Hovis v. Grand Design RV, LLC
Plaintiff: Gary Hovis
Defendant: Grand Design RV, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00563
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/19/19. (slm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Design RV, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Winnebago Industries Inc for Grand Design RV, LLC.. (Hull, Jennifer)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grand Design RV, LLC.(Hull, Jennifer)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Grand Design RV, LLC ; answer due by September 16, 2019. (Johnson, Angela)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela N Johnson on behalf of Grand Design RV, LLC (Johnson, Angela)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Bickley Hull on behalf of Grand Design RV, LLC (Hull, Jennifer)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Hovis. Grand Design RV, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Haskin, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Grand Design RV, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 24, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keenan D Wilson on behalf of Gary Hovis (Wilson, Keenan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Gary Hovis (Haskin, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Grand Design RV, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3958024.), filed by Gary Hovis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hovis v. Grand Design RV, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Design RV, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Bickley Hull
Represented By: Angela N Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Hovis
Represented By: Keenan D Wilson
Represented By: John H Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?