Cleveland v. Warden et al
Plaintiff: Keith Cleveland
Defendant: Warden, Pacheco, Sgt Gordon, Stg Gordon, Nurse Dan and Wexford
Not Yet Classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00550
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Keith Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (Indiana State Prison) by Keith Cleveland (nae)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sgt Gordon, Pacheco, Warden, Wexford, Nurse Dan, filed by Keith Cleveland.(nae)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Keith Cleveland. (nae) Captioned in error as 2:19-cv-550
August 21, 2019 ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (nae)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER The Court GRANTS Keith Cleveland until September 9, 2019, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Keith Cleveland that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/5/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(kjp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Keith Cleveland re: requesting additional time for deadlines due to legal mail being held, no mail received since 6/24/2019 (nae)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Sgt Gordon, Pacheco, Warden, filed by Keith Cleveland. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Returned file stamped copy to Cleveland)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stg Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?