Hollins v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trevon Hollins
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01185
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2020 11:15 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/18/20. (slm)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Forest River, Inc..(Hake, Devra)
December 30, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per #3 Forest River, Inc. answer due 1/30/2020. (rmc)
December 30, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M Barrett on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Barrett, Jesse)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R John Kuehn, III on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Kuehn, R)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Devra T Hake on behalf of Forest River, Inc. (Hake, Devra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Forest River, Inc. ; answer due by January 30, 2020. (Hake, Devra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc.. (Hake, Devra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4101690.) from Elkhart County Superior Court 1, Cause No. 20D01-1912-CT-000248, filed by Forest River, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hake, Devra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollins v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: R John Kuehn, III
Represented By: Devra T Hake
Represented By: Jesse M Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon Hollins
Represented By: Patrick F O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?