due 7/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2017. (db)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3088 ORDER: GRANTING #3083 Motion to Stay proceedings on the pending Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Proceedings on the motion to compel production #3081 will be STAYED until 7/28/2017. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the modified request for production by 7/21/2017; to resolve the matter without court action, if possible; and to file a status report by 7/28/2017 identify what issues, if any, remain. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/6/17. (jld)
July 6, 2017 Filing 3086 TRANSCRIPT of FAIRNESS HEARING held on MARCH 14, 2017, before Judge ROBERT L. MILLER, JR. Court Reporter DEBRA J. BONK, Telephone number 574 246 8039/debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/17/2017. Redaction Request due 7/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2017. (db)
July 6, 2017 Filing 3085 TRANSCRIPT of FAIRNESS HEARING held on MARCH 13, 2017, before Judge ROBERT L. MILLER, JR.. Court Reporter DEBRA J. BONK, Telephone number 574 246 8039/debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/17/2017. Redaction Request due 7/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2017. (db) (Main Document 3085 replaced on 7/6/2017) (ksc).
June 30, 2017 Filing 3084 RESPONSE to Motion re #3083 MOTION to Stay re #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys MDL State Class Attorneys' Memorandum in Opposition to Co-Lead Counsel's Motion to Stay Proceedings on the Motion to Compel filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
June 28, 2017 Filing 3083 MOTION to Stay re #3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3082 ORDER: The list of the Kansas class members, Exhibit A to the Opinion and Order entered on June 19, 2017 is attached and incorporated by reference to that order (Doc. No. #253 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG, and Doc. No. #3078 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/27/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
June 26, 2017 Filing 3081 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Relevant to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to the MDL State Class Attorneys by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Janie L Foster, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Barton PHV, George)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3080 ORDER: GRANTING ( #3079 in 3:05md527 & #255 in 3:05cv530) Motion to participate in the July 10 telephonic scheduling conference. Counsel must provide the court with conctact information at least two business days before the conference. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/22/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
June 21, 2017 Filing 3079 MOTION to Allow the Firm of Lichten & Liss-Riordan to Participate in the Telephonic Scheduling Conference Related to the Proposed ERISA Settlement re (3077 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Order on Stipulation, by Plaintiffs Ronald Perry, Alan Pacheco. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3078 OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING #2862 Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for final approval of the Kansas class action settlement calling for payment of $15,900,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTING IN PART the #2789 motion for attorney's fees and costs; and DISMISSING all claims, except the ERISA claim, with prejudice, specifically including the Released Claims with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees except as provided in the Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/19/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3077 ORDER: GRANTING #3076 Stipulation to amend the complaint in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG; DIRECTING the Clerk to show the Fifth Amended Class Action Complaint FILED as of the date of this order; and SETTING this matter for a telephonic scheduling conference on Monday 7/10/2017 at 1:00 PM (EDT) with the court to initiate the call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/19/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(jld)
June 16, 2017 Filing 3076 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Settlement of ERISA Claims, filing of Fifth Amended Complaint, and Entry of Partial Final Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 54(B) regarding Settlement of Non ERISA Claims by Plaintiffs Neal Bergkamp, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Mike Moore, Alan Pacheco, Ronald Perry, Keith Barry, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifth Amend Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-MGG(Houston, Matthew)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3075 OPINION AND ORDER: The class representatives motion for attorney fees and costs filed in cause no. 3:05cv595 Tofaute et al. v. FedEx Ground Package Systems, Inc [Doc. No. 259] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/12/2017. (dk) Modified on 6/12/2017 (dk). Modified on 6/12/2017 (dk).
June 7, 2017 Filing 3074 MANDATE of USCA as to Notices of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground #2381 , #2397 , #2399 , #2391 , #2377 , #2403 , #2387 , #2389 , #2395 , #2383 , #2379 , #2401 , #2375 , #2371 , #2373 , #2393 ; and Notices of Appeal filed by Plaintiffs, #2315 , #2289 , #2493 , #2313 , #2127 , #2311 , #2297 , #2295 , #2317 , #2307 , #2491 , #2321 , #2309 , #2299 , #2305 , #2301 , #2285 , #2291 , #2303 , #2287 , #2319 . All of the pending appeals except Tofaute v. FedEx Ground, No. 11-1131, are voluntarily DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b); It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report in appeal No. 11-1131 by 8/15/17 or within ten days of any district court order affecting the status of the appeal. (Attachments: #1 Certified Final Order)(jld)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3073 ORDER: The court GRANTS the class representatives motion for a stay. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/22/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-MGG(dk)
May 5, 2017 Filing 3072 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3045 , #3047 , #3044 , #3042 , #3037 , #3050 , #3053 , #3048 , #3052 , #3041 , #3040 , #3054 , #3038 , #3046 , #3043 , #3051 , #3049 , & #3039 Orders on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
May 2, 2017 Filing 3071 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3186 OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS the plaintiffs unopposed #2891 motion for final approval of the Wisconsin class action settlement calling for payment of $5,500,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2839 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3185 OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS the plaintiffs unopposed #2889 motion for final approval of the West Virginia class action settlement calling for payment of $3,575,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2835 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3184 OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS the plaintiffs unopposed #2887 motion for final approval of the Utah class action settlement calling for payment of $2,400,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2831 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3183 OPINION AND ORDER The court GRANTS the plaintiffs unopposed #2885 motion for final approval of the Texas class action settlement calling for payment of $8,900,000 to the plaintiffs; DENIES Derick Allen Jordan's request to opt out of the settlement; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2813 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3182 OPINION AND ORDER The court OVERRULES the objections by Randall Brock and Charles Hughes, (Doc. Nos. 206 and 208 in 3:05-cv-668); GRANTS the plaintiffs unopposed 2881 motion for final approval of the South Carolina class action settlement calling for payment of $3,100,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2805 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3181 OPINION AND ORDER The court OVERRULES Kevin Pattersons objection to the proposed settlement in 3:05cv600, Doc. #218 ; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs unopposed #2883 motion for final approval of the Tennessee class action settlement calling for payment of $12,250,000 to the plaintiffs; GRANTS IN PART the plaintiffs #2827 motion for attorneys fees and costs; and DISMISSES with prejudice this action, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/1/17. (jld)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3070 OPINIONS AND ORDERS GRANTING motions for final approval of settlement #2854 , #2856 , #2858 , #2860 , #2863 , #2865 , #2867 , #2871 , #2873 , #2875 , #2879 , #2923 and #2952 and GRANTING IN PART motions for attorneys fees and costs #2765 , #2769 , #2773 , #2774 , #2781 , #2782 , #2790 , #2797 , #2799 , #2806 , #2816 , #2819 , and #2823 in 3:06cv428 (AL), 3:07cv272 (AZ), 3:07cv411 (GA), 3:05cv390 (IN), 3:08cv193 (LA), 3:06cv485 (MD), 3:05cv533 (MN), 3:05cv595 (NJ), 3:05cv538 (NY), 3:07cv326 (NC), 3:08cv336 (OH), 3:05cv597 (PA), and 3:05cv599 (RI). (See individual cases for copies of each opinion and order). Approved by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/28/2017. (dk)
April 18, 2017 Filing 3069 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3045 , #3047 , #3044 , #3042 , #3037 , #3050 , #3053 , #3048 , #3052 , #3041 , #3040 , #3054 , #3038 , #3046 , #3043 , #3051 , #3049 , #3039 Orders Granting Joint Motion for Indicative Rulings (jld)
April 17, 2017 Filing 3068 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
April 13, 2017 Filing 3067 Mail Returned from Charles W Whetstone as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
April 6, 2017 Filing 3066 Mail Returned from B James Fitzpatrick as Undeliverable - #3055 Order. (jld)
April 5, 2017 Filing 3065 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - 3045, 3047, 3044, 3042, 3037, 3050, 3053, 3048, 3052, 3041, 3040, 3054, 3038, 3046, 3043, 3051, 3049, 3039 Orders Granting Joint Motion for Indicative Rulings (jld)
April 4, 2017 Filing 3064 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - 3045, 3047, 3044, 3042, 3037, 3050, 3053, 3048, 3052, 3041, 3040, 3054, 3038, 3046, 3043, 3051, 3049, 3039 Orders Granting Joint Motion for Indicative Rulings. (jld)
April 3, 2017 Filing 3063 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
April 3, 2017 Filing 3062 Mail Returned from Joseph A Osefchen as Undeliverable - #3045 , #3047 , #3044 , #3042 , #3037 , #3050 , #3053 , #3048 , #3052 , #3041 , #3040 , #3054 , #3038 , #3046 , #3043 , #3051 , #3049 , #3039 Orders Granting Joint Motion for Indicative Rulings. (jld)
March 27, 2017 Filing 3061 Mail Returned from Joseph Osefchen as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 27, 2017 Filing 3060 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 24, 2017 Filing 3059 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3055 Order. (jld)
March 24, 2017 Filing 3058 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3045 , #3047 #3044 #3042 , #3037 , #3050 , #3053 , #3048 , #3052 , #3041 , #3040 , #3054 , #3038 , #3046 , #3043 , #3051 , #3049 , #3039 Orders Granting Joint Motion for Indicative Rulings. (jld)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3057 ORDER of USCA: It is ORDERED that the parties' motion for a limited remand pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12.1 is GRANTED. In light of the district court's statement that it is inclined to enter final approval of the proposed class settlement, these appeals are REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with the district court's orders of March 15 and 16, 2017. The parties shall file a status report with this court by May 22, 2017, or within seven days of an order by the district court resolving proceedings in the limited remand.(jld)
March 20, 2017 Filing 3056 Mail Returned from Salvatore G Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3055 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (jld)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3055 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF NEW JERSEY CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/16/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3054 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF WEST VIRGINIA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:06-cv-00826-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3053 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF WISCONSIN CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00601-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3052 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF UTAH CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:08-cv-00053-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3051 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF TEXAS CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3050 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF TENNESSEE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00600-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3049 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00668-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3048 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF RHODE ISLAND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00599-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3047 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF NORTH CAROLINA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00326-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3046 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF OHIO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM-CAN (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3045 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PENNSYLVANIA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00597-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3044 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF MARYLAND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:06-cv-00485-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3043 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF NEW YORK CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00538-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3042 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF LOUISIANA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3041 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF GEORGIA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3040 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF ARIZONA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:07-cv-00272-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3039 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF ALABAMA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:06-cv-00428-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3038 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF MINNESOTA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00533-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3037 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF INDIANA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/15/2017. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00390-RLM-MGG (dk)
