Merfeld et al v. Dometic AB et al
Plaintiff: Debra Merfeld, Merfeld Transport, Inc. and Mark Merfeld
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Dometic AB
Case Number: 3:2019cv00891
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Request for Trial by Jury by Electrolux Home Products, Inc..(Marr, Sarah)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Michelle Donna Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4084119(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Attorney David James Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4083417(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
November 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #9 Electrolux Home Products, Inc. answer due 12/6/2019 (nae)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux North America Inc, Other Affiliate AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products, Inc... (Marr, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. re #1 Complaint of Initial Enlargement of Time (Marr, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M Marr on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Marr, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dometic AB. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Debra Merfeld, Mark Merfeld, Merfeld Transport, Inc.. (Craver, Ty)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ty M Craver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Craver, Ty)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
October 11, 2019 Email sent to attorney for plaintiff regarding no summons provided for Defendant Dometic AB. (mlc)
October 11, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Electrolux Home Products on 10/10/2019, filed by Debra Merfeld, Mark Merfeld, Merfeld Transport, Inc.. (Craver, Ty)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ty M Craver on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Craver, Ty) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE DOCUMENT; ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT #5 *** Modified on 10/29/2019 (ace). Modified on 10/30/2019 (ace).
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4031992.), filed by Mark Merfeld, Merfeld Transport, Inc., Debra Merfeld. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Craver, Ty)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merfeld et al v. Dometic AB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Merfeld
Represented By: Ty M Craver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merfeld Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Ty M Craver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Merfeld
Represented By: Ty M Craver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah M Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dometic AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?