Lee v. St. Joseph County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Derrick Terrell Lee and Derrick T Lee
Defendant: St Joseph County Jail, Julia Lawson, Keefe Commissary Network and Russell Olmstead
Case Number: 3:2019cv00991
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Plaintiff to immediately pay $105.33 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 12/18/2019. (Copy mailed to Pro Se and as directed in Order)(mrm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04326. Original file and docket sheet received. (Copy with INND case number sent to Lee)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on October 25, 2019. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana - Accordingly, the above action is now TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana at South Bend, Indiana. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis remains pending for review by the Northern District of Indiana (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 10/25/2019. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff DERRICK T. LEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Resident Account Summary, #2 Envelope)(REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/4/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KEEFE COMMISSARY NETWORK, JULIA LAWSON, RUSSELL OLMSTEAD, ST. JOSEPH COUNTY JAIL, filed by DERRICK T. LEE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Inmate Request form, #2 Proposed Summons and 285 form, #3 Envelope)(REO) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. St. Joseph County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Terrell Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick T Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keefe Commissary Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?