Hampton et al v. Vorm
Plaintiff: Steven J. Hampton and Margaret B. Hampton
Defendant: Julie Vorm
Intervenor Defendant: Cheryl A Williamson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01000
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of #20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(7) filed by Julie Vorm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Property Assessment for Outlot A, #2 Exhibit 2- Cedar Pointe Park Subdivision Deeds, #3 Exhibit 3- Cottage Corner Pointe Subdivision Deeds, #4 Exhibit 4- Plat of Cottage Corner Pointe)(Surrisi, Janette)
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(7) by Defendant Julie Vorm. (Surrisi, Janette)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding moot #17 Motion for Relief from Order pursuant to #18 . Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/16/19. (slm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Relief from Order re #16 Order on Motion to Intervene, /Plaintiffs' Rule 60(b)(1) Motion for Relief from Order by Plaintiffs Margaret B. Hampton, Steven J. Hampton. (Moses, Karen)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Court VACATES its Order dated December 10, 2019, DE #16 . Ms. Williamson's Motion to Intervene REMAINS PENDING, DE #6 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Amended Motion. DE #15 . The deadline for Plaintiffs to file any response to Ms. Williamson's Motion to Intervene is EXTENDED until 1/6/20. Any reply brief must be filed within seven days after any response brief is served consistent with N.D. Ind. L.R. 7-1(d)(3)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/12/19. (nal)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Intervene by Plaintiffs Margaret B. Hampton, Steven J. Hampton. (Moses, Karen)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *Vacated* ORDER granting #6 Motion to Intervene. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter Cheryl A Williamson as an Intervening Party Defendant in this action. Ms. Williamson may separately file her responsive pleading, as attached to the instant motion [6-1], on or before 12/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/10/2019. (jat) Modified on 12/13/2019 to vacate per #18 order. (nal)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' #10 requested extension WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court will entertain a motion to extend the briefing deadline that complies with the standards cited herein and if filed no later than December 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/9/19. (kjp)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Margaret B. Hampton, Steven J. Hampton re #7 Memorandum in Support, #6 MOTION to Intervene /Plaintiffs' Notice of Initial Automatic Extension of Time (Moses, Karen)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Julie Vorm answer due 12/31/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/2/19. (slm)
November 29, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Julie Vorm. (Surrisi, Janette)
November 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Janette E Surrisi on behalf of Julie Vorm (Surrisi, Janette)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven J. Hampton, Margaret B. Hampton. Julie Vorm served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Moses, Karen)
November 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B McEuen on behalf of Cheryl A Williamson (McEuen, Patrick)
November 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Intervene filed by Cheryl A Williamson. (McEuen, Patrick)
November 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Movant Cheryl A Williamson. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss Due to Amount in Controversy). (McEuen, Patrick) Modified on 12/13/2019 to show pending per #18 order. (nal)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen T Moses on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moses, Karen)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Julie Vorm. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
November 7, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. *NEW CASE* (lhc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J Mitchell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Kevin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen T Moses on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moses, Karen) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE DOCUMENT; ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#5 *** Modified on 11/8/2019 (ace).
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Slander of Title and Declaratory Judgment against Julie Vorm( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4057391.), filed by Steven J. Hampton, Margaret B. Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Deed, #2 Exhibit B -- Plat, #3 Exhibit C -- Circuit Court Order, #4 Exhibit D -- Various Recorded Documents, #5 Exhibit E -- Settlement Agreement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Moses, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton et al v. Vorm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Vorm
Represented By: Janette E Surrisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Hampton
Represented By: Karen T Moses
Represented By: Kevin J Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret B. Hampton
Represented By: Karen T Moses
Represented By: Kevin J Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Cheryl A Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?