ABRO Industries, Inc. v. 1 New Trade, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
ABRO Industries Inc |
Defendant: |
Igor Zorin, Boris Babenchik, Vadim Fishkin, Quest Specialty Coatings LLC and 1New Trade Inc |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv01984 |
Filed: |
October 23, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
St. Joseph |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. ยง 101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 30, 2017 |
Filing
217
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART ABRO's Motion for Summary Judgment 166 as to Babenchik's tortious interference claim, DENIES IN PART ABRO's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the remainder of the Defendants' claims, GRANTS Baranay's Motion for Summary Judgment 168 , and GRANTS the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 175 and awards reasonable attorney's fees to the Defendants as to ABRO's copyright claim. Because the Court has granted summary judgment to Baranay, he will be DISMISSED from this action. All Motions to Strike 195 , 204 , 205 are DENIED as MOOT. Likewise, ABRO's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Strike 212 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/30/2017. (jss)
|
February 2, 2017 |
Filing
154
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES the Plaintiff's Motion 89 to DISMISS its Amended Complaint 7 with prejudice. The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to renew when and if appropriate, upon resolution of the fees and cost issues between the parties. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/2/2017. (lhc)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
129
OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Igor Zorin and Boris Babenchik ORDERED to submit by 8/19/2016 a supplemental jurisdictional statement and supporting brief identifying (1) the citizenship of Peter Baranay; and (2) their permanent resident alien status and domicile. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/4/16. (cer)
|
July 15, 2016 |
Filing
119
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS all Defendants in this litigation, along with any other parties asserting claims that would remain pending in the event that the Court grants (in whole or in part) the pending Rule 41(a)(2) motion to dismiss, to s ubmit, on or before, July 26, 2016, a jurisdictional statement and supporting brief providing the independent basis of jurisdiction for their claims. Each counsels submission shall not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/15/2016. (rmn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?