Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Fun F/X II, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: CAO Enterprises II, LLC and Fun F/X II, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00076
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina M Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Christina)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Eshoo, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Eshoo, Edward)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Moyer, Bradford)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAO Enterprises II, LLC, Fun F/X II, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #1 Revised Summons with corrected date) (shk).
January 27, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford S Moyer on behalf of Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company (Moyer, Bradford)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against CAO Enterprises II, LLC, Fun F/X II, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4125784.), filed by Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to Fun FX II, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons to CAO Enterprises II)(Moyer, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company v. Fun F/X II, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAO Enterprises II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun F/X II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankenmuth Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford S Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?