Wolf v. Indiana State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Scott Lee Wolf
Defendant: Indiana State Prison, Ron Neal, Wexford Health Source and Marthakis
Undetermined: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2018cv00915
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Waiver of Service deadline terminated. (tlr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ron Neal. Ron Neal waiver sent on 11/16/2018, answer due 1/15/2019. (Arthur, David)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C Scheil on behalf of Ron Neal (Scheil, Andrew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT by Ron Neal on plaintiff's medical condition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pages from Plaintiff's medical records)(Arthur, David)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Arthur on behalf of Ron Neal (Arthur, David)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Warden Ron Neal. Waiver of Service due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Injunctive Relief, #3 Order) (mlc)
November 16, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Ron Neal to file a Report by 11/29/2018 withsupporting documentation from medical staff explaining the medical conditionof Scott Lee Wolf, his prognosis and how the medical conditions described in his complaint (ECF 2 and 3) are being treated (mlc)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Lee Wolf. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is CONSTRUED as part of the complaint. GRANTS Scott Lee Wolf leave to proceed against Warden Ron Neal in his official capacity for injunctive relief for the treatment of the growths on his testicles, the pain in his elbow, and the pain and numbness in his arms and legs; DISMISSES all other claims; DISMISSES Indiana State Prison, Marthakis, and Wexford Health Source; DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Ron Neal at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the complaint (ECF 2 and 3) as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(d); ORDERS Ron Neal to file a report by November 29, 2018, with supporting documentation from medical staff explaining the medical condition of Scott Lee Wolf, his prognosis and how the medical conditions described in his complaint (ECF 2 and 3) are being treated; andORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), Ron Neal to otherwiserespond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claim for which Scott Lee Wolf has been granted leaveto proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/14/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mlc)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis. WAIVES the initial partial filing fee. ORDERS the plaintiff, Scott Lee Wolf, IDOC # 252494, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds. DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/14/2018. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(sct)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Scott Lee Wolf. (nae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Indiana State Prison, Marthakis, Ron Neal, Wexford Health Source, filed by Scott Lee Wolf. (No filing fee or IFP received)(nae)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (ISP) by Scott Lee Wolf (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Indiana State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Represented By: David A Arthur
Represented By: Andrew C Scheil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Source
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marthakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lee Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?