March 14, 2017 Filing 3036 MOTION HEARING held on 3/14/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by attys S. Ellingstad, R. Harwood, B. Ross, G. Rudd, A. Marchetti, M. Houston. FedEx Ground appeared by attys J. Milcoff, S. Voelz, A. Fox, J. English, J. Norris, B. Ferron, J. Norris. Attys P. Winbrake, P. DeRose appeared in 3:08cv336, class participant K. Patterson appeared by phone in 3:05cv600, attys G. Kohn, L. Bouckenooghe, D. DiSabato appeared in 3:05cv595 re (2973 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling of Fairness Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. The court hears settlement details on the record for TN, MN, OH, NY, NJ. Matters taken under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
March 13, 2017 Filing 3035 MOTION HEARING held on 3/13/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Plaintiffs appeared by attys S. Ellingstad, R. Harwood, B. Ross, G. Rudd, A. Marchetti. FedEx appeared by attys J. Milcoff, S. Voelz, A. Fox, J. English, J. Norris, B. Ferron, J. Norris. Attys P. Freeman, M. Peters, C. Whetstone appeared in 3:07cv411, atty S. Burrows appeared in 3:05cv530, class participant A. Rhoads appeared in 3:05cv390, attys M. Frischhertz, N. Nazareth appeared in 3:08cv193, atty D. Taylor appeared in 3:05cv540, atty H. Lichten appeared in 3:05cv597, attys P. Freeman, J. Lore appeared in 3:07cv326, and attys P. Freeman, C. Whetstone appeared in 3:05cv668 re #2973 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling of Fairness Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs; The court hears settlement details on the record for AL, AZ, IN, WI, TX, KS, UT, GA, MD, NC, PA, RI, SC, WV, LA. Matters taken under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
March 10, 2017 Filing 3034 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (RTS) (jld)
March 10, 2017 Filing 3033 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (Moved, unable to forward) (jld)
March 10, 2017 Filing 3032 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives re (3026 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Response/Reply filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3031 ORDER granting #3030 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Harold L Lichten PHV for Derek D Willis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 03/10/2017. (mtr)
March 9, 2017 Filing 3030 Application for Attorney Harold Lichten to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Derek D. Willis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(MDL-PHV Temporary Login, ) (Main Document 3030 replaced on 3/9/2017) (mtr).
March 8, 2017 Filing 3029 RESPONSE by FedEx Ground Package System Inc to #3021 Objection,, . (Norris PHV, Jason) Modified on 3/8/2017 (jld).
March 8, 2017 Filing 3028 OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE GEORGIA, NORTH CAROLINA, PENNSYLVANIA, OHIO, SOUTH CAROLINA, TEXAS AND WEST VIRGINIA CASES TO THE NEW JERSEY REPRESENTATIVES' ADDITIONAL OBJECTION TO THE APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by All Plaintiffs . (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
March 7, 2017 Filing 3027 AFFIDAVIT of Co-Lead Counsel re #3026 Response/Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6-8)(Ellingstad, Susan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 3026 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs to #3021 Objection,, (Additional Objection by New Jersey Class Representatives). (Ellingstad, Susan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 3025 BRIEF re #3021 Objection,, KANSAS CLASS REPRESENTATIVES OPPOSITION TO NEW JERSEY CLASS REPRESENTATIVES OBJECTION TO CO-LEAD COUNSELS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of George A Barton)(Barton PHV, George)
March 7, 2017 Filing 3024 ***FILING ERROR, WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED. SEE DE #3025 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** BRIEF re #3021 Objection,, KANSAS CLASS REPRESENTATIVES OPPOSITION TO NEW JERSEY CLASS REPRESENTATIVES OBJECTION TO CO-LEAD COUNSELS APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. (Barton PHV, George) Modified on 3/8/2017 (jld).
March 3, 2017 Filing 3023 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives regarding (3021 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Objection,, filed by Michael B Kilmartin, Frank Cucinotti, David McMahon, Michael Tofaute, Patrick Carrigan, Thomas Mikulski, Francis Dennis Lynch. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-MGG(Kohn PHV, Greg)
March 2, 2017 Filing 3022 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
March 1, 2017 Filing 3021 OBJECTION by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute to (2784 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Memorandum in Support, (2782 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New Jersey), (2869 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
February 24, 2017 Filing 3020 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (note: handwritten note on envelope states "Moved to Crudova TN 4 or 5 years ago) (jld)
February 23, 2017 Filing 3019 Mail Returned from Aaron Roblan as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (resent to new address) (jld)
February 23, 2017 Filing 3018 Mail Returned from Aaron Roblan as Undeliverable - (resent to new address) (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3017 Mail Returned from Charles W Whetstone as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3016 Mail Returned from Charles W Whetstone as Undeliverable - (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3015 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3014 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3013 Mail Returned from Cheryl F Perkins as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3012 Mail Returned from Cheryl F Perkins as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3011 Mail Returned from Joseph A Osefchen as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3010 Mail Returned from Joseph A Osefchen as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3009 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3008 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3007 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3001 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (jld)
February 21, 2017 Filing 3006 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (jld)
February 14, 2017 Filing 3005 Mail Returned from Salvatore Gangemi as Undeliverable - #3000 Notice (Other). (marked Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3004 OPINION AND ORDER The court holds that the settlement agreement is valid, DENIES the class representatives motion to compel (3:05-cv-595, Doc. No. #227 ) (3:05-md-527, Doc. No. #2984 ), and declines to direct any discovery as to whether the agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate, Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e)(2). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/14/17. (jld) Modified on 2/14/2017 (jld).
February 13, 2017 Filing 3003 Sealed Document re #3002 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Ellingstad, Susan)
February 13, 2017 Filing 3002 Sealed Document re #2984 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel and Anthony Marchetti, Esq. to Produce Documents and Appear for Depositions, #2998 Sealed Document,. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3001 OPINION AND ORDER The #2994 Motion for an Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice, and Order to Show Cause is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/9/17. (jld)
February 7, 2017 Filing 3000 NOTICE REGARDING FAIRNESS HEARINGS; All times listed on the #2991 scheduling order for the March 13-14, 2017 fairness hearings are Eastern Daylight Time. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)
February 7, 2017 Filing 2999 NOTICE OF JOINDER by FedEx Ground Package System Inc(District of Colorado 1:07cv902) regarding #2994 MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice and Order to Show Cause (Fox, Alison)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2998 Sealed Document re (2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank Cucinotti, #2 Declaration of Michael Tofaute, #3 Declaration of David McMahon, #4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2997 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2994 MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice and Order to Show Cause (Declaration of Sherri L. Juell) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ellingstad, Susan)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2996 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2994 MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice and Order to Show Cause (Declaration of Susan E. Ellingstad) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Ellingstad, Susan)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2995 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2994 MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice and Order to Show Cause filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2994 MOTION Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Emergency Injunction, Corrective Notice and Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 2, 2017 Filing 2993 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
February 2, 2017 Filing 2992 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2991 ORDER Following discussion at the 1/12/2017 scheduling conference and by agreement of the parties, the court adopts the attached schedule for the class action fairness hearings on March 13 and 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/31/17. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG et al.(jld)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2990 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives regarding (2984 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel and Anthony Marchetti, Esq. to Produce Documents and Appear for Depositions filed by Michael B Kilmartin, Frank Cucinotti, David McMahon, Michael Tofaute, Patrick Carrigan, Thomas Mikulski, Francis Dennis Lynch, (2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 31, 2017 Filing 2989 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2988 Mail Returned from Aaron Roblan as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2987 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2986 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (jld)
January 30, 2017 Filing 2985 STATEMENT of Compliance and Response to Objectors' January 27, 2017 Filings re #2984 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel and Anthony Marchetti, Esq. to Produce Documents and Appear for Depositions, #2983 Statement, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Amanda Myette)(Ellingstad, Susan)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2984 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel and Anthony Marchetti, Esq. to Produce Documents and Appear for Depositions by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Greg M. Kohn, Esq., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 27, 2017 Filing 2983 STATEMENT the New Jersey Class Representatives regarding (2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 2979 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 23, 2017 Filing 2982 Mail Returned from Salvatore G Gangemi as Undeliverable - #2975 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Hearings,, Set Hearings,. (Not deliverable as addressed) (jld)
January 23, 2017 Filing 2981 Mail Returned from Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Refused, Unable to Forward) (jld)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2979 ORDER: DENYING AS MOOT #2958 New Jersey Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Settling Parties to Re-Draft and Re-Send the Settlement Notice and to Adjourn the Fairness Hearing (Doc. No. #2973 & #2976 ); DENYING #2977 request to modify the amended settlement notice; GRANTING #2976 STIPULATION regarding Re-Notice of the New Jersey Class with deadlines as set forth in the order; and DIRECTING the named plaintiffs in Tofaute et al v. FedEx Ground Package Systems, Inc., Cause No. 3:05-CV-595, to file a proffer by 2/3/2017 settingforth the facts and the law that they believe support their objection to the validity of the settlement agreement; and GIVING Class Counsel and the defendant until 2/13/2017 to file any response. A hearing will be set on or before 3/1/2017, if necessary, after briefing is completed. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/19/17. (jld)
January 18, 2017 Filing 2978 RESPONSE to Motion re (221 in 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Compel Settling Parties to Re-Draft and Re-Send the Settlement Notice and to Adjourn the Fairness Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Harwood, Robert)
January 18, 2017 Filing 2977 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives re (2976 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) STIPULATION regarding Re-Notice of the New Jersey Class filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 17, 2017 Filing 2980 Mail Returned from Robert E McDaniel as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, return to sender) (jld)
January 17, 2017 Filing 2976 STIPULATION regarding Re-Notice of the New Jersey Class by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a - Amended Class Notice, #2 Exhibit 1b - Redlined Amended Class Notice, #3 Exhibit 2a - Amended Opt-out Class Notice, #4 Exhibit 2b - Redlined Amended Opt-out Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2975 ORDER: The Court GRANTS #2973 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling of Fairness Hearing. The court VACATES the Fairness Hearing currently set for January 23-24, 2017 and RESETS it for March 13 and 14, 2017 at 9:00 AM (E.D.T.) US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/17/17. (jld)
January 16, 2017 Filing 2974 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives re (2973 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling of Fairness Hearing filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:09-cv-00002-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2973 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling of Fairness Hearing by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
January 13, 2017 Filing 2972 Mail Returned from Kevin M Costello as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (forwarded to new address 18000 Horizon Way, Suite 800, Mt Laurel, NJ 08054) (jld)
January 12, 2017 Filing 2971 HEARING held on 1/12/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys S. Ellingstad, R. Harwood, B. Ross. Dft appeared by attys J. English, A. Fox, J. Milcoff, J. Norris, B. Ferron. Attys G. Kohn, D. DiSabato appeared for New Jersey plaintiffs. Parties present proposed schedule for Jan 23-24 fairness hearing; court identifies procedure to be followed re: objections to settlement in 3:05cv595. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
January 12, 2017 Filing 2970 NOTICE: At the request of plaintiffs' lead counsel, Susan Ellingstad, the time for 1/12/17 hearing has been changed from 1:30 pm to 2:00 pm (EST) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (dk)
January 11, 2017 Filing 2968 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected), #2953 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) Declaration of Beth A. Ross filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ross, Beth)
January 11, 2017 Filing 2967 ** INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED; RE-FILED AT DE #2968 ** AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected), #2953 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) Declaration of Beth A. Ross filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ross, Beth) Modified on 1/12/2017 to add text (ksp).
