Cramer et al v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry Cramer and Stacie Lynn Cramer
Defendant: Forest River, Inc., Bank of the West, Big Daddy, LLC and East Kentucky Trailer Sales, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01037
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Big Daddy LLC and Forest River Inc.; answers due 1/15/2020. (lhc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Big Daddy, LLC, Forest River, Inc. ; answer due by January 15, 2020. (Herceg, Manuel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc for Forest River, Inc... (Herceg, Manuel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Daddy, LLC. (Herceg, Manuel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of Big Daddy, LLC, Forest River, Inc. (Herceg, Manuel)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Abaigeal F Musser on behalf of Big Daddy, LLC, Forest River, Inc. (Musser, Abaigeal)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terry Cramer, Stacie Lynn Cramer.(Dalton, Richard)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cramer, Stacie Lynn Cramer. Bank of the West served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Dalton, Richard)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Cramer, Stacie Lynn Cramer. Forest River, Inc. served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Dalton, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Forest River, Inc., Big Daddy, LLC and Bank of the West. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
November 14, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4063289.), filed by Terry Cramer, Stacie Lynn Cramer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cramer et al v. Forest River, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Abaigeal F Musser
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Daddy, LLC
Represented By: Abaigeal F Musser
Represented By: Manuel Herceg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Kentucky Trailer Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cramer
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Lynn Cramer
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?