Winer v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Paula Winer
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00451
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-217) transferring case to Multi-District Litigation 2741 in the Northern District of California before Judge Vince Chhabria. (jld)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 (Uncertified) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-217). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 6/19/2020. (jld)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court AFFORDS the defendants 14 days from the date of this order within which to file an amended notice of removal sufficiently alleging the existence of jurisdiction. If the defendants don't respond by the deadline, this case is subject to remand without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/18/20. (ksp)
June 9, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Trachtman, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company. (Trachtman, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D Trachtman on behalf of Monsanto Company (Trachtman, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4245813.) from Wabash Circuit Court, Cause No. 85C01-2005-CT-000261, filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Wrongful Death, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition for Appointment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Obituary)(Trachtman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winer v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Winer
Represented By: Daniel J Vanderpool
Represented By: Isaiah P Vanderpool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Daniel D Trachtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?