Rodriguez v. Warden
Petitioner: Jose B Rodriguez
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2019cv00454
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING the relief requested in #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jose B Rodriguez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/7/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Truth Affidavit: In RESPONSE to Order Filed July 18, 2019 re: #6 Order by Jose B Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caryn Nieman Szyper on behalf of Warden (Szyper, Caryn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING the MOTION to Appoint Counsel ECF #5 . Jose B. Rodriguez is ORDERED to file proof of his efforts to obtain counsel for this habeas corpus case by 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/18/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(sct)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel to Pursue habeas Corpus Proceedings by Petitioner Jose B Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 IFP and ledger)(nae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2019: #2 Envelope) (nae).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Pursuant to Section 2254 Habeas Corpus Rule 5, the respondent is ORDERED to enter an Appearance by 7/24/2019, and file a response to the petition by 10/30/2019, with the full and complete State court record. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/5/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Warden)(mrm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Jose Rodriguez re: payment of filing fee (nae)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 3022618 (jld)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose B Rodriguez. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Rodriguez) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose B Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Caryn Nieman Szyper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?