Desmith v. Verizon Wireless Services LLC
Plaintiff: JAMES DESMITH
Defendant: VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC and Verizon Wireless Services LLC
Not Yet Classified: James VanWinkle
Case Number: 3:2018cv00978
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
2 Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of James Desmith (Malichi, Cherry)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only. Attorney David W Stewart terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 08/20/2019. (jat)
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw /Remove Appearance of David W. Stewart Only by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Stewart, Darron)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicholas J Wagner terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/20/19. (slm)
August 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Nicholas J. Wagner by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Wagner, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Wagner on behalf of James Desmith (Wagner, Nicholas)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heather R Falks terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/8/19. (slm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Falks, Heather)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S Stewart on behalf of James Desmith (Stewart, Darron)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/3/2019. Fact and Expert Discovery deadline is 5/1/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff(s) by 1/2/2020; and from defendant(s) by 2/3/2020. The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to Plaintiff is 5/31/2019 and Defendant(s) is 6/28/2019. The parties have agreed upon James VanWinkle as mediator. Mediation to be completed by 7/31/2020. Order finding MOOT Defendant's motion (DE #13 ) and Plaintiff's motion (DE #14 ) for all Counsel to Appear Telephonically for the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Court hereby VACATES the hearing scheduled for 4/18/2019 at 10:45 A.M. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/12/2019. (rmc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Phone (Unopposed) by Plaintiff James Desmith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falks, Heather)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Verizon Wireless Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Kamelhair, Christina)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kamelhair, Christina)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/13/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2019 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/28/19. (slm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Verizon Wireless Services LLC.(Martin, Bonnie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Wireless Services LLC. (Martin, Bonnie)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Kamelhair on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Kamelhair, Christina)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L Martin on behalf of Verizon Wireless Services LLC (Martin, Bonnie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Desmith. Verizon Wireless Services LLC served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Falks, Heather)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Verizon Wireless Services LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
December 6, 2018 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Stewart on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Stewart, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R Falks on behalf of JAMES DESMITH (Falks, Heather)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3750855.), filed by JAMES DESMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desmith v. Verizon Wireless Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DESMITH
Represented By: David W Stewart
Represented By: Heather R Falks
Represented By: Darron S Stewart
Represented By: Nicholas J Wagner
Represented By: Cherry Malichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless Services LLC
Represented By: Christina M Kamelhair
Represented By: Bonnie L Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James VanWinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?