Shaws Auto Service, Inc. v. Manestar
Plaintiff: Shaws Auto Service, Inc.
Defendant: Cynthia Manestar
Case Number: 3:2019cv01188
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Marconi on behalf of Cynthia Manestar (Marconi, Joseph)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Cynthia Manestar to #6 Objection to Jurisdiction. (Sedia, Adam)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION by Shaws Auto Service, Inc. Objection to jurisdiction. (Bom, R)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R Steven Bom on behalf of Shaws Auto Service, Inc. (Bom, R)
December 30, 2019 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE (kjp)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by Cynthia Manestar.(Sedia, Adam) Modified on 12/30/2019 to add jury dmd (kjp).
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Sedia on behalf of Cynthia Manestar (Sedia, Adam)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4102041.) from LaPorte Circuit Court, Cause No. 46C01-1910-CT-2472, filed by Cynthia Manestar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sedia, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaws Auto Service, Inc. v. Manestar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaws Auto Service, Inc.
Represented By: Steve Born
Represented By: R Steven Bom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Manestar
Represented By: Adam J Sedia
Represented By: Joseph R Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?