Gates v. Neal et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Gates, Jr.
Defendant: Buckman, Cavanaugh, Nurse Jackie, Rhonda, Nate Bates, Johnson, Cassidy, Tiffany Taylor, Curtis Hill, Vickie Long, Nancy Marthakis MD, Dustin, Samantha G, Victoria Taylor, McCann, George Payne, Tibbles, Capt Warlow, Stone, Mark Newkirk, Shirley Rice, Pam, Eng, Calloway, Chris Rossi, Diane Thews, J Wallen, Aramark Staff, Robert Carter, Redden, Ron Neal, Sherri Fritter, Wilson, Pam Banes, Riafi, Tibbs, Ashley Burnham, Connly, Sima, Woods, Wexford Health Care, Boots, Wayne Peeples, Chris Tripp, Tort Claim Administrator, Corizon Health Care, Dawn Buss, Teresa, Lacey Gorske, Pete and Sue Jones
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 28 Letter from Arthur Gates (rmc)
March 19, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr from Indiana State Prison to Pendleton Correctional Facility pursuant to DE #26 letter (nae) Modified on 3/20/2020 to correct file date(nae).
March 19, 2020 Filing 26 Letter from A.L. Gates to Judge Miller (captioned in error as 3:20-cv-120) (nae)
March 13, 2020 Filing 25 RECEIPT of Proposed Amended Complaint on the List of Defendants from Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (copy returned to Pltf) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
March 13, 2020 Filing 24 Letter from Arthru Lee Gates to Judge Miller re: filings are in good faith. (jld)
March 13, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(jld)
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from Arthur Lee Gates Jr to Judge Miller (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. The Court ORDERS Arthur Lee Gates, Jr., to pay the $400 filing fee by 4/3/2020. If Mr. Gates does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/5/20. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ron Neal. Ron Neal waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Tucker, Margo)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Margo L Tucker on behalf of Ron Neal (Tucker, Margo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Arthur Gates to Judge Miller. (jld)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to the court by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(jld)
February 17, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Nancy Marthakis MD.(Bitner, Douglass)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response Regarding Whether Plaintiff is in Imminent Danger filed by Ron Neal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Medical Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Kosher Email, #3 Exhibit C - Diet Audits, #4 Exhibit D - Bed Location, #5 Exhibit E - Map)(Findley, Bryan)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan R Findley on behalf of Ron Neal (Findley, Bryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglass R Bitner on behalf of Nancy Marthakis MD (Bitner, Douglass)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Marthakis MD. Nancy Marthakis MD waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Bitner, Douglass)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Warden Ron Neal and Dr. Nancy Marthakis. Waiver of Service due by 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. leave to proceed against Dr. Nancy Marthakis for money damages on an Eighth Amendment claim of deliberate indifference to serious medical needs for depriving him of adequate medical care for his back condition since March 15, 2019, GRANTS Mr. Gates leave to proceed against Dr. Nancy Marthakis for money damages on a First Amendment claim for retaliating against him for participating in another lawsuit by depriving him of adequate medical care for his back condition since March 15, 2019, GRANTS Mr. Gates leave to proceed on an injunctive relief claim against Warden Ron Neal in his official capacity to obtain the medical treatment for his back condition and the access to meals to which he is entitled under the Eighth Amendment, DISMISSES all other defendants, DISMISSES all other claims, DIRECTS the clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and if necessary the United States Marshals Service to serve process on) the Warden Ron Neal at the Indiana Department of Correction with a copy of this order and the complaint ECF #1 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), DIRECTS the clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and if necessary the United States Marshals Service to serve process on) Dr. Nancy Marthakis at Wexford of Indiana, LLC, with a copy of this order and the complaint ECF #1 , pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), ORDERS, pursuant to 42 U.S.C., 1997e(g)(2), Warden Ron Neal and Dr. Nancy Marthakis to respond, as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and N.D. Ind. L.R. 10-1(b), only to the claims for which Arthur Lee Gates, Jr., has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order, ORDERS the Warden Ron Neal to file a response by 2/14/20 to the motion for a preliminary injunction, DENIES the motion for counsel ECF #7 , DIRECTS the clerk to send Mr. Gates ten (10) copies of this order and DENIES as UNNECESSARY the motion for a court order ECF #6 . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/4/20. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. The Court WAIVES the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff, Arthur Lee Gates, Jr., IDOC # 174757, to pay (and the facility having custody of him to automatically remit) to the clerk of this court 20% of the money he receives for each calendar month during which he receives $10.00 or more, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/4/20. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(ksp)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 Hiding & Abusing Physically Disabled Prisoners Inside the Indiana State Prison by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel for 42 USC 1983 Civil Rights Complaint and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION Requesting this Court to Order the Defendants to Give the Plaintiff a List of all Their Employee's Full Names and Job titles Work and Home Addresses, so That All Involved Can Be Properly Served by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 CHRONOLOGICAL REPORT by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (nae)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Aramark Staff, Pam Banes, Nate Bates, Boots, Buckman, Ashley Burnham, Dawn Buss, Calloway, Robert Carter, Cassidy, Cavanaugh, Connly, Corizon Health Care, Dustin, Eng, Sherri Fritter, Samantha G, Lacey Gorske, Curtis Hill, Nurse Jackie, Johnson, Vickie Long, Nancy Marthakis MD, McCann, Ron Neal, Mark Newkirk, Pam, George Payne, Wayne Peeples, Pete, Redden, Rhonda, Riafi, Shirley Rice, Chris Rossi, Sima, Stone, Tiffany Taylor, Victoria Taylor, Teresa, Diane Thews, Tibbles, Tibbs, Tort Claim Administrator, Chris Tripp, J Wallen, Warlow, Wexford Health Care, Wilson(Lt), Wilson(Ofc), filed by Arthur Lee Gates, Jr. (Returned copy with case number to Gates) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits, #3 Letter to Judge, #4 Incomplete USM 285, #5 Envelope)(nae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #6 Corrected Complaint (page 1 corrected)) (jld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Marthakis MD
Represented By: Douglass R Bitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha G
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibbles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Warlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Thews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Neal
Represented By: Bryan R Findley
Represented By: Margo L Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Fritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Banes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tort Claim Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Gorske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Lee Gates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?