January 11, 2017 Filing 2966 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected), #2953 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) Declaration of J. Gordan Rudd filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ross, Beth)
January 10, 2017 Filing 2969 Mail Returned from Joseph A Osefchen as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
January 10, 2017 Filing 2960 STATEMENT from New Jersey Class Representatives re organizational meeting on January 12, 2017 regarding (2957 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2965 Mail Returned from Richard Tanenbaum as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Attempted Not Known, unable to forward) (jld)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2964 Mail Returned from Aaron Roblan as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2963 Mail Returned from Cheryl F Perkins as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2962 Mail Returned from Todd J O'Malley as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2961 Mail Returned from Joree Brownlow as Undeliverable - 2957 Notice of Hearing/Deadlines,. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (jld)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2959 RESPONSE to Motion re (2952 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG) MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David McMahon, #2 Declaration of Michael Tofaute, #3 Declaration of Ernest Neal, #4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
January 9, 2017 Filing 2958 MOTION to Compel Settling Parties to Re-Draft and Re-Send the Settlement Notice and to Adjourn the Fairness Hearing by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Ernest Neal, #5 Declaration of Michael Tofaute, #6 Declaration of David McMahon)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(Kohn PHV, Greg)
December 22, 2016 Filing 2957 NOTICE of Hearing: There will be an organizational meeting on 1/12/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. regarding the Jan. 23 and 24 Fairness Hearing.(jld) Modified on 12/22/2016 to correct hearing date (jld).
December 15, 2016 Filing 2956 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin(District of New Jersey 3:05cv2028), Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2955 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin(District of New Jersey 3:05cv2028), Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2954 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2953 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2952 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) (Corrected) by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2951 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2854 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Alabama Settlement) filed by Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2950 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2854 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Alabama Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Tina Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2949 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2854 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Alabama Settlement) filed by Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2948 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2883 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Tennesses Settlement) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, John Lindsey, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2947 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2883 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Tennesses Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, John Lindsey, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2946 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2883 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Tennesses Settlement) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, John Lindsey, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2945 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2873 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of North Carolina Settlement) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2944 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2873 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of North Carolina Settlement) (Declaration of Jessica Jenkins) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2943 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2873 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of North Carolina Settlement) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2942 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2923 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) (Corrected) filed by Derek D Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2941 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2923 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) (Corrected) (Declaration of Jessica Jenkins) filed by Derek D Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2940 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2923 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) (Corrected) filed by Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2939 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2862 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Kansas Settlement) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2938 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2862 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Kansas Settlement) (Declaration of Jessica Jenkins) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Class Notice and Correction Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2937 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2862 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Kansas Settlement) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2936 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2881 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of South Carolina Settlement) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2935 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2881 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of South Carolina Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2934 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2881 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of South Carolina Settlement) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2933 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2891 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2932 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2891 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2931 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2891 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2930 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2887 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Utah Settlement) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2929 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2887 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Utah Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2928 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2887 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Utah Settlement) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2927 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2885 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Texas Settlement) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2926 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2885 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Texas Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Class Notice and Correction Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2925 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2885 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Texas Settlement) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2924 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2923 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) (Corrected) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2923 MOTION for Settlement (Unnopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) (Corrected) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2922 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2871 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New York Settlement) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2921 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2871 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New York Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2920 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2871 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New York Settlement) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2919 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2865 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Maryland Settlement) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2918 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2865 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Maryland Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2917 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2865 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Maryland Settlement) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2916 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2879 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2915 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2879 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2914 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2879 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2913 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2867 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Minnesota Settlement) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Objection)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2912 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2867 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Minnesota Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Class Notice and Correction Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2911 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2867 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Minnesota Settlement) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2910 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2889 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of West Virginia Settlement) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2909 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2889 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of West Virginia Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2908 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2889 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of West Virginia Settlement) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2907 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2875 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Ohio Settlement) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Objection)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2906 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2875 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Ohio Settlement) (Declaration of Jessica Jenkins) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Class Notice and Correction Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2905 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2875 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Ohio Settlement) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2904 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2863 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Louisiana Settlement) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2903 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2863 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Louisiana Settlement) (Declaration of Amanda Myette) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2902 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2863 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Louisiana Settlement) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2901 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2860 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Indiana Settlement) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2900 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2860 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Indiana Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2899 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2860 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Indiana Settlement) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2898 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2858 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Georgia Settlement) filed by Ernest White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2897 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2858 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Georgia Settlement) (Declaration of Melissa Padal) filed by Ernest White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B - Class Notice and Correction Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2896 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2858 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Georgia Settlement) filed by Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2895 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2856 MOTION for Settlement (Uopposed Motion for Final Approval of Arizona Settlement) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2894 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2856 MOTION for Settlement (Uopposed Motion for Final Approval of Arizona Settlement) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2893 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2856 MOTION for Settlement (Uopposed Motion for Final Approval of Arizona Settlement) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2892 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2891 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) by Plaintiffs Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2891 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) by Plaintiffs Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2890 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2889 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of West Virginia Settlement) by Plaintiffs Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2889 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of West Virginia Settlement) by Plaintiffs Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2888 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2887 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Utah Settlement) by Plaintiffs Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2887 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Utah Settlement) by Plaintiffs Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2886 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2885 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Texas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2885 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Texas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2884 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2883 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Tennesses Settlement) by Plaintiffs Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, John Lindsey, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2883 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Tennesses Settlement) by Plaintiffs Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2882 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2881 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of South Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke, Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2881 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of South Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke, Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2880 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2879 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) by Plaintiffs Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2879 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) by Plaintiffs Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2878 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2877 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2877 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2876 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2875 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Ohio Settlement) by Plaintiffs Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2875 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Ohio Settlement) by Plaintiffs Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2874 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2873 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of North Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2873 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of North Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2872 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2871 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New York Settlement) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2871 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New York Settlement) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2870 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2869 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2869 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of New Jersey Settlement) by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2868 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2867 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Minnesota Settlement) by Plaintiffs Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2867 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Minnesota Settlement) by Plaintiffs Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2866 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2865 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Maryland Settlement) by Plaintiff Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2865 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Maryland Settlement) by Plaintiff Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2864 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2863 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Louisiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2863 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Louisiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2862 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Kansas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2861 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2860 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Indiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2860 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Indiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2859 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2858 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Georgia Settlement) by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2858 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Georgia Settlement) by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2857 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2856 MOTION for Settlement (Uopposed Motion for Final Approval of Arizona Settlement) by Plaintiffs Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2856 MOTION for Settlement (Uopposed Motion for Final Approval of Arizona Settlement) by Plaintiffs Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2855 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2854 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Alabama Settlement) by Plaintiff Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 2854 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Alabama Settlement) by Plaintiff Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
November 18, 2016 Filing 2853 Letter from Al Jernign objecting to settlement. (Note: The signature line is illegible, the last name may be different) (jld)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2852 ORDER granting #2851 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Greg M Kohn PHV for Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, and Michael Tofaute. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/15/16. (mtr)
November 10, 2016 Filing 2851 Application for Attorney Greg M. Kohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Tofaute, Francis Dennis Lynch, Thomas Mikulski, David McMahon, Pat Carrigan, Michael B. Kilmartin, and Frank Cucinotti. (MDL-PHV Temporary Login, )
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2850 ORDER granting #2849 Motion to Amend/Correct Orders. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2016. (dk)
November 4, 2016 Filing 2849 MOTION to Amend/Correct Orders Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements (Unopposed) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
October 17, 2016 Filing 2848 OBJECTION by Randy Brock re: settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(jld)
