Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. v. Lippert Components, Inc.
Plaintiff: Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.
Defendant: Lippert Components Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00110
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 34 Updated Trademark form and emailed it U.S. Patent and Trademark office. (mrm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 33 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (mrm)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #31 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the court DISMISSES this case without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. The court VACATES the Rule 16 pretrial conference and discovery plan deadline. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/12/2020. (mrm)
March 9, 2020 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Counter Claimant Lippert Components Inc, Defendant Lippert Components Inc. (McCoy, Andrew)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (McCoy, Andrew)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER This cause is now set for a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference before Magistrate Judge Michael G. Gotsch, Sr., to be held on March 19, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in South Bend, Indiana. The Court ORDERS the parties to file an addendum to their previous proposed scheduling order, indicating the parties' position on case management issues since the transfer was completed, no later than March 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/11/20. cc: pltf's cnsl (kjp)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,984,680; 9,173,502. This case has been transferred from the District of Delaware, case number 1:19-cv-01993, to the Northern District of Indiana, case number 3:20cv110. (jld)
February 4, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01993. Original file and docket sheet received.
January 21, 2020 In accordance with Clerk's Office procedure, this case will be transferred after 10 business days to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana per D.I. #25 and D.I. #26 . (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/21/2020. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/21/2020. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 20, 2020 Filing 24 Joint Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from James M. Lennon and Thatcher A. Rahmeier regarding Attachment of Revised Proposed Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 1/17/2020. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thatcher A. Rahmeier on behalf of Lippert Components, Inc. (Rahmeier, Thatcher) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana filed by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 21 Joint Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Thatcher A. Rahmeier regarding Proposed Schedule. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Parties' Redline of Proposed Scheduling Order)(Rahmeier, Thatcher) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23)(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #19 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (D.I. 13) to January 10, 2020 filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. Set Briefing Schedule: re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana. (Answering Brief due 1/10/2020.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/3/2020. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (D.I. 13) to January 10, 2020 - filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc..(Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 26, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, D.I. #14 has been removed and replaced with the final signed version. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 Supplemental STATEMENT re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #14 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Reid E. Dodge by Lippert Components, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana Declaration of Mr. Ryan Smith by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana filed by Lippert Components, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2020. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Main Document 14 replaced on 12/26/2019) (fms). [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana - filed by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew M. McCoy, Kendall C. Griffin, and Reid Dodge for Lippert Components, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/13/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew McCoy, Reid E. Dodge, Kendall C. Griffin filed by Lippert Components, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/12/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew McCoy, Reid E. Dodge, Kendall C. Griffin - filed by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent LCI Industries for Lippert Components, Inc. filed by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,984,680 ;9,173,502 . (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Trial Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. by Lippert Components, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 12, 2019 filed by Lippert Components, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lippert Components, Inc. answer due 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/7/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 12, 2019 - filed by Lippert Components, Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan M. Fountain filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/7/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.. Lippert Components, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ryan M. Fountain - filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.. (Lennon, James) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lippert Components, Inc. on 10/21/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,739,330 B2. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lippert Components, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2760045.) - filed by Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 2/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamsburg Furniture, Inc. v. Lippert Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippert Components Inc
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Kendall C Griffin
Represented By: Reid E Dodge
Represented By: Andrew M McCoy
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williamsburg Furniture, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?