Fingers v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Derek N. Fingers, Derek D Fingers and Derek Dontia Fingers
Defendant: Dr. Kardis, Ms. Lee, Mr. Carter, Ms. Miller, Ms. Gonzales, Dushan Zatecky, Dr. Dwenger, Dr. Pental, Shawna Morson, Joshua Querry, Danny Tucker, Vedora Hinshaw, Mark Levenhagen, James Collingsworth, Jessica Koons, Robert Carter, Jr, Sharon Hawk, Wendy Arnold, Ms. Gibbs, Ms. Overholser, George Rentschler, William Hyatte, Steven Price, C. Sanford, Courtney Bridenthal, Kenneth Owens, Matthew Morson, Serena Kendall, Brady Herrington, Roy Buckner, Ms. Devore, Nathanael Angle, Lee, Price, Owens, Herrington, J Collingsworth, Courtney Bridenthall, J Querry, Hawk, Tucker, Overholser, Miller, Morson, S Kendall, Buckner, Gonzales, Rentschler, Carter, Devore, Doctor Pental, J Koons, Hienshaw, Angle and Gibbs
Case Number: 3:2019cv00525
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Derek D Fingers. Miller served on 8/24/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (rmc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Overholser. Overholser waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Bitner, Douglass)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Courtney Bridenthall. Courtney Bridenthall waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Bitner, Douglass)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Courtney Bridenthall, Devore, Gibbs, Overholser, Doctor Pental. cc USMS with attachments #3 , #4 (lpw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Koressel on behalf of Herrington, William Hyatte, S Kendall, J Koons, Price (Koressel, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Price. Price waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J Koons. J Koons waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S Kendall. S Kendall waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Hyatte. William Hyatte waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Herrington. Herrington waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek D Fingers from Miami Correctional Facility to Westville Correctional Facility (nae)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Miller. cc: USMS with attachments #3 #4 (lpw) Modified on 8/8/2019 (lpw).
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by William Hyatte. (Fiorini, Amanda)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant William Hyatte. (Fiorini, Amanda)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Left Out Exhibits and Exhibit's List to NOTICE of Compliance With Ind Code 34-13-7-1 by Defendnats by Derek D Fingers re #3 State Court Complaint, (nae)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Warden William Hyatte, Nurse Courtney Bridenthall, Sgt. S. Kendall, Counselor J. Koons, Sgt. Miller, Ms. Gibbs, Ms. Overholser, Ms. Devore, Dr. Pental, Correctional Officer Herrington and Counselor Price. Waiver of Service due by 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint). (nal)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Derek D. Fingers leave to proceed against Warden William Hyatte in his official capacity for permanent injunctive relief to obtain constitutionally required mental health treatment, GRANTS Mr. Fingers leave to proceed against Nurse Courtney Bridenthall in her individual capacity for compensatory and punitive damages for refusing to provide him with his psychiatric medication on July 10, 2018, around 7:00 a.m., in violation of the Eighth Amendment, GRANTS Mr. Fingers leave to proceed against Sgt. S. Kendall, Counselor J. Koons and Sgt. Miller in their individual capacities for compensatory and punitive damages for preventing him from receiving psychiatric medication on July 17, 2018, at 7:00 a.m., in violation of the Eighth Amendment, GRANTS Mr. Fingers leave to proceed against Ms. Gibbs, Ms. Overholser, Ms. Devore and Dr. Pental in their individual capacities for compensatory and punitive damages for denying him mental health treatment by refusing to see him from July 17, 2018, to November 28, 2018, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, GRANTS Mr. Fingers leave to proceed against Correctional Officer Herrington and Counselor Price in their individual capacities for compensatory and punitive damages for harassing and threatening him so he would react in a way that would justify tasing him on January 29, 2019, in violation of the Eighth Amendment, DISMISSES all other claims, DISMISSES defendants Robert Carter, Jr., Angle, Wendy Arnold, Buckner, Carter, J. Collingsworth, Dr. Dwenger, Gonzales, Hawk, Hienshaw, Dr. Kardis, Lee, Mark Levenhagen, Morson, Shawna Morson, Owens, J. Querry, Rentschler, C. Sanford, Tucker and Dushan Zatecky, DENIES the request for preliminary injunctive relief ECF #3 , DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Warden William Hyatte, Nurse Courtney Bridenthall, Sgt. S. Kendall, Counselor J. Koons, Sgt. Miller, Ms. Gibbs, Ms. Overholser, Ms. Devore, Dr. Pental, Correctional Officer Herrington and Counselor Price at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the complaint ECF #3 , ORDERS Warden William Hyatte to file and serve by 8/1/19 a report (with supporting medical documentation as necessary) describing the mental health of Derek D. Fingers, IDOC # 951762, his housing conditions, and what mental health treatment he is currently being provided and ORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), Warden William Hyatte, Nurse Courtney Bridenthall, Sgt. S. Kendall, Counselor J. Koons, Sgt.Miller, Ms. Gibbs, Ms. Overholser, Ms. Devore, Dr. Pental, Correctional Officer Herrington and Counselor Price respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/17/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
July 11, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER) (sct)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda E Fiorini on behalf of Nathanael Angle, Roy Buckner, Robert Carter, Jr, James Collingsworth, Sharon Hawk, Brady Herrington, Vedora Hinshaw, William Hyatte, Serena Kendall, Jessica Koons, Mark Levenhagen, Matthew Morson, Shawna Morson, Kenneth Owens, Steven Price, Joshua Querry, George Rentschler, Danny Tucker, Dushan Zatecky (Fiorini, Amanda)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3946060.) from Miami Circuit, Cause No. 52C01-1906-PL-000555, filed by Dushan Zatecky, Danny Tucker, Mark Levenhagen, Kenneth Owens, Robert Carter, Jr, Serena Kendall, George Rentschler, William Hyatte, Steven Price, Brady Herrington, Shawna Morson, Sharon Hawk, Matthew Morson, Joshua Querry, Roy Buckner, Nathanael Angle, Vedora Hinshaw, James Collingsworth, Jessica Koons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Exhibit A: State Complaint, #4 Exhibit B: Summons, #5 Exhibit C: State Appearance, #6 Exhibit D: State CCS)(Fiorini, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fingers v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dushan Zatecky
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Dwenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawna Morson
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Querry
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Tucker
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vedora Hinshaw
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Levenhagen
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Collingsworth
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Koons
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carter, Jr
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hawk
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Overholser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Rentschler
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Hyatte
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Represented By: Matthew S Koressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Price
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Bridenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Owens
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Morson
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena Kendall
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Herrington
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Buckner
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathanael Angle
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Represented By: Matthew S Koressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrington
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Represented By: Matthew S Koressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Collingsworth
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Bridenthall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Querry
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawk
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucker
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overholser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morson
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Kendall
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Represented By: Matthew S Koressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckner
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rentschler
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Pental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Koons
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Represented By: Matthew S Koressel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hienshaw
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angle
Represented By: Amanda E Fiorini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek N. Fingers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek D Fingers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Dontia Fingers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?