Elliott v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Alane M Elliott
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and AVALIGN TECHNOLOGIES, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN
Case Number: 3:2019cv00667
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Schmidtke, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Alane M Elliott. All claims against defendant Avalign Technologies, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America will remain a defendant. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/4/19. (ksp)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alane M Elliott (Lavella, Nicholas)
September 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #6 UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer due 10/18/2019 (nae)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ; answer due by October 18, 2019. (Schmidtke, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Schmidtke, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E Schmidtke on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Schmidtke, Mark)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avalign Technologies, Inc. Health & Welfare Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
August 26, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Alane M Elliott (Lavella, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3987445.), filed by Alane M Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Unum insurer, #3 Proposed Summons Group disability plan)(Lavella, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Mark E Schmidtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVALIGN TECHNOLOGIES, INC. HEALTH & WELFARE PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alane M Elliott
Represented By: Nicholas T Lavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?