Pack v. Mast
Plaintiff: Kevin Pack
Defendant: Trent Mast
Case Number: 3:2019cv00501
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast. (Groves, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trent Mast.(Groves, James)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James F Groves on behalf of Trent Mast (Groves, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kevin Pack. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #8 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, . (Ayers, James)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Withdraw. Having granted Plaintiff's motion to withdraw, the Court now DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiff's motion to amend #2 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 [1-1] and ORDERS Plaintiff to re-file Exhibit 1, without page 8, no later than 07/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 07/16/2019. (jat)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Pretrial Order to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record by Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Withdraw Page 8 of Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint from Record re #4 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, #2 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James E Ayers on behalf of Kevin Pack (Ayers, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion to Amend/Correct Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint to allow Plaintiff to (1) specify which parts of Exhibit 1 he would like redacted and (2) provide any additional authority and good cause he deems necessary under the Citizens standard for the requested redactions by 7/15/2019. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to maintain Plaintiff's Exhibit 1 to his Complaint under seal until the Court resolves the motion to redact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/1/19. (jld)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Trent Mast. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Kevin Pack. (Ayers, James)
June 28, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3936965.), filed by Kevin Pack. (Attachments: #1 ***STRICKEN pursuant to #8 Order*** Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons). (Ayers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pack v. Mast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pack
Represented By: James E Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Mast
Represented By: James F Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?