Campbell v. Gray Television, Inc.
Plaintiff: Savanna Campbell
Defendant: Gray Television, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00469
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Gray Television, Inc..(Maurer, Brad)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Savanna Campbell Order (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad R Maurer on behalf of Gray Television, Inc. (Maurer, Brad)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K Dickey on behalf of Gray Television, Inc. (Dickey, Sarah)
July 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer date set 8/3/20 per #7 Agreed Notice (jld)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Gray Television, Inc. re #1 Complaint, of Automatic Initial Extension (Byron, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Television, Inc.. (Byron, Daniel)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Byron on behalf of Gray Television, Inc. (Byron, Daniel) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE*** Modified on 7/8/2020 (ace).
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Byron on behalf of Gray Television, Inc. (Byron, Daniel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 AO 121 Copyright form, by Savanna Campbell. Form sent to U.S. Copyright Office via email. (shk)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gray Television, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
June 12, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (shk)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gray Television, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4249145.), filed by Savanna Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Gray Television, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savanna Campbell
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Television, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah K Dickey
Represented By: Brad R Maurer
Represented By: Daniel P Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?