McManus v. Saint Mary's College
Plaintiff: Kimberly McManus
Defendant: Saint Mary's College
Undetermined: Joseph V Simeri
Case Number: 3:2018cv00746
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: This Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan andestablishes the following deadlines: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/14/2018. Discovery deadline is 8/2/2019. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/1/2019. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/1/2019. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by plaintiff by 2/4/2019 and by defendant by 3/4/2019. The parties have agreed upon Joseph Simeri as mediator. Mediation to be completed by 10/31/2019. The Court hereby VACATES the hearing schedule for 11/15/2018 at 11:00 A.M. (EST). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/9/2018. (rmc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT may attend the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference telephonically on 11/15/2018.The court will call all counsel listed on the docket sheet unless it is notified that specified attorneys need not be contacted. If, at the time of the scheduled conference, you will not be at the telephone number identified on the docket please contact chambers. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10-26-2018. (mlf)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic by Defendant Saint Mary's College. (Airdo, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (slm)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 11/4/2018. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/15/18. (slm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Saint Mary's College.(Airdo, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Airdo on behalf of Saint Mary's College (Airdo, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 2017026 (rmf)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly McManus. Saint Mary's College served on 9/15/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Jones, Andrew)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Saint Mary's College. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
September 12, 2018 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G Jones on behalf of Kimberly McManus (Jones, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Saint Mary's College( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3676141.), filed by Kimberly McManus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Jones, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McManus v. Saint Mary's College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Mary's College
Represented By: Michael A Airdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McManus
Represented By: Andrew G Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Joseph V Simeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?