LeSEA Inc et al v. LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation et al
Plaintiff: LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation and LeSEA Inc
Defendant: Dr John W Swails, III, Lester Sumrall, LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation and Edward Wassmer
Case Number: 3:2018cv00914
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, re #27 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Inc. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 1/3/19. (ksp)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 BRIEF in Support of #28 MOTION to Dismiss Counts V, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, XII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Strike Paragraphs 24-42 filed by Dr John W Swails, III, LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall. (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Counts V, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, XII of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Strike Paragraphs 24-42 by Defendants LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III. (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Perry, Louis)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re [DE 8] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. in advance of any conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, subject to the following conditions: All written discovery shall be served no later than December 31, 2018; All written discovery shall be responded to no later than January 31, 2019; Unless the parties stipulate otherwise, plaintiffs shall be limited to taking two (2) depositions; Unless the parties stipulate otherwise, defendants shall be limited to taking two (2) depositions; and All depositions shall take place no later than February 15, 2019; Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction no later than March 1, 2019; plaintiffs shall file any reply no later than March 8, 2019; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 3/19/2019 09:30 AM (CST) in US District Court - Hammond before Judge Philip P Simon. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/19/18. (mlc)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/18/2018 before Judge Philip P Simon. Pla appeared by atty Louis T. Perry. Dft appeared by atty Patrick G. Murphy. Motion for Preliminary Injunction discussed. If this issue does not settle the parties will need one day for that hearing, which will be scheduled for March 2019.The parties agree that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing may be held at the Hammond courthouse. Court sets deadlines - Court order to follow. (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) (nac)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING in part #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Dfts LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III. Dfts LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, and Dr. John W. Swails, III are hereby RELIEVED from responding to plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction at this time; and the parties are hereby ORDERED to discuss a proposed briefing, discovery and hearing schedule for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction in advance of the December 18, 2019 telephone conference and be prepared to discuss the same with the court on December 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/11/2018. (lhc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Private Investigator Affidavit)(Perry, Louis)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III. (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing/Deadlines: Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:00 PM (Hammond/Central) in US District Court - Hammond before Judge Philip P Simon. The first listed attorney on the docket sheet for each party will be contacted for the telephone conference. If a different attorney is to be contacted or a different telephone number is to be used, counsel must notify the Case Manager at 219-852-6724 no later than 12:00 Noon on 12/17/2018. (nac)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III ; answer due by January 2, 2019. (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Michmerhuizen on behalf of LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan D Weaks on behalf of LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III (Weaks, Evan)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G Murphy on behalf of LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III (Murphy, Patrick)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeSEA Inc, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation. Dr John W Swails, III served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Perry, Louis)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeSEA Inc, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation. Lester Sumrall served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Perry, Louis)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeSEA Inc, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation. LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Proposed Conclusions of Law filed by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Sumrall re #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Perry, Louis)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc. (Perry, Louis)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT by Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Perry, Louis)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by LeSEA Inc, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificates)(Perry, Louis)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation, Lester Sumrall, Dr John W Swails, III, Edward Wassmer. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan G Milligan on behalf of Family Broadcasting Corporation, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, LeSEA Inc (Milligan, Ryan)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amie Peele Carter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carter, Amie)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T Perry on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perry, Louis)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3730708.), filed by LeSEA Inc, LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc, Family Broadcasting Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Perry, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeSEA Inc et al v. LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr John W Swails, III
Represented By: Michael H Michmerhuizen
Represented By: Patrick G Murphy
Represented By: Evan D Weaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Sumrall
Represented By: Michael H Michmerhuizen
Represented By: Patrick G Murphy
Represented By: Evan D Weaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeSEA Broadcasting Corporation
Represented By: Michael H Michmerhuizen
Represented By: Patrick G Murphy
Represented By: Evan D Weaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wassmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeSEA Global Feed The Hungry Inc
Represented By: Louis T Perry
Represented By: Amie Peele Carter
Represented By: Ryan G Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Broadcasting Corporation
Represented By: Louis T Perry
Represented By: Amie Peele Carter
Represented By: Ryan G Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeSEA Inc
Represented By: Louis T Perry
Represented By: Amie Peele Carter
Represented By: Ryan G Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?