Blakley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Blakley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00534
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay C Hinsley on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hinsley, Jay)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Barbara J Blakley. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/27/2020. US Attorney General served on 7/27/2020. US Attorney served on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (jld)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (CC: USMS) (mrm)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/29/2020. (CC: USMS)(mrm)
June 26, 2020 Judge Theresa L Springmann added. (NEW CASE, PENDING MOTION) (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Barbara J. Blakley. (Olinsky, Howard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Barbara J. Blakley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 USM-285 Form, #6 USM-285 Form, #7 USM-285 Form)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jay C Hinsley
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Blakley
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?