Beehler v. Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC et al
Plaintiff: TIPHANIE BEEHLER
Defendant: BRUNO'S PIZZA, MARIA ROSA CATALDO, LLC, JOHN CATALDO, ROSA CATALDO and Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00569
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: per DE #6 John Cataldo answer due 10/2/2019 (nae)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by John Cataldo (Agreed Notice of Extension of Time) (Appelget, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Appelget on behalf of John Cataldo (Appelget, Daniel)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bruno's Pizza, John Cataldo, Rosa Cataldo, Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 26, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Wolcott on behalf of TIPHANIE BEEHLER (Wolcott, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3959710.), filed by TIPHANIE BEEHLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Bruno's Pizza, #3 Proposed Summons John Cataldo, #4 Proposed Summons Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC, #5 Proposed Summons Rosa Cataldo)(Wolcott, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beehler v. Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUNO'S PIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIA ROSA CATALDO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CATALDO
Represented By: Daniel R Appelget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSA CATALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Rosa Cataldo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIPHANIE BEEHLER
Represented By: Christopher S Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?