October 11, 2016 Filing 2847 OBJECTION to the amount of settlement by Jack E Ryan. (jld)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2846 ORDER GRANTING #2843 MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDS filed by All Plaintiffs. This Court enters this indicative ruling that it will accept a limited remand from the USCA for the Seventh Circuit for the purpose of considering and deciding Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/6/16. (cc: USCA)(jld)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2845 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2816 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (PENNSYLVANIA) filed by Derek D Willis. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2844 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2813 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (TEXAS) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2843 MOTION FOR INDICATIVE RULING GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDS by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2842 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2839 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Wisconsin) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2841 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2839 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Wisconsin) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2840 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2839 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Wisconsin) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2839 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Wisconsin) by Plaintiffs Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2838 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (West Virginia) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2837 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (West Virginia) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2836 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (West Virginia) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2835 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (West Virginia) by Plaintiffs Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2834 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2831 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Utah) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2833 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2831 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Utah) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2832 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2831 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Utah) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2831 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Utah) by Plaintiffs Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2830 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2827 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Tennessee) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2829 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2827 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Tennessee) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2828 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2827 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Tennessee) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2827 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Tennessee) by Plaintiffs Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2826 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2823 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Rhode Island) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2825 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2823 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Rhode Island) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2824 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2823 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Rhode Island) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2823 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (Rhode Island) by Plaintiffs Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2822 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2819 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (LOUISIANA) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2821 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2819 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (LOUISIANA) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2820 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2819 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (LOUISIANA) filed by Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2819 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (LOUISIANA) by Plaintiffs Timothy Bellow, Ryan Boudreaux. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2818 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2816 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (PENNSYLVANIA) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Derek D Willis. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2817 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2816 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (PENNSYLVANIA) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Derek D Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2816 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (PENNSYLVANIA) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2815 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2813 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (TEXAS) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2814 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2813 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (TEXAS) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2813 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (TEXAS) by Plaintiffs Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2812 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2806 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MINNESOTA) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2811 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2806 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MINNESOTA) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2810 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (South Carolina) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia) 3:05cv2588), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2809 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (South Carolina) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2808 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2806 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MINNESOTA) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2807 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (South Carolina) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2806 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MINNESOTA) by Plaintiffs Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2805 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (South Carolina) by Plaintiffs Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke, Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2804 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2799 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MARYLAND) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2803 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2799 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MARYLAND) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2802 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2797 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (Ohio) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2801 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2797 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (Ohio) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2800 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2799 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MARYLAND) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2799 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (MARYLAND) by Plaintiff Thomas Westcott. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2798 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2797 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (Ohio) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2797 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (Ohio) by Plaintiffs Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2796 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2789 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (KANSAS) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2795 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2790 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New York) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2794 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2789 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (KANSAS) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2793 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2790 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New York) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDl Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2792 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2789 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (KANSAS) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2791 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2790 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New York) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2790 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New York) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2789 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (KANSAS) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2788 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2782 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New Jersey) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2787 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2781 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (INDIANA) (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2786 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2782 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New Jersey) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin(District of New Jersey 3:05cv2028), Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2785 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2781 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (INDIANA) (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2784 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2782 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New Jersey) filed by Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin(District of New Jersey 3:05cv2028), Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2783 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2781 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (INDIANA) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2782 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (New Jersey) by Plaintiffs Patrick Carrigan, Frank Cucinotti, Michael B Kilmartin, Francis Dennis Lynch, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski, Michael Tofaute. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2781 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (INDIANA) by Plaintiffs Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2780 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2774 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Ernest White. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2779 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2773 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2778 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2774 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Ernest White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2777 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2773 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2776 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2774 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments filed by Ernest White. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2775 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2773 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2774 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2773 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Approval of Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2772 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2769 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2771 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2769 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (JOINT DECLARATION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2770 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2769 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2769 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments by Plaintiffs Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2768 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2765 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (DECLARATION OF BRIAN T. FITZPATRICK) filed by Tina Floyd. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2767 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2765 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments (JOINT DECLARATION) filed by Tina Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - LGN Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit 2 - HF Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 3 - LC Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 4 - Time Keeping Memo, #5 Exhibit 5 - MDL Lodestar, #6 Exhibit 6 - MDL Expenses, #7 Exhibit 7 - MDL Fees Collected, #8 Exhibit 8 - MDL Litigation Fund, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mansfield, #10 Exhibit 10 - Smith, #11 Exhibit 11 - George)(Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2766 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2765 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments filed by Tina Floyd. (Ross, Beth)
September 12, 2016 Filing 2765 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments by Plaintiff Tina Floyd. (Ross, Beth)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2763 ORDER granting #2741 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph P Milcoff PHV for FedEx Ground Packaging System, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (ksc)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2762 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED LOUISIANA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2652) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (kjp)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2761 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED OHIO ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2652) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2760 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED RHODE ISLAND ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2660) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2759 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PENNSYLVANIA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2656) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2758 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ALABAMA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2620) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2757 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED NORTH CAROLINA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2688) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(lhc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2016: #1 Correct Order) (lhc).
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2756 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED MARYLAND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2640) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2755 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED TENNESSEE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2667) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2754 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ARIZONA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2624) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (lhc)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2753 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED GEORGIA CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2628) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2752 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED UTAH ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2676) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2751 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED NEW JERSEY ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING 2703 Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/2016. (lhc)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2750 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SOUTH CAROLINA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2664) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2749 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED TEXAS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2671) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2748 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED INDIANA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING #2632 Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/2016. (lhc)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2747 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED WISCONSIN ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2684) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2746 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED WEST VIRGINIA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2680) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16.(cer)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2745 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED MINNESOTA ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2648) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2744 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED KANSAS ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2636) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2743 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED NEW YORK ACTION SETTLEMENT, To Approve the Form, Content and Plan for Distribution of Notice to Settlement Class, Appoint a Settlement Administrator, and to Schedule a Hearing on Final Approval; GRANTING (2648) Motion for preliminary approval in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-MGG. A Fairness Hearing has previously been set for January 23-24, 2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (jld)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2742 ORDER : The Court VACATES the referral to Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein and REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr to determine any pretrial matters and to conduct such proceedings as are required and, when appropriate, to enter into the record proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this case, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Local Rule 72-1. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/17/16. (cer)
August 16, 2016 Filing 2741 Application for Attorney Joseph P. Milcoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FedEx Ground. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 93 has been received, receipt number 0755-3017988(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 2764 MOTION HEARING held on 8/10/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. MDL Pla appeared by attys R. Harwood, S. Ellingstad, B. Ross. FedEx appeared by attys B. Ferron, A. Fox re #2709 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigaiton Expenses filed by Sylvia O'Brien, Matthew Cook, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Keith Barry, Kent Whistler, Leo Rittenhouse, Neal Bergkamp, Mike Moore, Heidi Law, #2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Sylvia O'Brien, Matthew Cook, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Keith Barry, Kent Whistler, Carlene M Craig, Leo Rittenhouse, Neal Bergkamp, Heidi Law, Mike Moore, Motions terminated: #2709 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigaiton Expenses filed by Sylvia O'Brien, Matthew Cook, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Keith Barry, Kent Whistler, Leo Rittenhouse, Neal Bergkamp, Heidi Law, Mike Moore, #2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Sylvia O'Brien, Matthew Cook, Jeff Bramlage, Lawrence Liable, Keith Barry, Kent Whistler, Carlene M Craig, Leo Rittenhouse, Neal Bergkamp, Heidi Law, Mike Moore. Arguments heard. For reasons stated, #2707 motion to compel and #2709 motion to compel are DENIED as premature. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2740 ORDER of USCA GRANTING motion for a limited remand. In light of the district court's indication that it is inclined to preliminarily approve the class settlements, these appeals are REMANDED to the district court for proceedings consistent with the district court's orders of August 3 and 4, 2016. [as to (2385 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2305 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2321 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (115 in 3:06-cv-00485-RLM-CAN); (2315 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (186 in 3:05-cv-00538-RLM-CAN); (2377 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2371 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2399 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2383 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (113 in 3:07-cv-00189-RLM-CAN); (191 in 3:05-cv-00597-RLM-CAN); (2397 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2389 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2373 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (122 in 3:07-cv-00272-RLM-CAN); (2514 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (91 in 3:08-cv-00053-RLM-CAN); (2393 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (185 in 3:05-cv-00599-RLM-CAN); (2375 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (113 in 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-CAN); (2395 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2303 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (184 in 3:05-cv-00668-RLM-CAN); (2491 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2401 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (121 in 3:07-cv-00326-RLM-CAN); (190 in 3:05-cv-00533-RLM-CAN); (73 in 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN); (2319 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2493 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2313 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2317 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2287 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2311 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (195 in 3:05-cv-00390-RLM-CAN); (2297 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2403 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (148 in 3:06-cv-00826-RLM-CAN); (2295 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2512 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (186 in 3:05-cv-00601-RLM-CAN); (2381 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (193 in 3:05-cv-00598-RLM-CAN); (188 in 3:05-cv-00600-RLM-CAN); (2387 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2289 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2379 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2285 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2391 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (164 in 3:06-cv-00428-RLM-CAN); (2293 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (188 in 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN); (2301 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2291 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2299 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN); (2307 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN)]. (jld)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2739 ORDER granting #2738 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin J Ferron PHV for All FedEx Ground Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 08/10/2016. (mtr) (Main Document 2739 replaced on 8/10/2016) (mtr). Modified by replacing main document to adjust for banners on 8/10/2016 (mtr).
