Bradburn v. CR Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bradburn
Defendant: DOES 1- 10, inclusive, Bard Access Systems Inc and CR Bard Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00925
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bard Access Systems Inc answer due 12/17/2019; CR Bard Inc answers due 12/17/2019 per DE #5 (kjp)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Steele Hyslop on behalf of Bard Access Systems Inc, CR Bard Inc (Hyslop, Chelsea)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bard Access Systems Inc, CR Bard Inc of Automatic Initial Extension (Schiferl, Kevin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Bard Access Systems Inc, CR Bard Inc (Schiferl, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Access Systems Inc, CR Bard Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
October 21, 2019 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE)(jld)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Broderick on behalf of Robert Bradburn (Broderick, Sarah)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4040419.), filed by Robert Bradburn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Broderick, Sarah) Modified to correct docket text (jury demand) on 10/21/2019 (ksc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradburn v. CR Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1- 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Access Systems Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Represented By: Chelsea Steele Hyslop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bradburn
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Broderick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?