VW et al v. South Bend Community School Corporation
Plaintiff: Tasha Haynes and VW
Defendant: South Bend Community School Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00090
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pillar, Jacquelyn)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 4/13/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 10:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/28/19. (slm)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by South Bend Community School Corporation.(Pillar, Jacquelyn)
February 20, 2019 Set Deadlines per DE #11 : South Bend Community School Corporation answer due 3/25/2019. (kjp)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by South Bend Community School Corporation ; answer due by March 25, 2019. (Pillar, Jacquelyn)
February 14, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Sears on behalf of South Bend Community School Corporation (Sears, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn S Pillar on behalf of South Bend Community School Corporation (Pillar, Jacquelyn)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3808183.) from St. Joseph Superior Court, Cause No. 71D06-1708-CT-379, filed by South Bend Community School Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(Pillar, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VW et al v. South Bend Community School Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Haynes
Represented By: Scott A Faultless
Represented By: David W Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VW
Represented By: Scott A Faultless
Represented By: David W Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bend Community School Corporation
Represented By: Michael D Sears
Represented By: Jacquelyn S Pillar
Represented By: David P Burow Flak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?