August 9, 2016 Filing 2738 Application for Attorney Benjamin J. Ferron to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 93 has been received, receipt number 0755-3012817(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2737 ORDER: GRANTING #2706 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed New Jersey Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2736 ORDER: GRANTING #2702 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Louisiana Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2735 ORDER: GRANTING #2691 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed North Carolina Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00326-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2734 ORDER: GRANTING #2687 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Wisconsin Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00601-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2733 ORDER: GRANTING #2683 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed West Virginia Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00826-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2732 ORDER: GRANTING #2679 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Utah Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:08-cv-00053-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2731 ORDER: GRANTING #2675 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Texas Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2730 ORDER: GRANTING #2670 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Tennessee Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00600-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2729 ORDER: GRANTING #2673 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed South Carolina Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00668-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA Modified
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2728 ORDER: GRANTING #2663 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Rhode Island Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00599-RLM-CAN(jld)cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2727 ORDER: GRANTING #2659 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Pennsylvania Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00597-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2726 ORDER: GRANTING #2655 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Ohio Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2725 ORDER: GRANTING #2651 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed New York Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00538-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2724 ORDER: GRANTING #2647 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Minnesota Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00533-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2723 ORDER: GRANTING #2643 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Maryland Class Action Settlement. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00485-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2722 ORDER: GRANTING #2639 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Kansas Class Action Settlement. in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2721 ORDER: GRANTING #2635 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Indiana Class Action Settlement. in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00390-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2720 ORDER granting #2631 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Georgia Class Action Settlement. in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-CAN(jld) cc: counsel of record, USCA
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2719 ORDER: GRANTING #2627 Motion Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling, Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Arizona Class Action Settlement in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17 in South Bend, with other deadlines as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00272-RLM-CAN(jld) (cc: counsel of record, USCA)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2718 ORDER: GRANTING #2623 Joint Motion for Indicative Ruling Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Alabama Class Action Settlement in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. If this case is remanded to the District Court by the Court of Appeals, this Court will grant the parties joint motion pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, enter the order granting the motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement as set forth in the order, and appoint Rust Consulting Inc as the Settlement Administrator. A Fairness Hearing will be held on 1/23-24/17, with other deadlines as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/16. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00428-RLM-CAN(jld)(cc: counsel of record, USCA)
July 25, 2016 Filing 2717 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2709 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigaiton Expenses filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stacy Burrows)(Barton PHV, George)
July 25, 2016 Filing 2716 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2710 Memorandum in Support, Corrected Exhibit 1 by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Stacy Burrows)(Barton PHV, George) Modified on 8/9/2016 (dk).
July 21, 2016 Filing 2715 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
July 20, 2016 Filing 2714 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton PHV, George)
July 20, 2016 Filing 2713 RESPONSE to Motion re (231 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigation Expenses filed by Carlene M Craig. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert I. Harwood, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert I Harwood)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(Harwood, Robert)
July 14, 2016 Filing 2712 RESPONSE to Motion re (229 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements, (2707 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Fedex Ground Package Systems Inc(Eastern District of Pennsylvania 2:05cv3836). Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(Voelz, Scott)
July 13, 2016 Filing 2711 RESPONSE to Motion re (229 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Carlene M Craig. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert I. Harwood)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(Harwood, Robert)
July 6, 2016 Filing 2710 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2709 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigaiton Expenses filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Barton, George)
July 6, 2016 Filing 2709 MOTION to Compel Co-Lead Counsel to Pay Back All Attorney Expense Reimbursements to the FXG Litigation Fund, or in the Alternative, to Compel Them to Reimburse All MDL FXG Driver Law Firms for Their Litigaiton Expenses by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton, George)
June 30, 2016 Filing 2708 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Barton, George)
June 30, 2016 Filing 2707 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to Produce Documents and Information Related to the Appropriate Allocation of Attorneys' Fees to be Awarded to Class Attorneys in the Twenty Proposed Class Settlements by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Carlene M Craig, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Barton, George)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2706 Joint MOTION for Settlement Indicative Ruling Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed New Jersey Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2705 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2703 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Proposed New Jersey Class Action Settlement Declaration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Harwood, Robert)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2704 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2703 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Proposed New Jersey Class Action Settlement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 29, 2016 Filing 2703 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Proposed New Jersey Class Action Settlement by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2702 Joint MOTION for Settlement Indicative Ruling As It Relates to: Boudreaux - Civil No. 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN (LA) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2701 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2699 MOTION for Settlement As It Relates to: Boudreaux - Civil No. 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN (LA) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Harwood, Robert)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2700 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2699 MOTION for Settlement As It Relates to: Boudreaux - Civil No. 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN (LA) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 28, 2016 Filing 2699 MOTION for Settlement As It Relates to: Boudreaux - Civil No. 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN (LA) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Harwood, Robert)
June 24, 2016 Filing 2698 AMENDED Class Action Settlement Agreement (re #2690 ) by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. Amendment to #2690 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Amended Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement fully executed). (Ellingstad, Susan) Modified on 7/6/2016 to reflect correct doc title (lhc).
June 24, 2016 Filing 2697 AMENDED Class Action Settlement Agreement (re #2622 ) by Tina Floyd, Bruce Edwin Gentle, Stephanie Sullins Gentle. Amendment to #2622 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Amended Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement fully executed). (Ellingstad, Susan) Modified on 7/6/2016 to reflect correct doc title (lhc).
June 24, 2016 Filing 2696 AMENDED Joint Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel (re #2638 ) in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement for Kansas by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. Amendment to #2638 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Amended Notice, #2 Exhibit 4 - Amended Notice)(Ellingstad, Susan) Modified on 7/6/2016 to reflect correct doc title (lhc).
June 24, 2016 Filing 2695 AMENDED Memorandum of Law (re #2637 ) in Support of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Kansas Class Action Settlement by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. Amendment to #2637 Memorandum in Support, . (Ellingstad, Susan) Modified on 7/6/2016 to reflect correct doc title (lhc).
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2694 ORDER GRANTING #2693 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (UNOPPOSED) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. The deadline for filing Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Louisiana and New Jersey Settlements in the above-captioned matters is hereby extended to and including 6/29/2016. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/20/2016. (lhc)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2693 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (UNOPPOSED) by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2692 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #2628 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Georgia Settlement), #2644 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Minnesota Settlement), #2640 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Maryland Settlement), #2660 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Rhode Island Settlement), #2648 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of New York Settlement), #2671 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Texas Settlement), #2667 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Tennessee Settlement), #2656 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement), #2636 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Kansas Settlement), #2676 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Utah Settlement), #2688 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of North Carolina Settlement), #2632 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Indiana Settlement), #2684 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Wisconsin Settlement), #2680 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of West Virginia Settlement), #2664 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of South Carolina Settlement), #2620 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Alabama Settlement), #2624 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Arizona Settlement), #2652 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ohio Settlement) (Omnibus Memorandum) by All Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2691 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2688 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of North Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2690 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2688 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of North Carolina Settlement) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)Correct Member Case Cause is 3:07cv326 Modified on 7/19/2016 (lpw).
June 15, 2016 Filing 2689 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2688 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of North Carolina Settlement) filed by John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2688 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of North Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs John Brown, James D Coates, Darrell Jenkins, Louis Wallace, Daniel Wells, Sharon B Whiteside, Lawrence Aubrey Wilson. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2687 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2684 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) by Plaintiffs Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2686 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2684 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2685 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2684 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) filed by Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki(Western District of Wisconsin). (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2684 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Wisconsin Settlement) by Plaintiffs Gary Lee Larson, Dominic R Lupo, Darren Zabrocki. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2683 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2680 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of West Virginia Settlement) by Plaintiffs Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2682 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2680 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of West Virginia Settlement) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2681 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2680 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of West Virginia Settlement) filed by Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2680 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of West Virginia Settlement) by Plaintiffs Lawrence Asbury, Roger Davis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2679 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2676 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Utah Settlement) by Plaintiffs Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2678 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2676 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Utah Settlement) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2677 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2676 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Utah Settlement) filed by Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2676 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Utah Settlement) by Plaintiffs Dan Fishler, Jesse Ricord, Arthur R Rottini. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2675 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2671 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Texas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2674 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2671 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Texas Settlement) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Errata 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2673 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2664 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of South Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke, Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2672 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2671 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Texas Settlement) filed by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2671 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Texas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2670 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2667 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Tennessee Settlement) by Plaintiffs Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2669 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2667 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Tennessee Settlement) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2668 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2667 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Tennessee Settlement) filed by Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2667 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Tennessee Settlement) by Plaintiffs Robert Erbentraut, Buddy D Johnson, John Lindsey, Arthur Smith, Rachella Westbrook. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2666 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2664 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of South Carolina Settlement) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia)), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2665 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2664 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of South Carolina Settlement) filed by Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke(District of South Carolina (Columbia) 3:05cv2588), Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2664 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of South Carolina Settlement) by Plaintiffs Darryl M Brown, Gregory Cooke, Harvey Samuel, Bridgette Whitehead. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2663 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2660 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) by Plaintiffs Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2662 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2660 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2661 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2660 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) filed by Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2660 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Rhode Island Settlement) by Plaintiffs Ricardo Bacani, Sammy Farland, Alan Ginet, Roland Guillet, Paul Luongo, Donald J McClafferty, Stephen H McGuinness, Wayne F Mills, Jr, Raymond Tierney. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2659 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2656 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2658 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2656 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) filed by Derek D Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2657 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2656 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) filed by Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2656 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Pennsylvania Settlement) by Plaintiff Derek D Willis. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2655 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2652 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ohio Settlement) by Plaintiffs Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2654 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2652 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ohio Settlement) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2653 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2652 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ohio Settlement) filed by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2652 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Ohio Settlement) by Plaintiffs Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2651 Joint MOTION re #2648 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of New York Settlement) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2650 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2648 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of New York Settlement) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2649 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2648 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of New York Settlement) filed by Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2648 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of New York Settlement) by Plaintiffs Nicholas Conte, George Hammer, Damian Ivanov, Larry Louzau, Charles Malkin, Daniel Santa. (Ellingstad, Susan) Correct member case number is 3:05cv538 Modified on 7/19/2016 (lpw).
