Roddy v. Lavengood et al
Plaintiff: Isaiah Roddy, Jr
Defendant: Latasha Dixon and Sharon Lavengood
Case Number: 3:2019cv00290
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party via Certified Mail #7099 3400 0003 4516 0209)(rmf) Modified on 7/9/2019 to add text (rmf).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: As of July 9, the Clerk has not received an amended complaintor any other filing from Roddy, who appears to be abandoning this case for the present. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/9/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party via Certified Mail #7099 3400 0003 4516 0209) (rmf)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: The #1 Pro Se Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). The Plaintiff is GRANTED until 7/1/2019 to file an amended complaint in this case, and is CAUTIONED that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 5/16/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed in the Order)(jld)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Subpoenas by Isaiah Roddy, Jr.(nae)
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 Witness List/Exhibit List by Isaiah Roddy, Jr. (nae)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Isaiah Roddy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nae)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 **DISMISSED PER #5 OPINION AND ORDER*** PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 2 copies of USM-285 forms against Latasha Dixon, Sharon Lavengood, filed by Isaiah Roddy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285 forms, #3 Proposed Waiver of Service Forms, #4 Envelope)(nae) Modified on 5/17/2019 (jld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roddy v. Lavengood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Roddy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latasha Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Lavengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?