Teague v. Tieman et al
Plaintiff: Dexter Ramone Teague
Defendant: Doctor Tieman, Nurse Lynn H, Nurse Jeff, Nurse Alice and Nurse Latoya
Case Number: 3:2017cv00255
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Miami
Presiding Judge: James T Moody
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court DISMISSES this case WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Mr. Teague didnt exhaust administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit as required by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/15/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party by cert mail 7018 0360 0001 4183 7913)(mlc) Modified on 8/16/2019 to add cert mail info (mlc).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 12 APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Dexter Ramone Teague. Clerk DIRECTED to forward to Plaintiff ten (10) copies of the Screening Order (DE 14 ). This case is STAYED and STATISTICALLY CLOSED. Plaintiff ORDERED to promptly notify the Court when he is ready to proceed with this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/19/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party with Screening Order).(cer)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER re 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants James Tieman, Chris Hall, Lynn H, filed by Plaintiff Dexter Ramone Teague. Plaintiff GRANTED leave to proceed against Chris Hall and James Tieman in their individual capacities and as out lined in Order. All other claims are DISMISSED. Lynn H is DISMISSED. Clerk and United States Marshal's Service DIRECTED to issue and serve process on Chris Hall and James Tieman with a copy of this Order and the Amended Complaint. Chris Hall and James Tieman ORDERED to respond as outlined in Order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/2/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party; USMS).(cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. Tieman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Ramone Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Tieman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Lynn H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jeff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Alice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Latoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?