McGuire v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Dustin E McGuire
Defendant: Joseph Thompson
Undetermined: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2018cv00760
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Joseph Thompson. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. cc:USMS (lpw)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Dr. Thompson. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order, #2 Complaint) (lhc)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed against Dr. Thompson for delaying the receipt of proper medical treatment for his wrist after he fell on October 1, 2016, in violation of the Eighth Amendment; DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Dr. Thompson at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); and ORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), that Dr. Thompson respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claim for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/2/2018. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (lhc)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff, Dustin E. McGuire, IDOC # 48909, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/22/18. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Dustin E McGuire. (nae)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Joseph Thompson, filed by Dustin E McGuire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons and USM 285 forms)(nae)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (ISP) by Dustin E McGuire (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin E McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?