Downs v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Downs
Defendant: The R.V. Shop, Inc. and Thor Motor Coach Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00641
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred A Pharis PHV on behalf of Stephen M. Downs (Pharis PHV, Fred)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Fred A Pharis PHV for Stephen M Downs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 09/20/2019. (mtr) (Main Document 19 replaced to correct border alignment on 9/20/2019) (mtr).
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 Application for Attorney Fred A. Pharis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen M. Downs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4012317(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lamont P. Domingue terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/22/19. (slm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by T Michael Pangburn on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Pangburn, T)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Lamont Domingue by Defendants The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The R.V. Shop, Inc.. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach Inc identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Thor Motor Coach Inc.. (Gasper, Trevor)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00213. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Transferring Case to the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/15/2019. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel: In light of the pending #5 Motion to Transfer Case, good cause is shown to defer entry of a scheduling order at this time. The court will review this matter in 120 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELED pending further review of the #6 Status Report. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc..(Domingue, Lamont) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit the text (NLT). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Defendants. (Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Indiana by The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mark D. Stanley, #3 Attachment)(Domingue, Lamont) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The R.V. Shop, Inc., Thor Motor Coach, Inc., filed by Stephen M. Downs. (Attachments: #1 proposed Summons-Thor Motor Coach, #2 proposed Summons- The R.V. Shop, Inc.)(Pharis, Fred) Modified on 5/1/2019 to flatten the attachments (KAH). [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/12/2019. (KAH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1926390.), filed by Stephen M. Downs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Pharis, Fred) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 8/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The R.V. Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach Inc
Represented By: Lamont P. Domingue
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: T Michael Pangburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Downs
Represented By: Fred A. Pharis
Represented By: Fred A Pharis PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?