June 15, 2016 Filing 2647 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2644 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Minnesota Settlement) by Plaintiffs Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2646 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2644 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Minnesota Settlement) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agrement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2645 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2644 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Minnesota Settlement) filed by Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2644 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Minnesota Settlement) by Plaintiffs Magnus B Conroy, Katrina Lee, Gary Miyazaki, Gerald Pelkey, Sergei Selenskikh. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2643 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2640 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Maryland Settlement) by Plaintiff Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2642 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2640 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Maryland Settlement) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2641 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2640 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Maryland Settlement) filed by Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2640 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Maryland Settlement) by Plaintiff Thomas Westcott. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2639 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2636 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Kansas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2638 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2636 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Kansas Settlement) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 -Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2637 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2636 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Kansas Settlement) filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2636 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Kansas Settlement) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2635 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2632 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Indiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2634 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2632 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Indiana Settlement) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2633 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2632 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Indiana Settlement) filed by Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2632 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Indiana Settlement) by Plaintiffs Harold Bennett, Rodney Owens, Roger Riewe, Jeffrey Shelton, David Stacy. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2631 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2628 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Georgia Settlement) by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2630 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2628 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Georgia Settlement) filed by Ernest White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2629 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2628 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Georgia Settlement) filed by Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2628 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Georgia Settlement) by Plaintiff Ernest White. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2627 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2624 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Arizona Settlement) by Plaintiffs Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2626 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2624 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Arizona Settlement) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2625 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2624 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Arizona Settlement) filed by Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2624 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Arizona Settlement) by Plaintiffs Margaret Gibson, Don Olsen, Solomon Rachmin, Joe Shipp. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2623 Joint MOTION for Indicative Ruling re #2620 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Alabama Settlement) by Plaintiff Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2622 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2620 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Alabama Settlement) filed by Tina Floyd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1 - Class Lists, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - CAFA Notice, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rust Consulting Costs, #9 Exhibit 8 - Rust Consulting Letter)(Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2621 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2620 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Alabama Settlement) filed by Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 15, 2016 Filing 2620 MOTION for Settlement (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Alabama Settlement) by Plaintiff Tina Floyd. (Ellingstad, Susan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 2619 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Jacqueline Mezquita Fernandez; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward, No Such Person". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2618 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Karen P Kruse PHV; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2617 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Mary D Walsh-Dempsey; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2616 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Todd J O'Malley; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2615 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Joseph A Osefchen; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2614 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Harold L Lichten; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2613 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Aaron Roblan; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 27, 2016 Filing 2612 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Joree Brownlow; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (lhc)
May 27, 2016 Filing 2611 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Robert E. McDaniel; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (lhc)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2610 ORDER granting #2607 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James C English PHV for All FedEx Ground Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 05/26/2016. (mtr)
May 26, 2016 Filing 2609 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Charles W Whetstone Jr; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 26, 2016 Filing 2608 MAIL Returned as Undeliverable (Order dated 5/16/16, DE #2606 ). Mail sent to Cheryl F Perkins; envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward". (cer)
May 24, 2016 Filing 2607 Application for Attorney James C. English to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 93 has been received, receipt number 0755-2948352 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2606 ORDER GRANTING #2605 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Anne Regan is WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Plaintiffs continue to be represented by J. Gordon Rudd, Jr. and David Cialkowski of the firm Zimmerman Reed, LLP. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/16/16. (cc: All parties listed for paper distribution on NEF). (cer)
May 13, 2016 Filing 2605 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs. (Regan PHV, Anne)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2604 ORDER granting #2603 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason W Norris PHV for All FedEx Ground Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 05/09/2016. (mtr)
May 6, 2016 Filing 2603 Application for Attorney Jason Wesley Norris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 93 has been received, receipt number 0755-2934737 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 23, 2016 Filing 2602 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter D Winebrake on behalf of Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick (Winebrake, Peter)
March 29, 2016 Filing 2601 HEARING on procedures for implementing settlement approval held on 3/29/2016 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys B. Ross, S. Ellingstad, R. Harwood. FedEx Ground appeared by attys A. Fox, S. Voelz. Parties to file motion for preliminary approval by 6/15/16. Court to rule in writing without hearing. If 7th Circuit agrees, class notices will be sent and application for fees and costs will be filed by 9/12/16. Objections will be due by 11/14/16. Motion for final approval to be filed by 12/15/16. 2 day hearing on Motion for final approval and application for fees set for 1/23/2017 09:30 AM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Parties to submit briefing schedule for motions. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
March 22, 2016 Filing 2600 STATUS REPORT Parties' Joint Case Status Statement and Request for Telephonic Status Conference by FedEx Ground Package System Inc(District of New Hampshire 1:05cv145). (Fox, Alison)
March 4, 2016 Filing 2599 STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint Status Report by FedEx Ground Package System Inc(Eastern District of New York 1:04cv4935). (Fox, Alison)
November 6, 2015 Filing 2598 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by FedEx Ground Package System Inc. (Fox, Alison)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2597 ORDER GRANTING #2596 Stipulation to withdraw plaintiff's motion to vacate the 7/30/15 order staying proceedings; WITHDRAWING #2591 Motion to Vacate ; WITHDRAWING #2591 Motion to Remand;. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/13/15. (mlc)
October 2, 2015 Filing 2596 STIPULATION re #2591 MOTION to Vacate #2590 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate ORder Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation MOTION to Remand to District of Kansas Transferor Court (to Withdraw the Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Order Granting Plaintiffs' "Unopposed" Motion for Order Staying the Craig Litigation and for Suggestion of Remand) by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Ellingstad, Susan)
September 16, 2015 Filing 2595 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Gilreath, R)
August 31, 2015 Filing 2594 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2591 MOTION to Vacate #2590 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate ORder Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation MOTION to Remand to District of Kansas Transferor Court filed by Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F)(Barton, George)
August 24, 2015 Filing 2593 RESPONSE to Motion re #2591 MOTION to Vacate #2590 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate ORder Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation MOTION to Remand to District of Kansas Transferor Court filed by All FedEx Ground Defendants. (Fox, Alison)
August 24, 2015 Filing 2592 BRIEF in Opposition to (225 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN, 225 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN) MOTION to Vacate (224) Order on Motion to Stay Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate ORder Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation MOTION to Remand to District of Kansas Transferor Court CLASS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE BARTON FIRM'S MOTION TO VACATE STAY AND FOR SUGGESTION OF REMAND filed by All FedEx Ground Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Beth Ross, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Ross Declaration)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(Ross, Beth)
August 10, 2015 Filing 2591 (WITHDRAWN PER DE 228) MOTION to Vacate #2590 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Craig Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate ORder Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation, MOTION to Remand to District of Kansas Transferor Court by Plaintiffs Keith Barry, Neal Bergkamp, Jeff Bramlage, Matthew Cook, Heidi Law, Lawrence Liable, Mike Moore, Sylvia O'Brien, Leo Rittenhouse, Kent Whistler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Barton, George) Modified on 10/13/2015 to show withdrawn (mlc).
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2590 ORDER GRANTING #2585 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation Pending Mediation by Plaintiff Carlene M Craig and and DIRECTING the parties to file a status report by 11/6/2015 informing the court of the results of the mediation. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/3/2015. (lhc)
July 31, 2015 Filing 2589 Appeal Record Returned: 1 CD and 1 DVD consisting of seal documents (kds)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2588 MANDATE of USCA - The MDL courts denial of the plaintiff drivers motion for summary judgment and its grant of FedExs motion for summary judgment is REVERSED, with costs. The Craig case is REMANDED to the MDL court with instructions to enter judgment for the plaintiff drivers that they are employees of FedEx for purposes of the KWPA and for further proceedings consistent with this opinion, which ultimately may require a remand of the case to the Kansas district court for a determination of damages. Theabove is in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. (Attachments: #1 certified final jgm, #2 certified opinion)(kds)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlene M Craig re #2585 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation Pending Mediation, #2586 Notice (Other), (Ross, Beth)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2586 *** THIS IS A PROPOSED ORDER*** NOTICE by Carlene M Craig re #2585 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation Pending Mediation [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Litigation Pending Mediation (Ross, Beth) Modified on 8/6/2015 (jld).
July 30, 2015 Filing 2585 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Staying Craig Litigation Pending Mediation by Plaintiff Carlene M Craig. (Ross, Beth)
November 25, 2014 Filing 2584 STIPULATION OF RECORD TO BE TRANSFERRED TO TRANSFEROR COURT by Defendant All FedEx Ground Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Voelz, Scott)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2583 ORDER: GRANTING #2582 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey S Nestler terminated on behalf of defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-9-12. (attorney also termed in member cases) (jld) Modified on 11/20/2012 to remove specific case numbers (jld).
