Tannenbaum v. The2Connect, LLC
Plaintiff: Allan Tannenbaum
Defendant: The2Connect, LLC and Th2Connect, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00555
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Th2Connect, LLC answer due 10/14/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/9/19. (slm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Unopposed by Defendant Th2Connect, LLC. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 9/12/2019. (jld)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Th2Connect, LLC ; answer due by 9/12/2019. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Th2Connect, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc, Corporate Parent Tourism Holdings Limited for Th2Connect, LLC.. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Th2Connect, LLC (Gasper, Trevor)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Th2Connect, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Th2Connect, LLC, filed by Allan Tannenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The2Connect, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 22, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The2Connect, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3955830.), filed by Allan Tannenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tannenbaum v. The2Connect, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The2Connect, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Th2Connect, LLC
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Tannenbaum
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?