Price v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Frank Price
Defendant: Debbie Abrams, Ron Neal and Pam Bane
Case Number: 3:2019cv00868
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Frank Price re: #7 Clerks Judgment and #6 Order Dismissing Case. (shk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party via Certified Mail, receipt # 7018 1830 0001 3190 5517) (jat)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 11/15/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party via Certified Mail, receipt # 7018 1830 0001 3190 5517) (jat)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Frank Price; GRANTING Frank Price to and including 10/31/2019 to file an amended complaint; and CAUTIONS him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/4/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(bas)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court ORDERS the plaintiff, Frank Price, IDOC # 108694, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $4.17 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/4/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Frank Price. (nae)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Frank Price. (nae)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms against Debbie Abrams, Pam Bane, Ron Neal, filed by Frank Price. (Returned copy with case number to Price) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed summons and USM 285)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Bane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?