Williams v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerome Williams |
Defendant: |
Ron Neal, Howard Morton, Bessie Leonard, Ms Williams, Mr Yancey, Mr Huff, Ms Mayes and Ms Taylor |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00428 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
LaPorte |
Presiding Judge: |
William C Lee |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 17, 2017 |
Filing
40
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 38 Motion to Reconsider by Pla Jerome Williams. This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim against the only remaining Dfts Ron Neal and Howard Morton. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 4/17/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
37
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING Pla Jerome Williams until 4/20/2017, to file an amended complaint. Pla is CAUTIONED that if he does not respond by that ddl, this case will be dismissed w/o further notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 3/28/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
36
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DISMISSES Law Library Supervisor Besse Leonard, Lt. Williams, Officer Canchola, Executive Assistant Vicki Long, Captain Yancy, Lt. Huff, Case Manager Mayes, and Case Manager Taylor; DIRECTS the clerk to open a new case with the amended complaint 35 against Law Library Supervisor Besse Leonard, Lt. Williams, Officer Canchola, and Executive Assistant Vicki Long; DIRECTS the clerk to open a new case with the amended complaint 35 against Captain Yancy, Lt. Huff, Case Manager Mayes, and Case Manager Taylor; DIRECTS the clerk to place a copy of this order in the new cases, directly assign them to the undersigned judge, and identify these three cases on the docket sheets as related so that the history of this proceeding can be conveniently tracked; and DIRECTS the clerk to send Jerome Williams a copy of the docket sheet for the two new cases. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 3/27/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
6
OPINION AND ORDER STRIKING 1 Pro Se Complaint filed by Jerome Williams; DIRECTING the Clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Pla; DIRECTING the Clerk to send Pla five blank prisoner complaint packets; GRA NTING Pla until 10/22/2015 to file one amended complaint in this case which contains only related claims; CAUTIONING Pla that if he does not respond by that ddl, this case will be closed without further notice. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/24/2015. (cc: Pla with forms)(lns)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?