Graham v. Coca-Cola Consolidated
Plaintiff: DeAnn Graham
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00386
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coca-Cola Consolidated. (Foster, Tiaundra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Coca-Cola Consolidated. Coca-Cola Consolidated waiver sent on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Foster, Tiaundra)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Foster, Tiaundra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra M Foster on behalf of Coca-Cola Consolidated (Foster, Tiaundra)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M Shelton on behalf of Coca-Cola Consolidated (Shelton, Brandon)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Coca-Cola Consolidated, c/o Brent L. Wilson. (Copy mailed to defendant). Waiver of Service due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at Coca-Cola Consolidated, c/o Brent L. Wilson, 229 Peachtree St., N.E., 800 International Tower, Atlanta, GA 30303. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 5/24/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff DeAnn Graham. (jld)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Coca-Cola Consolidated, filed by DeAnn Graham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons and USM-285)(jld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Coca-Cola Consolidated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Consolidated
Represented By: Brandon M Shelton
Represented By: Tiaundra M Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAnn Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?