Gamble v. Miami County Planning Commission et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Gamble and Tammy Renee Gamble
Defendant: Miami County Planning Commission, Bryan Nutt, John Donaldson, Brad Fruth, Lynette Smith, Richard Wiles, Miami County Board of Commissioners, David Sailors, Sr., Fred Musselman, Alan Hunt, Gregg Wilkinson, Jon Reibly, Corey Roser, Richard G Wood, Ralph Duckwall, Larry West, Sandy Chittum, Richard Hendricks, Scarlett Graves, Miami County Plan Commission, Josh Francis, Miami County Plan, Board of Commissioner of Miami County, Randy Hileman, Tim Alwine, Miami County Plan and Building Commission and Miami County Planning and Building Commission
Case Number: 3:2019cv01081
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Ralph Duckwall, Josh Francis, Larry West. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Counsel did not submit a Summons or Notice of Request for Waiver of Service for newly named Defendants Randy Hileman and Tim Alwine. (rmf)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by Tammy Renee Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons Summons - Duckwall, #5 Proposed Summons Summons - Francis, #6 Proposed Summons Summons - West)(Runkle PHV, Bryce)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryce J Runkle PHV for Tammy Renee Gamble. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/3/2019. (ace)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Bryce Joseph Runkle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tammy Renee Gamble. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4080627(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Frantz on behalf of All Defendants (Frantz, Mark)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen H Downs on behalf of All Defendants (Downs, Stephen)
November 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #4 Board of Commissioner of Miami County, Sandy Chittum, John Donaldson, Ralph Duckwall, Brad Fruth, Scarlett Graves, Richard Hendricks, Alan Hunt, Miami County Plan Commission, Fred Musselman, Bryan Nutt, Jon Reibly, Corey Roser, David Sailors, Sr., Lynette Smith, Larry West, Richard Wiles, Gregg Wilkinson, Richard G Wood ; answer due 1/09/2020. (nae)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Board of Commissioner of Miami County, Sandy Chittum, John Donaldson, Ralph Duckwall, Brad Fruth, Scarlett Graves, Richard Hendricks, Alan Hunt, Miami County Plan Commission, Fred Musselman, Bryan Nutt, Jon Reibly, Corey Roser, David Sailors, Sr., Lynette Smith, Larry West, Richard Wiles, Gregg Wilkinson, Richard G Wood ; answer due by 1/09/2020. (Pollack, Caren)
November 22, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Caren L Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (Pollack, Caren)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4072475.) from Miami, Cause No. 52C01-1911-PL-001136, filed by Richard G Wood, Jon Reibly, Gregg Wilkinson, Miami County Planning Commission, Larry West, David Sailors, Sr., Bryan Nutt, Brad Fruth, Lynette Smith, Alan Hunt, Richard Wiles, Sandy Chittum, John Donaldson, Miami County Board of Commissioners, Scarlett Graves, Richard Hendricks, Ralph Duckwall, Fred Musselman, Corey Roser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - State Court Record)(Pollack, Caren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Miami County Planning Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Planning Commission
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Nutt
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Donaldson
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Fruth
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynette Smith
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wiles
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sailors, Sr.
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Musselman
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Hunt
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Wilkinson
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Reibly
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Roser
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G Wood
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Duckwall
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry West
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Chittum
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hendricks
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scarlett Graves
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Plan Commission
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Plan
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioner of Miami County
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Hileman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Alwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Plan and Building Commission
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami County Planning and Building Commission
Represented By: Caren L Pollack
Represented By: Stephen H Downs
Represented By: Mark A Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Renee Gamble
Represented By: Bryce J Runkle PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?