Marsillett v. Kosciusko County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: DOUG MARSILETT, II and Doug Marsillett, II
Defendant: L/N/U, NURSE MICHELLE, ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC., KOSCIUSKO COUNTY SHERIFF, Nurse Michelle and Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00531
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court now ADOPTS the parties discovery plan as outlined below and establishes the following deadlines: The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 10/1/2020. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 9/25/2020; and for Defendant is 10/26/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 2/1/2021; and from defendant(s) by 4/1/2021. The last date for the completion of all discovery is 8/13/2021. The last date to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion shall be 30 days prior to the discovery deadline. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/12/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) & (c). The parties shall name a mediator no later than 11/30/2020. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator, or if none is named, the Court will appoint a mediator. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 12/31/2021. The Court hereby VACATES the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 8/25/2020 at 10:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/17/2020. (bas)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baron, Lisa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 8/12/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2020 10:45 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 7/29/20. (slm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kosciusko County Sheriff.(Baron, Lisa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (Farrington, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Doug Marsillett, II. (Myers, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Kosciusko County Sheriff answer due 7/24/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/29/20. (slm)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Kosciusko County Sheriff. (Baron, Lisa)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Byron D Knight on behalf of Kosciusko County Sheriff (Knight, Byron)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Knight on behalf of Kosciusko County Sheriff (Knight, Elizabeth)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A Baron on behalf of Kosciusko County Sheriff (Baron, Lisa)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (Farrington, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc. (Farrington, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A Dillon on behalf of ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. (Dillon, Carol)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC. (Farrington, Christopher)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4263211.) from Kosciusko Superior Court 4, Cause No. 43D04-2005-CT-000044, filed by ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B; State Docket, State Filings as of 062520, #3 Exhibit C; Co-Def's Consent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrington, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marsillett v. Kosciusko County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L/N/U, NURSE MICHELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED CORRECTIONAL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Carol A Dillon
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOSCIUSKO COUNTY SHERIFF
Represented By: Elizabeth A Knight
Represented By: Lisa A Baron
Represented By: Byron D Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Michelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Carol A Dillon
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Farrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG MARSILETT, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Marsillett, II
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?