Modzel et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laura Modzel and Joe Modzel
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00747
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by T Michael Pangburn on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Pangburn, T)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Motor Coach, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Thor Motor Coach, Inc... (Gasper, Trevor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Gasper, Trevor)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thor Motor Coach, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
September 16, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Modzel, Joe Modzel. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Wells, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Thor Motor Coach, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4006524.), filed by Laura Modzel, Joe Modzel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wells, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modzel et al v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Modzel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Modzel
Represented By: Elizabeth Ahern Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: T Michael Pangburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?