Barker v. Ritter et al
Plaintiff: Robert A Barker
Defendant: N Marthakis, Wexford of Indiana, Nurse Dan, Sherri Ritter and Michael
Not Yet Classified: PENDLETON CF E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00937
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Motion for Appointment of Counsel #3 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/18/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) filed by Robert A Barker. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Robert A. Barker, IDOC # 853164, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/18/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (rmc)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Robert A Barker. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Account Ledger)(rmc)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Robert A. Barker, GRANTS Robert A. Barker until 11/29/19 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Robert A. Barker that, if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/28/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel for 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Rights Complaint by Plaintiff Robert A Barker. (nae)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Nurse Dan, N Marthakis, Michael, Sherri Ritter, Wexford of Indiana, filed by Robert A Barker. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (Pendleton) by Robert A Barker (nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Ritter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Marthakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Dan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: PENDLETON CF E-FILE (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?