Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC et al v. Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Cruiser RV, LLC, Keystone RV Company, Airstream, Inc. and Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC
Defendant: Granya RV Importers, Inc. and Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00923
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., Granya RV Importers, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Proposed Summons filed by Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC, Keystone RV Company. (Hake, Devra)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons filed by Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC, Keystone RV Company. (Hake, Devra)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edgar Harold on behalf of Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company (Harold, Paul)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Devra T Hake on behalf of Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company (Hake, Devra)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company of Civil Cover Sheet (Criniti, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries Inc for Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company.. (Criniti, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark F Criniti on behalf of Airstream, Inc., Cruiser RV, LLC, DRV, LLC, Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, Keystone RV Company (Criniti, Mark)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., Granya RV Importers, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4039789.), filed by Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC, DRV, LLC, Cruiser RV, LLC, Airstream, Inc., Keystone RV Company.(Criniti, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC et al v. Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRV, LLC
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Recreational Vehicles LLC
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruiser RV, LLC
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone RV Company
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airstream, Inc.
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Recreational Vehicles, LLC
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Paul Edgar Harold
Represented By: Mark F Criniti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granya RV Importers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?