Bray v. LaPorte County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Adam Bray and Adam R Bray
Defendant: LaPorte County Jail, Quality Correctional Care LLC, Dr. Tchettchat, Michael Bergerson, John Lake, John T Boyd, Michigan City Police Station, Mark Swistek, Michigan City News Dispatch The and Indiana State of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00993
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Adam Bray; GRANTING Adam Bray until 2/13/2020 to file an amended complaint on that form; and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will proceed based solely on his last amended complaint and any exhibits attached to it. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/20/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dr. Tchettchat, John T Boyd, John T Boyd, filed by Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(nae)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mark Swistek, Michael Bergerson, John Lake, filed by Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT - Exhibits to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Adam Bray. (nae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Adam Bray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (nae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT - Exhibits to #9 Amended Complaint filed by Adam Bray. (nae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Adam Bray (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibit) (nae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #3 Corrected main document with file stamp) (nae).
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michigan City Police Station, Indiana State of, Michigan City News Dispatch The, filed by Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nae)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Adam Bray until 01/10/2020 to file an amended complaint and CAUTIONS Adam Bray if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/02/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (jat)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rmc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LaPorte County Jail, Michigan City Police Station, Quality Correctional Care LLC, Dr. Tchettchat, filed by Adam Bray. (note: incorrect case number listed on complaint)(rmc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Adam Bray (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nae)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Adam Bray until 12/18/2019, to file an amended complaint and CAUTIONS Adam Bray if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/6/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , ORDERS the plaintiff, Adam Bray, IDOC # 223933, LaPorte Jail # 2004-3594, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $43.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds, and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/5/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (rmf)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Adam Bray. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Account Ledger)(nae)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against LaPorte County Jail, Quality Correctional Care LLC, Dr. Tchettchat, filed by Adam Bray. (Returned file stamped copy with case number to Bray) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. LaPorte County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaPorte County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Correctional Care LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tchettchat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bergerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan City Police Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Swistek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan City News Dispatch The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam R Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?