November 8, 2012 Filing 2582 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey S. Nestler by Defendant All FedEx Ground Defendants. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(Nestler, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2012 Filing 2581 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Pedrazzi (California) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2580 ORDER closing case for statistical purposes. The court shall retain jurisdiction and this case will be restored to the active docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Robert L. Miller, Jr. on 3/14/12. (jld)
January 23, 2012 Filing 2579 USCA Certified Judgment Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus, with costs (Attachments: #1 Order Denying Writ of Mandamus)(jld)
January 13, 2012 Filing 2578 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #2127 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Docketing Supplemental Record on Appeal)(jld)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2577 ORDER granting #2576 Stipulation to correct record on appeal. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/28/11. (jld)
December 27, 2011 Filing 2576 STIPULATION Stipulation and Joint Request to Clerk of Court to Correct Record on Appeal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 10(E) by Plaintiff Carlene M Craig. (Ross, Beth)
December 22, 2011 Filing 2575 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re (2127 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal, (193 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal.(ksc)
December 21, 2011 Filing 2574 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (via email) re (2127 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal, (193 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal. (ksc)
December 19, 2011 Filing 2573 Letter from 7th Circuit Court of Appeals requesting record on appeal (re: Appeal of Carlene M. Craig, et al - Member Case 3:05-cv-530). (ksc)
November 28, 2011 Filing 2572 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Carlson (Florida) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
November 17, 2011 Filing 2571 CORRECTED STIPULATION of Record to be Transferrred to Transferor Court in Gennell (NH) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
November 15, 2011 Filing 2570 MANDATE of USCA as to #2215 (in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground; dismissing appeal no 11-3401 in accordance with FRAP 42(b). (Attachments: #1 USCA Final Order)(ksc)
November 2, 2011 Filing 2569 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Coleman (Kentucky) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
October 4, 2011 Filing 2568 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Alexander (California) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
September 28, 2011 Filing 2567 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Gennell (NH) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
July 21, 2011 Filing 2566 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Slayman (Oregon) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
July 21, 2011 Filing 2565 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Leighter (Oregon) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
July 18, 2011 Filing 2564 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Campbell (Nevada) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
July 1, 2011 Filing 2563 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (Second Amended). Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM -CAN(ksc)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2562 ORDER directing the clerk to enter a corrected judgment in Craig, 3:05-CV-530, as outlined in this courts April 4, 2011 order (209 in 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN, 2529 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/30/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM -CAN(ksc)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2561 ORDER of USCA as to (2127 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal, REMANDING Appeal No. 10-3115 (305cv530 in re: Carlene Craig, et al) pursuant to FRAP 12.1 for proceedings consistent with the district court's orders of 2/18/11, 3/22/11, and 4/4/11.(ksc)
May 27, 2011 Filing 2560 REMAND ORDER remanding cases back to the originating district courts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (ALN 3:07cv191, ARE 3:06cv209, CAC 3:08cv52, CAN 3:05cv528, CAN 3:06cv429, FLM 3:05cv664, FLS 3:09cv356, KYW 3:05cv666, NH 3:05cv534, OHN 3:06cv801, OR 3:05cv596, OR 3:07cv328). Signed by John G. Heyburn, II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 5/27/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
May 23, 2011 Filing 2559 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Johnson (Iowa) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
May 20, 2011 Filing 2558 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in DeCesare (Nevada) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
May 19, 2011 Filing 2556 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER remanding unopposed cases (IAS 3:05cv652, MA 3:07cv325, NJ 3:07cv327, NJ 3:09cv002, NJ 3:05cv535, NV 3:07cv120, NV 3:08cv520, NYE 3:05cv537, PAE 3:09cv003, TXE 3:06cv802) back to the originating district courts. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 3/7/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
May 19, 2011 CASE DISMISSED pursuant #2252 Stipulation to Dismiss and Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure AS TO: FedEx Corporation and Federal Express Corporation ONLY. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00534-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00666-RLM -CAN, 3:06-cv-00429-RLM -CAN(ksc)
May 17, 2011 Filing 2555 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Tofaute (New Jersey) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
May 17, 2011 Filing 2554 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Mitchell (Pennsylvania) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
May 17, 2011 Filing 2553 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Farrell (New Jersey) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
May 12, 2011 Filing 2552 STIPULATION to Dismiss FedEx Corp. and Federal Express Corp. from Coleman (KY), Gennell (NH), and Pedrazzi (CA) by Defendants All FedEx Ground Defendants, All FedEx Ground Defendants. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
May 10, 2011 Filing 2551 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Price (Texas) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hollinger, Chris)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2550 SECOND AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (White - Georgia) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 7, 2011 Filing 2549 SECOND AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Gibson - Arizona) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00272-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2548 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L Marchetti on behalf of Ryan Boudreaux, Sharon B Whiteside, All Plaintiffs, David Mitchell, Michael Tofaute, Richard Farrell, David McMahon, Thomas Mikulski Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(Marchetti, Anthony)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2547 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Fishler - Utah) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:08-cv-0053-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2546 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Asbury - West Virginia) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00826-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2545 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Larson - Wisconsin) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00601-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2544 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Smith - Tennessee) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-600-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2543 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Cooke - South Carolina) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00668-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2542 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Tierney - Rhode Island) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00599-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2541 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Willis - Pennsylvania) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00597-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2540 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Louzau - New York) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00538-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2539 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Tofaute - New Jersey) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00595-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2538 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Whiteside - North Carolina) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00326-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2537 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Lee - Minnesota) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00533-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2536 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Westcott - Maryland) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00485-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2535 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Boudreaux - Louisiana) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:08-cv-00193-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2534 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Riewe - Indiana) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00390-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2533 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (White - Georgia) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00411-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2532 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Gibson - Arizona) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:07-cv-00272-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 6, 2011 Filing 2531 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Floyd - Alabama) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:06-cv-00428-RLM-CAN (jld)
April 5, 2011 Filing 2530 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Craig - Kansas) Associated Cases 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, 3:05-cv-00530-RLM-CAN(jld)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 ORDER: Pursuant to the court of appeal's order of remand, the court ORDERS amended judgments be entered in these cases using the class definitions included in the Appendix to this order. (re: 199 in 3:05-cv-00601-RLM -CAN, 133 in 3:07-cv-00326-RLM -CAN, 86 in 3:08-cv-00193-RLM -CAN, 196 in 3:05-cv-00668-RLM -CAN, 2528 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 176 in 3:06-cv-00428-RLM -CAN, 200 in 3:05-cv-00600-RLM -CAN, 103 in 3:08-cv-00053-RLM -CAN, 202 in 3:05-cv-00533-RLM -CAN, 207 in 3:05-cv-00390-RLM -CAN, 125 in 3:07-cv-00411-RLM -CAN, 201 in 3:05-cv-00595-RLM -CAN, 134 in 3:07-cv-00272-RLM -CAN, 127 in 3:06-cv-00485-RLM -CAN, 197 in 3:05-cv-00599-RLM -CAN, 197 in 3:05-cv-00538-RLM -CAN, 160 in 3:06-cv-00826-RLM -CAN, 203 in 3:05-cv-00597-RLM -CAN) USCA Order,. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/4/11. (jld)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2528 ORDER of USCA (Certified) as to (2285, 2287, 2289, 2291, 2293, 2295, 2297, 2299, 2301, 2305, 2307, 2309, 2311, 2313, 2315, 2317, 2319, 2321 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notices of Appeal. These appeals are REMANDED pursuant to FRAP 12.1 for proceedings consistent with the district court's orders of 2/18/2011 and 3/22/2011. (ksc)
March 25, 2011 Filing 2527 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Holloway (Maryland) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation)(Hollinger, Chris)
March 25, 2011 Filing 2526 STIPULATION of Record to be Transferred to Transferor Court in Ellison (Maryland) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Stipulation)(Hollinger, Chris)
March 24, 2011 Filing 2525 AMENDED - USCA Appeal Fees received on *3/14/11* in the amount of $ 455, receipt number 3000964 re #2512 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. The Notice of Appeal filing fee was paid on *3/14/11*. (ksc)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2524 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (Kelly - Ohio). Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM -CAN(ksc)
March 23, 2011 Filing 2523 AMENDED CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (Humphreys - Texas). Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM -CAN(ksc)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2522 ORDER granting (2511) Motion for Reconsideration. This Court's 2/18/2011 Order (2507) is AMENDED with respect to cases 3:05cv530 (Craig - Kansas), 3:08cv193 (Boudreaux - Louisiana), and 3:05cv595 (Tofaute - New Jersey) to fully reflect the class definitions and sub-class definitions approved by this court. Clerk directed to correct the Clerk's Judgment (2481) with respect to cases 3:05cv540 (Humphreys - Texas) and 3:08cv336 (Kelly - Ohio) as directed in this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/22/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2521 RESPONSE to Motion re #2511 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2507 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to FedEx Ground's Motion to Reconsider the Court's February 18, 2011 Order Providing Indicative Rulings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Faris, Lynn)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2520 USCA Appeal Fees received on *3/14/2011* in the amount of $ 455, receipt number 3000965 re #2514 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. The Notice of Appeal filing fee was paid on *3/14/2011*. (ksc)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2519 USCA Case Number 11-1562 for (2512 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. (ksc)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2518 USCA Case Number 11-1561 for (2514 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. (ksc)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2517 USCA Appeal Fees received on *3/14/2011* in the amount of $ 455, receipt number 3000964 re #2512 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. The Notice of Appeal filing fee was paid on *3/14/2011*. (ksc)
March 10, 2011 Filing 2516 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re (2514 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Cross Appeal, (2512 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Cross Appeal (Attachments: #1 3:05cv540 Notice of Cross-Appeal, #2 3:05cv540 Docketing Statement, #3 3:08cv336 Notice of Cross-Appeal, #4 3:08cv336 Docketing Statement, #5 Opinion and Order dated 3/25/2008, #6 3:05cv540 Docket Sheet, #7 3:08cv336 Docket Sheet, #8 MDL Lead Docket 3:05md527)(ksc)
