Keel v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Jason Andrew Keel and Jason A Keel
Defendant: Hyatte, Robert Carter, Jr, Angle and Jack Hendrix
Not Yet Classified: BRANCHVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00862
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Witnesses at Evidentiary Hearing by Defendant Robert Carter, Jr. Counsel is advised to contact the undersigned's case manager and to provide the information necessary to arrange these telephonic appearances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/21/2019. (lhc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Witnesses at Evidentiary Hearing by Defendant Robert Carter, Jr. (Cochran, Kelly)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 Request for Witnesses by Jason Andrew Keel. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk)(nae)
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (Branchville) by Jason Andrew Keel (Consent previously received) (nae)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Court SETS an evidentiary hearing for Wednesday, 11/27/2019 at 10:30 AM EDT, and has allotted two hours for this hearing. Counsel are expected to appear in person but may contact the court to arrange the appearance of witnesses by telephone or video conference. The Warden of the Branchville Correctional Facility is ORDERED to produce Jason Andrew Keel, IDOC # 962345, for the hearing by video conference. The clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the Warden and the Litigation Liaison of the Branchville Correctional Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/14/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Michael G. Gotsch, Sr., to conduct an evidentiary hearing and to prepare a report and recommendation on the motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/13/19. (kjp)
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Jason Andrew Keel. (rmc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Order by Jason Andrew Keel to #18 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Clerk)(nae)
November 6, 2019 Filing 20 Initial Filing fee: $26.00, receipt number 3023561 (received from Miami Correctional Facility) (rmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned from Jason Andrew Keel as Undeliverable - Not at Miami Correctional and RTS (Regenerated Document to Prisoner E-File address per DE 16) (rmf)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Jason Andrew Keel until 11/14/19 to file a response to this Order and CAUTIONS Jason Andrew Keel that, if he does not respond by that deadline, the motion for injunctive relief will be resolved without the benefit of his reply and that this case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/30/19. (nal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Carter, Jr. Robert Carter, Jr waiver sent on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Cochran, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason Andrew Keel from Miami Correctional Facility to Branchville Correctional Facility pursuant to DE #14 (nae)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE titled as Notice of Reply by Jason Andrew Keel to #13 Order (nae)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (Branchville) by Jason Andrew Keel (nae)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Court DENIES the motion for contempt #10 and the motion to compel #11 . DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this Order to Jason Andrew Keel at the Branchville Correctional Facility in addition to his address of record, GRANTS Jason Andrew Keel until 11/12/2019 to file a response to this Order, CAUTIONS Jason Andrew Keel that if he does not respond by that deadline, the motion for injunctive relief will be resolved without the benefit of his reply and that this case may be dismissed. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/21/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(shk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Contempt, #11 MOTION to Compel filed by Robert Carter, Jr. (Cochran, Kelly)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Compell by Plaintiff Jason Andrew Keel. (nae)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiff Jason Andrew Keel. (jld)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Carter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jack Hendrix)(Cochran, Kelly)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly D Cochran on behalf of Robert Carter, Jr (Cochran, Kelly)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Commissioner Carter. Waiver of Service due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (kjp)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Janson Andrew Keel, granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) filed by Jason Andrew Keel. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/1/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(kjp)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER The court: (1) GRANTS Jason Andrew Keel leave to proceed on an injunctive relief claim against Commissioner Carter in his official capacity to obtain the protective measures to which he is entitled under the Eighth Amendment; (2) DISMISSES Director Hendrix, Warden Hyatte, and Unit Team Manager Angle; (3) DISMISSES all other claims; (5) ORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(g)(2), Commissioner Carter to respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claims for which Jason Andrew Keel has been granted leave to proceedin this screening order; and (6) ORDERS Commissioner Carter to file a response to the motion for a preliminary injunction by October 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/1/19. cc: pltf and as directed in order(kjp)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Plaintiff Jason Andrew Keel. (nae)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Jason Andrew Keel. (nae)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 4 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Angle, Robert Carter, Jr, Jack Hendrix, Hyatte, filed by Jason Andrew Keel. (Returned copy with case number to Keel) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Letter to Clerk)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keel v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Andrew Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carter, Jr
Represented By: Kelly D Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BRANCHVILLE E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?