Mahoney v. Beacon Health Ventures et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Mahoney
Defendant: Saint Joseph County Police Department and Beacon Health Ventures
Case Number: 3:2019cv01130
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Beacon Health Ventures.(Johnson, Jeffery)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 2/5/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 11:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/16/20. (slm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Saint Joseph County Police Department.(Agostino, Peter)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Beacon Health Ventures answer due 1/30/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/20/19. (slm)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Beacon Health Ventures. (Johnson, Jeffery)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Towner on behalf of Beacon Health Ventures (Towner, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery A Johnson on behalf of Beacon Health Ventures (Johnson, Jeffery)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Mahoney. Beacon Health Ventures served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Lehner, Meghan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Mahoney. Saint Joseph County Police Department served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Lehner, Meghan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Myra R Reid on behalf of Saint Joseph County Police Department (Reid, Myra)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L Nemeth on behalf of Saint Joseph County Police Department (Nemeth, Stephanie)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Agostino on behalf of Saint Joseph County Police Department (Agostino, Peter)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Lynn Mahoney. (Lehner, Meghan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beacon Health Ventures, Saint Joseph County Police Department. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
December 6, 2019 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE (kjp)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Hartz on behalf of Lynn Mahoney (Hartz, Eric)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan U Lehner on behalf of Lynn Mahoney (Lehner, Meghan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Beacon Health Ventures, Saint Joseph County Police Department( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4083850.), filed by Lynn Mahoney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Lehner, Meghan) Modified to add jury demandon 12/6/2019 (kjp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney v. Beacon Health Ventures et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Mahoney
Represented By: Eric J Hartz
Represented By: Meghan U Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Joseph County Police Department
Represented By: Myra R Reid
Represented By: Peter J Agostino
Represented By: Stephanie L Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Health Ventures
Represented By: Sean M Towner
Represented By: Jeffery A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?