Jairaj v. Gray Television, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Jairaj
Defendant: Gray Television, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00156
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court DIRECTS the parties to file their stipulation of dismissal within sixty days of this date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/8/2020. (lhc)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Gray Television, Inc. (Jordan, R)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas B Sullivan PHV for Gray Television, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/11/2020. (ace)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Thomas B. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gray Television, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4170156(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 10, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Gray Television, Inc. answer due 4/10/2020. (mlc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Television, Inc.. (Jordan, R)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Gray Television, Inc. re #1 Complaint, [NOTICE OF INITIAL EXTENSION OF TIME] (Jordan, R)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by R Brock Jordan on behalf of Gray Television, Inc. (Jordan, R)
February 20, 2020 Form AO 121 sent to Copyright Office. (nal)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gray Television, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
February 20, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gray Television, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4150980.), filed by Kevin Jairaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jairaj v. Gray Television, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Jairaj
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas B Sullivan PHV
Represented By: R Brock Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?