March 9, 2011 Filing 2515 Docketing Statement re: #2514 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. Humphreys (Texas) (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
March 9, 2011 Filing 2514 NOTICE OF CROSSAPPEAL by FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
March 9, 2011 Filing 2513 Docketing Statement re: #2512 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by FedEx Ground. Kelly (Ohio) (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
March 9, 2011 Filing 2512 NOTICE OF CROSSAPPEAL by FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
March 8, 2011 Filing 2511 MOTION for Reconsideration re #2507 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, by Defendant All FedEx Ground Defendants. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
February 24, 2011 Filing 2557 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER remanding cases (MD 3:07cv190, MD 3:08cv87) back to the Maryland District Court. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, on 2/24/2011. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:07-cv-00190-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00087-RLM -CAN(ksc)
February 24, 2011 Filing 2510 SUGGESTION OF REMAND of case (Carlson - Florida - 3:05cv664) to its transferor court in accord with Judicial Panel of Multi-District Litigation Rule 10.1(b) (October 2010). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/24/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00664-RLM -CAN(ksc) Modified on 3/1/2011 (ksc). (cc:JPML)
February 18, 2011 Filing 2509 USCA Appeal Fees received on *2/18/11* in the amount of $ 910.00, receipt number INN3000795 re #2491 Notice of Appeal and #2493 Notice of Appeal. The Notice of Appeal filing fee was paid on *2/18/11*. (ksc)
February 18, 2011 Filing 2508 USCA Appeal Fees received on *2/18/11* in the amount of $ 910.00, receipt number INN3000795 re #2493 Notice of Appeal and #2491 Notice of Appeal. The Notice of Appeal filing fee was paid on *2/18/11*. (ksc)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2507 ORDER granting (2472) and (2487) Motions to Amend Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN, but without deciding the dispute over class lists versus notice lists. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/18/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
February 18, 2011 Filing 2506 SUGGESTION OF REMAND to the JPML in accord with the Judicial Panel of Multi-District Litigation Rule 10.1(b)(i) (October 2010). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/18/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al. (cc: JPML)(ksc)
February 16, 2011 Filing 2505 USCA Case Number 11-1378 for (2491 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Johnson, Robert Velo, Russell Jackson, Kenneth Miner, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Thomas Wenzlick. (ksc)
February 16, 2011 Filing 2504 USCA Case Number 11-1379 for (2493 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Quebe, Tim Mershon, Charles Campbell, David Meredith, John Humphreys. (ksc)
February 16, 2011 Filing 2503 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2472 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgments Pursuant to Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) (AMENDED) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Matthew M. Houston In Support of Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 60(a) and 62.1(a), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew M. Houston)(Harwood, Robert)
February 15, 2011 Filing 2502 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2472 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgments Pursuant to Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) (AMENDED) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Matthew M. Houston In Support of Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 60(a) and 62.1(a), #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew M. Houston)(Houston, Matthew)
February 15, 2011 Filing 2498 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re (2491 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal, (2493 in 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN) Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal (3:05-CV-540), #2 Docketing Statement (3:05-CV-540), #3 Notice of Appeal (3:08-CV-336), #4 Docketing Statement (3:08-CV-336), #5 Opinion and Order dated 2/4/2011, #6 Clerk's Judgment, #7 3:05-CV-540 Docket Sheet, #8 3:08-CV-336 Docket Sheet, #9 3:05-MD-527 MDL Lead Docket)(ksc)
February 14, 2011 Filing 2497 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2472 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgments Pursuant to Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Houston In Support of Memorandum In Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Modification of Judgment Pursuant to Fed R Civ Proc. 60a and 62.1(a))(Houston, Matthew)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2501 OPINION AND ORDER denying (2370) Motion for Entry of Partial Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/11/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2500 OPINION AND ORDER denying (2281) Motion for entry of a common benefit set-aside order; denying as unnecessary (2478) and (2479) Motions for Leave to File Sur-Reply in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM-CAN. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/11/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2499 ORDER granting (2489) (2490) Motions to Withdraw as Attorney in case 3:05-md-527-RLM-CAN; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 3:07-cv-00190-RLM -CAN; granting (96) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 3:08-cv-00087-RLM -CAN. The appearance of Attorney Soye Kim is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/11/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN et al.(ksc)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2496 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Carlson (Florida) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2495 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2370 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Harris, 3:06-cv-209 (Arkansas), Alexander, 3:05-cv-528 (California), Huerta, 3:08-cv-052 (California), Pedrazzi, 3:06-cv-429 (California), Coleman, 3:05-cv-666 (Kentucky), DeCesare, 3:07-cv-120 (Nevada), Gennell, 3:05-cv-534 (New Hampshire), Kelly, 3:08-cv-336 (Ohio), Leighter, 3:07-cv-328 (Oregon), Slayman, 3:05-cv-596 (Oregon), Humphreys, 3:05-cv-540 (Texas), Carlson, 3:05-cv-664 (Florida), Gentle, 3:07-cv-191 (Alabama), Wallace, 3:06-cv-801 (Ohio) filed by FedEx Ground Package System Inc(District of Colorado 1:07cv902). (Fox, Alison)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2494 Docketing Statement re: #2493 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Quebe, Tim Mershon, Charles Campbell, David Meredith, John Humphreys. Docketing Statement (TX) (Faris, Lynn)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2493 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles Campbell, John Humphreys, David Meredith, Tim Mershon, Jeffrey Quebe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faris, Lynn)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2492 Docketing Statement re: #2491 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Johnson, Robert Velo, Russell Jackson, Kenneth Miner, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Thomas Wenzlick. Docketing Statement (OH) (Faris, Lynn)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2491 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Russell Jackson, Dean Johnson, Paul Kelly, Adelbert Lawrence, Kenneth Miner, Robert Velo, Thomas Wenzlick. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Faris, Lynn)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2490 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Soye Kim by Plaintiff Theodore Holloway, Jr. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00087-RLM -CAN(Kim, Soye)
February 10, 2011 Filing 2489 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Soye Kim by Plaintiff Terrance E Ellison. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:07-cv-00190-RLM -CAN(Kim, Soye)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2488 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2487 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 60(a) in Humphreys (TX) and Kelly (OH) filed by FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2487 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule 60(a) in Humphreys (TX) and Kelly (OH) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2486 NOTICE by Theodore Holloway, Jr of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00087-RLM -CAN(Kim, Soye)
February 9, 2011 Filing 2485 NOTICE by Terrance E Ellison of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:07-cv-00190-RLM -CAN(Kim, Soye)
February 7, 2011 Filing 2484 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Vargas by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
February 7, 2011 Filing 2483 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Price (Texas) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
February 7, 2011 Filing 2482 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (Member Case Nos. 3:05cv540 and 3:08cv336). (ksc)
February 7, 2011 Filing 2481 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM -CAN(ksc)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2480 ORDER re: (2462) and (2464) Stipulations to Dismiss in case 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN. This order clarifies that the court held the class plaintiffs to be independent contractors under the relevant states laws and these stipulations dispose of the outstanding federal claims in cases 3:05cv540 (Humphreys - Texas) and 3:08cv336 (Kelly - Ohio). Accordingly, the court will not suggest remand of these cases. Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of FedEx on all claims not dismissed in these two cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/4/11. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:05-cv-00540-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM -CAN(ksc)
February 4, 2011 Filing 2479 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Plaintiffs Kimberly A Bunger, Darrell Engbrecht, Jay Heintz, Steve Persing, Chad Viereck. (Tobin, Matthew)
February 3, 2011 Filing 2478 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Response to Plaintiffs' Co-lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee's Motion for Entry of Common Benefit Set-Aside Order by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Sur-reply, #2 Exhibit 2 -- Hollinger Declaration)(Hollinger, Chris)
February 3, 2011 Filing 2477 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert E DeRose, II Associated Cases: 3:05-md-00527-RLM -CAN, 3:08-cv-00336-RLM -CAN(DeRose, Robert)
February 1, 2011 Filing 2476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FedEx Plaintiffs re #2474 Reply to Response to Motion, #2475 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Ellingstad, Susan)
February 1, 2011 Filing 2475 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #2281 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF COMMON BENEFIT SET-ASIDE ORDER (Declaration of Susan E. Ellingstad) filed by FedEx Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ellingstad, Susan)
February 1, 2011 Filing 2474 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2281 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF COMMON BENEFIT SET-ASIDE ORDER filed by FedEx Plaintiffs. (Ellingstad, Susan)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2473 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2472 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgments Pursuant to Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) filed by FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2472 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgments Pursuant to Rule 60(a) and 62.1(a) by Defendant FedEx Ground. (Schwartz PHV, Robert)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2471 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Capers (New Jersey) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2470 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Farrell (New Jersey) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2469 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Mitchell (Pennsylvania) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2468 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Wallace (OHIO) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2467 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Tofaute (New Jersey) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2466 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Leighter (Oregon) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2465 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Slayman (Oregon) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2464 STIPULATION to Dismiss Federal Motor Carrier Act claims in Humphreys (Texas) by Defendants FedEx Ground, FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 31, 2011 Filing 2463 BRIEF in Opposition to #2370 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 54(b) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Faris, Lynn)
January 28, 2011 Filing 2462 STIPULATION to Dismiss FMLA Claims in Kelly (Ohio) by Defendants FedEx Ground, FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 28, 2011 Filing 2461 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Johnson (New York) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2460 ORDER granting #2366 Motion for Reconsideration. The #2242 Clerks Judgment entered against plaintiffs is SET ASIDE as having been entered in error. The Carlson case will now be included in the courts consideration of FedExs Rule 54(b) motion for entry of partial judgment. Parties to file a joint proposed pretrial order within 21 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/27/11. (ksc)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2459 OBJECTION by FedEx Ground to #2281 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF COMMON BENEFIT SET-ASIDE ORDER (AMENDED). (Hollinger, Chris)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2458 Proposed Pretrial Order Corrected (JOINT) Gennell (New Hampshire) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2457 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2281 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF COMMON BENEFIT SET-ASIDE ORDER (re South Dakota Plaintiffs' Opposition) filed by FedEx Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ellingstad, Susan)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2456 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) DeCesare (Nevada) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2455 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Huerta (California) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 25, 2011 Filing 2454 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) Ward (Florida) by FedEx Ground. (Hollinger, Chris)
January 25, 2011