Lucas v. Wexford Medical Corp et al
Plaintiff: Chansler Lucas
Defendant: Wexford Medical Corp, Galiepau, Wexford Health Services, Robert E Carter, D Livers, Ms Reboc, Dr Liaw, Robert E Carter, Jr and Dr Jackson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00358
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED PRO SE COMPLAINT against D Livers, Dr Liaw, Dr Jackson, Ms Reboc, filed by Chansler Lucas. (no Summons received)(mrm)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/11/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank Prisoner Complaint form and send it to Chansler Lucus; GRANTING him until 6/9/2020 to file an amended complaint on this form; and CAUTIONING him that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A because the current complaint does not state a claim. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/8/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERING Chansler Lucas, IDOC # 121811 to immediately pay $10.30 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING Plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; and DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/7/2020. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(mrm)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Chansler Lucas. (nae)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Chansler Lucas. (nae)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Robert E Carter, Galiepau, D Livers, Wexford Health Services, Wexford Medical Corp, filed by Chansler Lucas. (Returned copy with case number to Lucas) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 USM 285 forms, #3 Envelope)(nae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Wexford Medical Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chansler Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galiepau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Livers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Reboc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Liaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?