Kehr v. Hook-SupeRx LLC
Plaintiff: STEVEN R. KEHR, SHERRY A. KEHR, Steven R Kehr and Sherry A Kehr
Defendant: HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778 and Hook-SupeRx LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00880
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 State Court Complaint to Add Additional Party Defendants by Plaintiffs Sherry A Kehr, Steven R Kehr. (Farnbauch, David)
November 5, 2019 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated as per DE 11 Order. (mrm)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by the plaintiff by 2/28/2020 and by the defendant by 3/31/2020. Discovery deadline is 12/31/2020. Expert Discovery deadline is 12/31/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 11/1/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 9/1/2020. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/30/2019. Mediator Selection Deadline is 1/15/2020. Mediation to be completed by 11/30/2020. As the presiding judge will set the deadline for dispositive motions and trial date, the summary judgment deadline in Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 shall not apply in this case. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for 11/21/2019 at 11:30 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/5/2019 (mrm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mingus, Ronald)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone.PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT may attend the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference telephonically on 11/21/2019.The court will call all counsel listed on the docket sheet unless it is notified that specified attorneys need not be contacted. If, at the time of the scheduled conference, you will not be at the telephone number identified on the docket please contact chambers. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/15/2019. (mlf)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at Pre-Trial Conference Scheduled for November 21, 2019 by Defendant Hook-SupeRx LLC. (Mingus, Ronald)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 10/29/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/9/19. (slm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Hook-SupeRx LLC.(Mingus, Ronald)
October 7, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778 identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778.. (Mingus, Ronald)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald A Mingus on behalf of HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778 (Mingus, Ronald)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4028510.) from ELKHART SUPERIOR COURT, Cause No. 20D01-1908-CT-000179, filed by HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Complaint, Summons and State Court Docket)(Mingus, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehr v. Hook-SupeRx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOOK-SUPERX, LLC d/b/a CVS PHARMACY #16778
Represented By: Ronald A Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hook-SupeRx LLC
Represented By: Ronald A Mingus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN R. KEHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY A. KEHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R Kehr
Represented By: David L Farnbauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry A Kehr
Represented By: David L Farnbauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?