Browne v. Rowhena
Plaintiff: Anthony Damon Browne
Defendant: Rob Rowhena
Case Number: 3:2019cv00832
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to voluntarily dismiss and DISMISSING this case without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/14/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7019 0700 0000 3512 4269)(bas)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned from Anthony Damon Browne as Return to Sender - #5 Opinion and Order, Set Deadlines. (shk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned from Anthony Damon Browne as Undeliverable - #4 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, Unable to forward. Return to Sender. (mrm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Anthony Browne requesting matter to be dismissed (nae)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Anthony Damon Browne until 11/12/19 to file an amended complaint and CAUTIONS Anthony Damon Browne that, if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/10/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk of this court 20% of money received for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/9/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed in Order)(bas)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Production of Documents titled as FRCP 33/34 by Anthony Damon Browne.(nae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Anthony Damon Browne. (nae)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 1 copies of summons forms and 1 copies of USM-285 forms against Rob Rowhena, filed by Anthony Damon Browne. (Attachments: #1 Back sides of complaint, #2 Proposed Summons and USM 285 form)(nae) (Returned file stamped copy to Browne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browne v. Rowhena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Damon Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Rowhena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?