Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: RELIABLE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00681
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC.(Fryman, Mark)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Fryman, Jr on behalf of Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC (Fryman, Mark)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC answer due 10/21/2019.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/20/19. (slm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC. (Masters, A)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by A Robert Masters on behalf of Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC (Masters, A)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC served on 9/2/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Saber, Marisa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Abraham Gordillo on 9/2/2019, filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
August 28, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.. (Saber, Marisa)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3989806.), filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Contract between parties, #2 Proposed Summons Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Saber, Marisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Reliable Roofing & Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIABLE ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION LLC
Represented By: Mark S Fryman, Jr
Represented By: A Robert Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Marisa L Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?